New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Pamela K Chen
Case #: 1:24-cv-08526
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 27, 2025 3:54 AM EST
Defendant
Chase Cardholder Services
Represented By
Christopher B. Turcotte
Turcotte Law, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Maurizio De Rosa
2922 Northern Boulevard Apt. 1603
Long Island City, NY 11101


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
17 17 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 04/28 2:54 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Turcotte, Christopher)
Related: [-]
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/28 2:49 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Plaintiff filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Turcotte, Christopher)
Related: [-]
15 15 20 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Mon 04/28 2:45 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Turcotte, Christopher)
Related: [-]
14 14 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 04/28 2:39 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Brian J. Hughes filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Turcotte, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (Business Card Agreement),
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 (De Rosa Credit Card Application),
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 (6-5-24 Chase Letter to De Rosa)
13 13 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 04/28 2:32 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Christopher B. Turcotte filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Turcotte, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (State Summons & Complaint),
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 (Amended Complaint),
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 (6-9-22 De Rosa Affidavit),
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 (5-25-22 Bondi Affidavit),
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 (6-20-23 De Rosa Affidavit)
12 12 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 04/28 2:22 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Turcotte, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
11 11 respoth Reply in Opposition Wed 04/16 4:03 PM
REPLY In Opposition To Defendants'7 letter motion filed by Maurizio De Rosa. (MLR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
10 10 misc Letter Thu 03/13 5:05 PM
Letter Copying the Honorable Pamela K. Chen re: Service of Chase's FRCP 12(b)(6) Motion upon Plaintiff by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Turcotte, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
9 9 misc Pro Se Consent to Electronic Notification Fri 02/14 10:54 AM
Pro Se Consent to Electronic Notification filed by Maurizio De Rosa. (SG)
Related: [-]
utility Email Test Fri 02/14 10:56 AM
Email Notification Test - DO NOT REPLY (SG)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 02/10 4:56 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed by Maurizio De Rosa. (MLR) (Main Document 8 replaced on 2/10/2025)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
minutes Pre Motion Conference Tue 01/28 2:36 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Pamela K. Chen: Pre-Motion Conference held on 1/28/2025. Appearances by Maurizio De Rosa for himself, and Christopher Turcotte for Defendant. Case called. Discussion held. The following deadlines were set: Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint by 2/11/2025 ; Defendant shall serve its proposed motion to dismiss by 3/13/2025 ; Plaintiff shall serve his response by 4/14/2025 ; and Defendant shall serve its reply, if any, by 4/28/2025 . As a courtesy to the Court, the parties are encouraged to file their motion papers only once the motion is fully briefed. If the parties follow this practice, the motion (or opposition/reply) and all supporting papers are to be served on the other party along with a cover letter setting forth the filer and the papers being served. Only a copy of the cover letter should be filed with the Court, as a letter, not as a motion. On the day the motion is fully briefed, Defendant shall electronically file both parties' motion papers. (Court Reporter Linda Marino.) (AGA)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
7 7 motion Pre Motion Conference Mon 01/06 12:25 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference addressed to the Honorable Pamela K. Chen by Chase Cardholder Services. (Turcotte, Christopher)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Mon 01/06 4:23 PM
ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's6 letter motion requesting a pre-motion conference on Defendant's motion to dismiss. The request is granted. A pre-motion conference will be held on January 28, 2025 at 12:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4F North. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 1/6/2025. (AGA)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - Declined Mon 12/23 11:06 AM
NOTICE to Assign District Judge: The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case to a district judge. (MED)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 12/23 1:17 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi. Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi no longer assigned as presider to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (DA)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
6 6 motion Pre Motion Conference Fri 12/20 4:18 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference in contemplation of Chase filing a Rule 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss Plaintiff's complaint by Chase Cardholder Services. (Turcotte, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
5 5 service Certificate of Service Mon 12/16 11:24 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chase Cardholder Services of Notice of Removal, Rule 7.1 Statement, Civil Cover Sheet, and Individual Rules of the Honorable Lara K. Eshkenazi, U.S.M.J. upon Plaintiff (Turcotte, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
4 4 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 12/13 3:40 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SDM)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Opportunity to Consent Fri 12/13 3:38 PM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (SDM)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/13 11:48 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chase Cardholder Services identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for Chase Cardholder Services. (Turcotte, Christopher)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 12/13 11:42 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chase Cardholder Services from Queen County Supreme Court, case number 722976/2024. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANYEDC-18579772) (Turcotte, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (State Summons & Complaint),
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 12/13 3:36 PM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SDM)
Related: [-]
misc ECF Admission and Registration Notification - Removal Fri 12/13 3:39 PM
This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (SDM)
Related: [-]