California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-02614
Case Filed:Dec 11, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Dec 12, 2024 11:23 PM PST
Defendant
Anya Leilani Lasswell (1)
Represented By
Jamie Elizabeth Schmid
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Janaki Gandhi Chopra
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Hunter V. Norton
Doj-Usao
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Allison Rogge
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO May 02 2025
JUDGMENT as to Anya Leilani Lasswell (1), Count(s) 1, Custody of BOP for 21 months, per count to run concurrent. Supervised release for three (3) years, per count to run concurrent. Standard and special conditions reviewed previously with defendant, no objections. Special assessment of $100.00 per count for a total of $200.00 remitted by government. No fine.; Count(s) 2, Custody of BOP for 21 months, per count to run concurrent. Supervised release for three (3) years, per count to run concurrent. Standard and special conditions reviewed previously with defendant, no objections. Special assessment of $100.00 per count for a total of $200.00 remitted by government. No fine.; Count(s) 3, Government oral motion to dismiss remaining count without prejudice is granted.. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo (anh)

Docket last updated: 12/13/2024 12:20 AM PST
Saturday, November 09, 2024
Arrest of Anya Leilani Lasswell (no document attached) (mxl) [3:24-mj-04293-DDL]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
1 1 4 pgs COMPLAINT as to Anya Leilani Lasswell.(mxl) [3:24-mj-04293-DDL]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Anya Leilani Lasswell: Initial Appearance set for 11/12/2024 before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. (no document attached) (gac) [3:24-mj-04293-DDL]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Allison Rogge appearing for USA. (Rogge, Allison)Attorney Allison Rogge added to party USA(pty:pla) (yxc). [3:24-mj-04293-DDL]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner: Initial Appearance as to Anya Leilani Lasswell held on 11/12/2024. Appointed Federal Defenders for Anya Leilani Lasswell. Bond set as to Anya Leilani Lasswell (1) $10,000 PS secured by 1 FRA and $1000 cash deposit. Inpaitent treatment ordered;defendant to be released the following business day upon the posting of bond and when bed space is availabe. Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 11/21/24 at 9:00am before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. Arraignment set for 12/5/24 at 9:00am before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. ) (CD# 11/12/2024 DDL 24-1:2:25;2:48-2:55). (Plaintiff Attorney Alex Biggs AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Christian Mesa, Sam Pope FD-S/A). (aje) [3:24-mj-04293-DDL]
Related: [-]
5 5 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Anya Leilani Lasswell (no document attached) (aje) [3:24-mj-04293-DDL]
Related: [-]
6 6 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Anya Leilani Lasswell (ecf) [3:24-mj-04293-DDL]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Anya Leilani Lasswell (1) $10,000 PS secured by 1 FRA and $1000 cash deposit.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 11/12/24. (ecf) [3:24-mj-04293-DDL]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER as to Anya Leilani Lasswell: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 11/12/24. (aje) [3:24-mj-04293-DDL]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jamie Elizabeth Schmid appearing for Anya Leilani Lasswell (Schmid, Jamie)Attorney Jamie Elizabeth Schmid added to party Anya Leilani Lasswell(pty:dft)(yxc). [3:24-mj-04293-DDL]
Related: [-]
9 9 ***DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER DOCUMENT NOTICE12 *** Notice of Assertion of Rights by Anya Leilani Lasswell (Schmid, Jamie) (yxc). Modified to withdraw on 11/15/2024 (yxc). [3:24-mj-04293-DDL]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
11 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Hunter V. Norton appearing for USA. Removing Allison Rogge (Norton, Hunter)Attorney Hunter V. Norton added to party USA(pty:pla) (yxc). [3:24-mj-04293-DDL]
Related: [-]
12 12 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT filed by Anya Leilani Lasswell Docket #9 (Schmid, Jamie) (yxc). [3:24-mj-04293-DDL]
Related: [-]
13 13 Notice of Assertion of Rights by Anya Leilani Lasswell (Schmid, Jamie) (yxc). [3:24-mj-04293-DDL]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
14 14 Order on Stipulated Continuance of a Preliminary Hearing as to Anya Leilani Lasswell. Preliminary Hearing set for 12/5/2024 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 11/15/2024. (axc1) (jms).[3:24-mj-04293-DDL]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
15 15 BAIL REVIEW PACKET as to Anya Leilani Lasswell. Report prepared by: B. Gomez. (Document applicable to Anya Leilani Lasswell, USA.) (Gomez, B.) [3:24-mj-04293-DDL]
Related: [-]
16 16 P/S Bond Filed as to Anya Leilani Lasswell in amount of $ 10,000, Receipt # 157514. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. (Document applicable to Anya Leilani Lasswell, USA.) (mme) [3:24-mj-04293-DDL]
Related: [-]
17 17 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Anya Leilani Lasswell re16 Bond. (mme) [3:24-mj-04293-DDL]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USM Read Receipt
Monday, December 02, 2024
20 20 NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA. (Norton, Hunter)(jrd) [3:24-mj-04293-DDL]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
21 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner: Status Hearing re Preliminary Hearing/Arraignment as to Anya Leilani Lasswell held on 12/5/2024. Defendant not appearing. Arrest warrant outstanding. (CD# 12/5/2024 DDL 9:05-9:07). (Plaintiff Attorney Alexis Smith Aguilar, AUSA S/A). (Defendant Attorney Jamie Schmid, FD). (no document attached) (mme) [3:24-mj-04293-DDL]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
22 22 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Janaki Gandhi Chopra appearing for USA. (Chopra, Janaki)Attorney Janaki Gandhi Chopra added to party USA(pty:pla)(axc1). [3:24-mj-04293-DDL]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
23 23 2 pgs INDICTMENT as to Anya Leilani Lasswell (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3.(axc1) (jms).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted