Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Paul L Maloney
Referred: Phillip J Green
Case #: 1:24-cv-01308
Nature of Suit385 Torts - Personal Property - Property Damage Product Liability
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2024
Case in other court:Kent County Circuit Court, 24-09459-CZ
Last checked: Monday Jan 27, 2025 3:51 AM EST
defendant
Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.
Represented By
David T. Bowen
Bowen, Radabaugh & Milton, P.C. (troy)
contact info
plaintiff
Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company
Represented By
Steven M. Braun
Law Offiices Of Greig, Kennedy, Seifert & Fitzgibbons
contact info
Walter J. Fitzgibbons
Law Offices Of Greig Kennedy Seifert & Fitzgibbons
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
24 24 motion Leave to File Document Tue 04/29 12:10 PM
MOTION for leave to file Third-Party Complaint by plaintiff Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company ; (Bowen, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Third-Party Complaint,
Att: 2 Certificate of Concurrence
Thursday, April 17, 2025
23 23 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/17 9:36 AM
REVISED CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. identifying T Rowe Price and Vanguard Group for Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. (Bowen, David) Modified text on 4/17/2025 (mlc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
adr Facilitative Mediation - Fee Received Mon 03/31 4:10 PM
VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 47205 as to defendant Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. (jmw)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
22 22 adr Facilitative Mediation - Notice of Appointment of Facilitative Mediator Mon 03/24 9:46 AM
NOTICE of appointment of Facilitative Mediator Lee T. Silver; plaintiff VFM fee to be submitted by 3/31/2025 defendant VFM fee to be submitted by 3/31/2025 (kmd)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/17 12:48 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Steven Braun by plaintiff Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company (Fitzgibbons, Walter)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
20 20 adr Facilitative Mediation - Notice of Selection of Facilitative Mediator Mon 03/10 10:04 AM
SELECTION of Lee T. Silver as facilitative mediator by defendant Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. (Bowen, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
19 19 order Case Management Order Thu 02/06 1:31 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 1/30/2026; dispositive motions due by 3/2/2026; settlement conference set for 8/12/2026 at 10:30 AM at 499 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; final pretrial conference set for 9/28/2026 at 09:30 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; jury trial set for 10/19/2026 at 08:45 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Thu 02/06 1:59 PM
Copy of Case Management Order,19 sent via U.S. Mail to Steven M. Braun (mlc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
18 18 minutes Scheduling Conference - Rule 16 Wed 02/05 3:58 PM
MINUTES held before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green of Rule 16 scheduling conference via Zoom; CMO to issue (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (ald)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
17 17 misc Restricted Access Court Document Mon 02/03 12:40 PM
(RESTRICTED ACCESS) DOCUMENT Video Conference Information regarding the February 5, 2025, Rule 16 Conference. [Access to this document is available to the Court and attorney(s) for Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company, Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. only] (jkw)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs order Order Rescheduling Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Mon 02/03 12:31 PM
ORDER rescheduling Rule 16 conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 2/5/2025 at 03:30 PM by video before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Notice Cancelling Hearing Mon 02/03 9:16 AM
NOTICE cancelling hearing: the 2/3/2025 Rule 16 scheduling conference is rescheduled to a date to be determined (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Mon 02/03 11:12 AM
Copy of Notice Cancelling Hearing15 sent via U.S. Mail to Steven M. Braun (ns)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Mon 02/03 12:39 PM
Copy of Order Rescheduling Rule 16 Conference16 and Document17 sent via U.S. Mail to Steven M. Braun (ns) Modified text on 2/3/2025 (ns)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
14 14 misc Joint Status Report (Rule 16) Wed 01/29 4:15 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT (Bowen, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/21 2:55 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by plaintiff Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company (Fitzgibbons, Walter)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 01/21 2:50 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company [Attorney Walter J. Fitzgibbons added to party Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company (pty:pla)] (Fitzgibbons, Walter)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
11 11 misc Attorney Admission Letter (Second Notice) Fri 01/17 2:10 PM
ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER - SECOND NOTICE sent to attorney Steven M. Braun; attorney admission deadline set for 2/14/2025; (jjm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
10 10 4 pgs order Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Telephone Tue 12/31 12:00 PM
ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 2/3/2025 at 09:30 AM before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; status report due by 1/29/2025; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Tue 12/31 1:50 PM
Copy of Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Telephone,10 sent via U.S. Mail to Steven M. Braun (mlc)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order for Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 12/30 10:20 AM
ORDER that plaintiff Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company file a corporate disclosure statement within 7 days; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Mon 12/30 10:50 AM
Copy of Order for Corporate Disclosure Statement9 sent via U.S. Mail to Steven M. Braun (slk)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
8 8 service Certificate of Mailing Fri 12/20 2:37 PM
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by defendant Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. re Answer to Complaint7 Special and/or Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Jury Trial (Bowen, David)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/20 2:36 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to complaint with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. (Bowen, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
6 6 misc Attorney Admission Letter Thu 12/19 8:18 AM
CORRECTED ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Steven M. Braun; attorney admission deadline set for 1/16/2025; (mlc) Modified text on 12/19/2024; updated address (mlc)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Thu 12/19 8:20 AM
Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case4 resent via U.S. Mail to Steven M. Braun due to corrected address of 28411 Northwestern Hwy., Suite 640Southfield, MI 48034 (mlc)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
5 5 misc Attorney Admission Letter Mon 12/16 9:54 AM
ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Steven M. Braun; attorney admission deadline set for 1/13/2025; (mlc)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Mon 12/16 9:47 AM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee (mlc)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Mon 12/16 9:49 AM
Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case4 sent via U.S. Mail to Steven M. Braun (mlc)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment Mon 12/16 12:10 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7566966 [Attorney David T. Bowen added to party Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company (pty:pla)] (Bowen, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
3 3 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/13 11:41 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. (Bowen, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Certificate of Service Fri 12/13 11:02 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. re Notice of Removal1 (Bowen, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 12/13 11:01 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County Circuit Court case number 24-09459 CZ filed by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. (Bowen, David)
Related: [-]