New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kyu Young Paek
Case #: 7:24-bk-23086
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Valdesia Gardens Housing Development Fund Corporation
48 Carthage Rd
Scarsdale, NY 10583-7010
Represented By
Jonathan S. Pasternak
Davidoff Hutcher & Citron LLP
contact info
John D. Molino
Davidoff Hutcher & Citron LLP
contact info
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 7:26 PM EDT
Attorney
Davidoff Hutcher & Citron LLP
605 Third Avenue, 34th Floor
New York, NY 10158
Represented By
Jonathan S. Pasternak
Davidoff Hutcher & Citron LLP
contact info
Creditor
CPC Funding SPE 1 LLC
Windels Marx Lane & Mittendorf, LLP Eloy A. Peral 156 West 56th Street
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
Mark A Slama
Windels Marx Lane & Mittendorf, LLP
contact info
Daniel Farrell Corrigan
Windels Marx, Lane & Mittendorf LLP
contact info
Eloy A. Peral
Windels Marx Lane & Mittendorf LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Robert A. Abrams
605 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10158
Represented By
Steven H. Newman
Katsky Korins LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee - NY Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green, Room 534
New York, NY 10004
Represented By
Tara Tiantian
Doj-Ust
contact info
Daniel Rudewicz
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
45 45 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Wed 05/21 4:40 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 04/30/2025 Filed by Jonathan S. Pasternak on behalf of Valdesia Gardens Housing Development Fund Corporation. (Pasternak, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
44 44 misc Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Thu 05/15 10:47 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing RE: Case Conference; hearing held and adjourned to 6/12/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (KYP) (Ashmeade, Vanessa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
43 43 misc Letter Thu 05/08 11:11 AM
Letter Exhibit H to Motion of CPC Funding SPE 1 LLC For An Order Modifying Or Terminating The Automatic Stay Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. § 362(d)(1)-(3) Related [+] Filed by Eloy A. Peral on behalf of CPC Funding SPE 1 LLC. (Peral, Eloy)
Related: [-] 42
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
42 42 28 pgs motion Motion, Relief from Stay (fee) Wed 05/07 6:59 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay : Motion of CPC Funding SPE 1 LLC For An Order Modifying Or Terminating The Automatic Stay Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. § 362(d)(1)-(3) filed by Eloy A. Peral on behalf of CPC Funding SPE 1 LLC with hearing to be held on 6/12/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 610 (KYP - NYC) Responses due by 6/5/2025,. (Peral, Eloy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Eloy A. Peral
Att: 2 Exhibit A: Verified Amended Complaint in Foreclosure (with exhibits) filed by CPC on September 28, 2022
Att: 3 Exhibit B: Original Complaint (without exhibits)
Att: 4 Exhibit C: Decision and Order entered by the State Court on November 15, 2023
Att: 5 Exhibit D: Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale entered by the State Court on September 19, 2024 Awarding CPC Certain Relief
Att: 6 Exhibit E: Notice of Sale Dated October 28, 2024 Scheduling a Foreclosure Sale of the Real Property for December 16, 2024
Att: 7 Exhibit F: Affirmation Of Mark A. Slama In Support Of Ex Parte Application For The Appointment Of A Receiver dated August 17, 2022
Att: 8 Exhibit G: Order Appointing Receiver at Mortgaged Premises and Appointment of Receivers Counsel entered by the State Court on October 14, 2022
Att: 9 Exhibit H: Appraisal Report prepared by Republic Valuations dated January 27, 2025 at the Direction of the Debtor to be Filed Separately
Att: 10 Exhibit I: Appraisal dated September 22, 2022 prepared by Anthony T. Panzarino at the Direction of CPC
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Wed 05/07 7:02 PM
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay (fee)([LINK 24-23086 kyp] ) [motion,185] ( 199.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A17065741. Fee amount 199.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #42
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
41 41 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Wed 04/30 3:39 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by Jonathan S. Pasternak on behalf of Valdesia Gardens Housing Development Fund Corporation. (Pasternak, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
trustee Notice of Continuance of Meeting of Creditors Mon 04/21 11:00 AM
Notice of Continuance of Meeting of Creditors Filed by Daniel Rudewicz on behalf of United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/29/2025 at 02:00 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Rudewicz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
40 40 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Mon 04/14 3:03 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Continued Status Conference filed by Jonathan S. Pasternak on behalf of Valdesia Gardens Housing Development Fund Corporation. with hearing to be held on 5/15/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (KYP) (Pasternak, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
