Florida Middle District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00170
Case Filed:Dec 11, 2024
Last checked: Friday Dec 13, 2024 2:25 AM EST
Defendant
Zay Thomas McCallister (1)
Represented By
George Ellis Summers, Jr.
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Rene Suarez
Suarez, Rios & Weinberg
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Mark Morgan
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/24/2025 10:20 PM EDT
Monday, December 02, 2024
1 1 12 pgs COMPLAINT as to Zay Thomas McCallister (1). (WRW) [2:24-mj-01227-NPM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
4 4 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Zay Thomas McCallister: Initial Appearance set for 12/3/2024 at 03:00 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. (WRW) [2:24-mj-01227-NPM]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORAL MOTION to Appoint Counsel, ORAL MOTION to Continue Detention Hearing by Zay Thomas McCallister. (WRW) [2:24-mj-01227-NPM]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORAL MOTION for Bond by Defendant, ORAL MOTION for Detention AUSA by Zay Thomas McCallister. (WRW) [2:24-mj-01227-NPM]
Related: [-]
8 8 Minute Entry for In Person proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell: granting 6 ORAL Motion to Appoint Counsel as to Zay Thomas McCallister (1); granting 6 ORAL Motion to Continue Detention Hearing as to Zay Thomas McCallister (1); Initial Appearance as to Zay Thomas McCallister held on 12/3/2024. (digital) (WRW) [2:24-mj-01227-NPM]
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE of Standing Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act,[LINK:3:20-mc-20-TJC, Doc 1] as to Zay Thomas McCallister: Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States' disclosure obligation under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny and orders the United States to comply with that obligation. Violating this order may result in consequences, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, and other sanctions. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan. (WRW) [2:24-mj-01227-NPM]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Zay Thomas McCallister. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 12/3/2024. (WRW) [2:24-mj-01227-NPM]
Related: [-]
12 12 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Zay Thomas McCallister: Detention Hearing set for 12/5/2024 at 03:00 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. (WRW) [2:24-mj-01227-NPM]
Related: [-]
13 13 ***CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Zay Thomas McCallister. (WRW) [2:24-mj-01227-NPM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
14 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: George Ellis Summers, Jr. appearing for Zay Thomas McCallister. (Summers, George) [2:24-mj-01227-NPM]
Related: [-]
15 15 4 pgs CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Defendant, Zay Thomas McCallister (Summers, George) [2:24-mj-01227-NPM] Modified on 12/12/2024 to edit text (FLY).
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
16 16 1 pgs EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Zay Thomas McCallister (Morgan, Mark) [2:24-mj-01227-NPM]
Related: [-]
17 17 Minute Entry for In Person proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell: granting 7 Motion for Bond as to Zay Thomas McCallister (1); denying 7 Motion for Detention as to Zay Thomas McCallister (1); DETENTION HEARING as to Zay Thomas McCallister held on 12/5/2024. (digital) (WRW) [2:24-mj-01227-NPM]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 12/5/2024. (WRW) [2:24-mj-01227-NPM]
Related: [-]
21 21 1 pgs EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Zay Thomas McCallister.(WRW) [2:24-mj-01227-NPM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit
Friday, December 06, 2024
20 20 1 pgs ARREST Warrant Returned Executed on 12/3/2024 as to Zay Thomas McCallister. (JTM) [2:24-mj-01227-NPM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
23 23 ENDORSED ORDER granting 22 government's motion to seal. The clerk will maintain Doc. 22 and its exhibit under seal. The clerk is directed to separately docket Doc. 22-1 under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 12/10/2024. [2:24-mj-01227-NPM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
24 24 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Zay Thomas McCallister: Pretrial Release Revocation Hearing set for 12/13/2024 at 10:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. (WRW) [2:24-mj-01227-NPM]
Related: [-]
25 25 5 pgs INDICTMENT returned in open court as to Zay Thomas McCallister (1) count(s) 1-3. (ABM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Restricted Unredacted Indictment