California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-04641
Case Filed:Dec 11, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Dec 12, 2024 11:22 PM PST
Defendant
Juan Eduardo Martinez Velazquez (1)
Represented By
Ryan Anthony Dela Rosa
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
David J. Kete
Doj-Usao
contact info
Hunter V. Norton
Doj-Usao
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/13/2024 12:17 AM PST
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
Arrest of Juan Eduardo Martinez Velazquez (no document attached) (gac)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Juan Eduardo Martinez Velazquez.(gac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Juan Eduardo Martinez Velazquez: Initial Appearance set for 12/11/2024 before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. (no document attached) (fjp)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE David J. Kete appearing for USA. (Kete, David)Attorney David J. Kete added to party USA(pty:pla) (yxc).
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Initial Appearance as to Juan Eduardo Martinez Velazquez held on 12/11/2024. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders provisionally for Juan Eduardo Martinez Velazquez. Financial Affidavit due by PH date. Bond set as to Juan Eduardo Martinez Velazquez (1) $35,000 PS secured by 2 FRRA and $2,000 cash deposit. Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 12/24/24 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Arraignment set for 1/7/25 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt.) (Interpreter Elizabeth Valera, Dan DeCoursey). (CD# 12/11/2024 JLB 24-1:2:25-3:06). (Plaintiff Attorney Kristen Mihelic AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Cindy Muro, Marina Henri FD-S/A). (aje)
Related: [-]
5 5 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Juan Eduardo Martinez Velazquez (no document attached) (aje)
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER as to Juan Eduardo Martinez Velazquez: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 12/11/24. (aje)
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Juan Eduardo Martinez Velazquez (1) $35,000 PS secured by 2 FRRA and $2,000 cash deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 12/11/24. (ecf)
Related: [-]