39 39 misc Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Mon 04/14 2:47 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing RE: Case Conference; hearing not held and adjourned to 05/15/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (KYP) (VanessaAshmeade)
Related: [-]
trustee Notice of Continuance of Meeting of Creditors Mon 04/14 1:47 PM
Notice of Continuance of Meeting of Creditors Filed by Daniel Rudewicz on behalf of United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/22/2025 at 01:00 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Rudewicz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
trustee Notice of Continuance of Meeting of Creditors Fri 04/11 10:37 AM
Notice of Continuance of Meeting of Creditors Filed by Daniel Rudewicz on behalf of United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/21/2025 at 01:00 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Rudewicz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
trustee Notice of Continuance of Meeting of Creditors Wed 04/09 12:05 PM
Notice of Continuance of Meeting of Creditors Filed by Daniel Rudewicz on behalf of United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/14/2025 at 01:00 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Rudewicz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
trustee Notice of Continuance of Meeting of Creditors Wed 03/26 11:35 AM
Notice of Continuance of Meeting of Creditors Filed by Daniel Rudewicz on behalf of United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/10/2025 at 02:00 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Rudewicz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
38 38 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 03/24 9:34 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 02/28/2025 Filed by Jonathan S. Pasternak on behalf of Valdesia Gardens Housing Development Fund Corporation. (Pasternak, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
trustee Notice of Continuance of Meeting of Creditors Thu 03/20 1:28 PM
Notice of Continuance of Meeting of Creditors Filed by Daniel Rudewicz on behalf of United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/27/2025 at 01:30 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Rudewicz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
37 37 19 pgs plan Disclosure Statement Mon 03/10 11:10 AM
Disclosure Statement filed by Jonathan S. Pasternak on behalf of Valdesia Gardens Housing Development Fund Corporation.(Pasternak, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Plan
36 36 plan Chapter 11 Plan Mon 03/10 11:10 AM
Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization filed by Jonathan S. Pasternak on behalf of Valdesia Gardens Housing Development Fund Corporation. (Pasternak, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
35 35 misc Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Thu 02/27 11:48 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing re: Case Conference held and adjourned to 4/24/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (KYP) (DuBois, Linda)
Related: [-]
misc Terminate Pending Deadlines Thu 02/27 11:46 AM
Pending Deadlines Terminated re: Amended Notice of Proposed Order Amended Notice Of Presentment Of Proposed Stipulation And Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. § 543(D)(1) Excusing State Court Receiver From Provisions Of 11 U.S.C. § 543(A) And (B) And Granting Related Relief Related [+] filed by Eloy A. Peral on behalf of CPC Funding SPE 1 LLC; WITHDRAWN. (DuBois, Linda)
Related: [-] 16
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
34 34 misc Letter Wed 02/26 3:50 PM
Letter Status Report for February 27, 2025 Hearing Filed by Jonathan S. Pasternak on behalf of Valdesia Gardens Housing Development Fund Corporation. (Pasternak, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
33 33 ans Response Wed 02/26 2:28 PM
Response Reply to Debtors Response to the United States Trustees Objection to the Stipulation and Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 543(d)(1) excusing state court receiver from provisions of 11 U.S.C. § 543(a) and Motion to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Related [+] filed by Tara Tiantian on behalf of United States Trustee. (Tiantian, Tara)
Related: [-] 25
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
32 32 ans Objection Tue 02/25 4:34 PM
Objection Response to US Trustee's Objection to 543 Stipulation and Cross -Motion for Appointment of Chapter 11 Trustee Related [+] filed by Jonathan S. Pasternak on behalf of Valdesia Gardens Housing Development Fund Corporation. (Pasternak, Jonathan)
Related: [-] 25
Att: 1 Exhibit Property Management Agreement
Thursday, February 20, 2025
31 31 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Thu 02/20 10:14 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 01/31/2025 Filed by John D. Molino on behalf of Valdesia Gardens Housing Development Fund Corporation. (Molino, John)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Thu 02/20 10:12 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 12/31/2024 Filed by John D. Molino on behalf of Valdesia Gardens Housing Development Fund Corporation. (Molino, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
29 29 misc Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Wed 02/12 3:00 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing RE: Case conference hearing held and adjourned to 2/27/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (KYP) (Kinchen, Gwen)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
28 28 4 pgs order Order RE: Application, Employ Mon 02/10 4:46 PM
Order Granting Application to Employ Davidoff Hutcher & Citron LLP as Attorneys for the Debtor Related [+] signed on 2/10/2025. (Kinchen, Gwen)
Related: [-] 15
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
27 27 misc Certificate of Service Tue 02/04 10:29 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Daniel Rudewicz on behalf of United States Trustee. (Rudewicz, Daniel)
Related: [-] 26 ,25
Friday, January 24, 2025
26 26 notice Notice, Hearing Fri 01/24 1:56 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by Daniel Rudewicz on behalf of United States Trustee. with hearing to be held on 2/27/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (KYP) (Rudewicz, Daniel)
Related: [-] 20 ,25
25 25 answer Objection Fri 01/24 1:52 PM
Objection to Motion United States Trustees (I) Objection to the Stipulation and Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. § 543(D)(1) Excusing State Court Receiver from Provisions Of 11 U.S.C. § 543(A) And (B) And Granting Related Relief and (II) Motion to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee filed by Daniel Rudewicz on behalf of United States Trustee. with hearing to be held on 2/27/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (KYP) (Rudewicz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment Fri 01/24 12:20 PM
Notice of Presentment of Order Authorizing Retention and Employment of Davidoff Hutcher & Citron LLP as Attorneys for the Debtor and Debtor in Possession Effective as of December 13, 2024 Related [+] filed by Jonathan S. Pasternak on behalf of Valdesia Gardens Housing Development Fund Corporation. with presentment to be held on 2/7/2025 at 12:00 PM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (KYP) Objections due by 1/31/2025,(Pasternak, Jonathan)
Related: [-] 15
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service
Thursday, January 23, 2025
23 23 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 01/23 1:53 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Jonathan S. Pasternak on behalf of Valdesia Gardens Housing Development Fund Corporation. (Pasternak, Jonathan)
Related: [-] 22
22 22 order Motion, Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Thu 01/23 9:20 AM
Order Granting Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Related [+] signed on 1/23/2025. Proofs of Claim due by 3/3/2025. (Kinchen, Gwen)
Related: [-] 5
trustee Notice of Continuance of Meeting of Creditors Thu 01/23 2:00 PM
Notice of Continuance of Meeting of Creditors Filed by Daniel Rudewicz on behalf of United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/20/2025 at 01:30 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Rudewicz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
21 21 misc Affidavit Wed 01/22 4:27 PM
Affidavit Declaration Regarding Disclosure of 2025 Hourly Rate Increases Filed by Jonathan S. Pasternak on behalf of Davidoff Hutcher & Citron LLP. (Pasternak, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
20 20 notice Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment Wed 01/15 5:54 PM
Amended Notice of Proposed Order Amended Notice Of Presentment Of Proposed Stipulation And Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. § 543(D)(1) Excusing State Court Receiver From Provisions Of 11 U.S.C. § 543(A) And (B) And Granting Related Relief Related [+] filed by Eloy A. Peral on behalf of CPC Funding SPE 1 LLC. with presentment to be held on 1/27/2025 (check with court for location) Objections due by 1/24/2025, (Peral, Eloy)
Related: [-] 16
Friday, January 10, 2025
19 19 answer Declaration Fri 01/10 1:57 PM
Supplemental Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of an Order Authorizing The Retention and Employment of Davidoff Hutcher & Citron LLP as Attorneys for the Debtor and Debtor in Possession Effective as of December 13, 2024 Related [+] filed by Jonathan S. Pasternak on behalf of Valdesia Gardens Housing Development Fund Corporation. (Pasternak, Jonathan)
Related: [-] 15
Thursday, January 09, 2025
18 18 notice Notice, Appearance Thu 01/09 1:21 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Steven H. Newman on behalf of Robert A. Abrams. (Newman, Steven)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 01/09 12:12 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Eloy A. Peral on behalf of CPC Funding SPE 1 LLC. (Peral, Eloy)
Related: [-] 16
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
16 16 notice Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment Wed 01/08 3:52 PM
Notice of Proposed Order ; Notice of Presentment of Proposed Stipulation and Order Pursuant to 11 USC 543 (d)(1) Excusing State Court Receiver from Provisions of 11 USC 543 (a) and (b) and Granting Related Relief filed by Eloy A. Peral on behalf of CPC Funding SPE 1 LLC. with presentment to be held on 1/20/2025 at 12:00 PM at Poughkeepsie Courthouse - 355 Main Street (KYP) Objections due by 1/17/2025,(Peral, Eloy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Stipulation and Order Pursuant to 11 USC 543(d)(1) Excusing State Court Receiver from Provisions of 11 USC 543(a) and (b); and Granting Related Relief
