District Of Columbia District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00563
Case Filed:Dec 11, 2024
Last checked: Friday Dec 13, 2024 2:15 AM EST
Defendant
CHARLES ORLANDO PRATT, IV (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Pavan S. Krishnamurthy
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Jan 08 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION as to CHARLES ORLANDO PRATT, IV granting in part and denying as moot in part Defendant's motion to clarify 14. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Loren L. AliKhan on 1/8/2025. (mhp) Modified on 1/10/2025 (mhp)

Docket last updated: 12/13/2024 3:01 AM EST
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to CHARLES ORLANDO PRATT, IV (1). (zstd) [1:24-mj-00373-MJS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Redacted Statement of Facts
3 3 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to CHARLES ORLANDO PRATT, IV.(zstd) [1:24-mj-00373-MJS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
4 4 ORDER granting3 Motion to Seal Case as to CHARLES ORLANDO PRATT IV (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Sharbaugh on 12/3/2024. (zstd) [1:24-mj-00373-MJS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
Arrest of CHARLES ORLANDO PRATT, IV in Virginia. (zstd) [1:24-mj-00373-MJS]
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to CHARLES ORLANDO PRATT, IV (zstd) [1:24-mj-00373-MJS]
Related: [-]
5 5 Arrest Warrant, dated 12/3/2024, Returned Executed on 12/4/2024 as to CHARLES ORLANDO PRATT, IV. (zstd) [1:24-mj-00373-MJS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
MINUTE ORDER as to CHARLES ORLANDO PRATT, IV: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant appear for an initial appearance on 12/17/2024 at 12:30 p.m. EST before Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui. The hearing will be conducted by video teleconference; call-in instructions will be provided to counsel prior to the hearing. Counsel for the United States is directed to ensure that counsel for Defendant has received this Order and will provide the information to Defendant. If Defendant does not have counsel, counsel for the United States is directed to contact the Office of the Federal Public Defender for the District of Columbia and provide their office with the information contained in this Order. If the parties have questions about this Order or the scheduled hearing, please contact the Courtroom Deputy at 202-354-3173. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Sharbaugh on 12/11/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Sharbaugh on 12/11/2024. (znjb) [1:24-mj-00373-MJS]
Related: [-]
6 6 INDICTMENT as to CHARLES ORLANDO PRATT, IV (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7. (zstd)
Related: [-]