Monday, January 06, 2025
15 15 10 pgs motion Application, Employ Mon 01/06 5:04 PM
Application to Employ Davidoff Hutcher & Citron LLP as Attorneys for the Debtor Effective as of December 13, 2024 filed by Jonathan S. Pasternak on behalf of Valdesia Gardens Housing Development Fund Corporation Responses due by 1/14/2025, with presentment to be held on 1/21/2025 (check with court for location). (Pasternak, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Friday, January 03, 2025
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Fri 01/03 12:19 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Jonathan S. Pasternak on behalf of Valdesia Gardens Housing Development Fund Corporation. (Pasternak, Jonathan)
Related: [-] 13
Thursday, January 02, 2025
13 13 order Scheduling Order Thu 01/02 5:07 PM
Order signed on 1/2/2025 scheduling initial case conference with hearing to be held on 2/11/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (KYP) (Kinchen, Gwen)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Scheduling Order Thu 01/02 5:00 PM
Disregard - See Document # 13 Scheduling Order signed on 1/2/2025. Initial Case Conference to be held on 2/11/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (KYP) (DuBois, Linda) Modified on 1/2/2025 (Fredericks, Frances)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice, Meeting of Creditors Thu 01/02 3:22 PM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors NOTICE OF ADJOURNMENT OF SECTION 341 MEETING OF CREDITORS Related [+] filed by Daniel Rudewicz on behalf of United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/23/2025 at 01:30 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Rudewicz, Daniel)
Related: [-] 6
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
10 10 notice Notice, Appearance Wed 12/18 5:24 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Mark A Slama on behalf of CPC Funding SPE 1 LLC. (Slama, Mark)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice, Appearance Wed 12/18 5:21 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Daniel Farrell Corrigan on behalf of CPC Funding SPE 1 LLC. (Corrigan, Daniel)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice, Appearance Wed 12/18 5:16 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Eloy A. Peral on behalf of CPC Funding SPE 1 LLC. (Peral, Eloy)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment Wed 12/18 1:25 PM
Notice of Presentment of Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Related [+] filed by Jonathan S. Pasternak on behalf of Valdesia Gardens Housing Development Fund Corporation. with presentment to be held on 1/2/2025 at 12:00 PM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (PB) Objections due by 12/26/2024,(Pasternak, Jonathan)
Related: [-] 5
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
6 6 notice Notice, Meeting of Creditors Tue 12/17 2:47 PM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors INSTRUCTIONS FOR TELEPHONIC SECTION 341 MEETING OF CREDITORS filed by Daniel Rudewicz on behalf of United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/9/2025 at 01:30 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Rudewicz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
5 5 6 pgs motion Motion, Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Tue 12/17 2:13 PM
Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim filed by John D. Molino on behalf of Valdesia Gardens Housing Development Fund Corporation Responses due by 12/26/2024,. (Molino, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Sunday, December 15, 2024
4 4 misc Certificate of Mailing - 341(a) Meeting Mon 12/16 12:08 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors Related [+] . Notice Date 12/15/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #3 )
Friday, December 13, 2024
3 3 misc 341(a) Notice (Chapter 11) (BNC) Fri 12/13 4:19 PM
Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/9/2025 at 01:30 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Vargas, Ana)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Affidavit Pursuant to LR 1007-2 Fri 12/13 12:08 PM
Affidavit Pursuant to LR 1007-2 Filed by Jonathan S. Pasternak on behalf of Valdesia Gardens Housing Development Fund Corporation. (Pasternak, Jonathan)Modified on 12/13/2024 (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]
1 1 35 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 12/13 11:47 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Schedules of Assets and Liabilities, Statement of Financial Affairs, 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, List of Equity Security Holders, Corporate Disclsure Statement, 2016(b) Statement Chapter 11 Plan due by 4/14/2025, Disclosure Statement due by 4/14/2025, Initial Case Conference due by 1/13/2025, Filed by Jonathan S. Pasternak of Davidoff Hutcher & Citron LLP on behalf of Valdesia Gardens Housing Development Corporation. (Pasternak, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Fri 12/13 11:50 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-23086 ) [misc,824] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16900436. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1
misc Add Judge Fri 12/13 11:52 AM
Judge Kyu Young Paek added to the case. (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]