California Southern District Court
Judge:M James Lorenz
Referred: David D Leshner
Case #: 3:24-cv-02320
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332fr Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Dec 12, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 26, 2025 1:08 AM PST
Defendant
Internet Referral Services, LLC
Defendant
Red Dog Media, Inc.
Defendant
Ticket Fulfillment Services, L.P.
Represented By
David J Noonan
Noonan Lance Boyer & Banach LLP
contact info
Defendant
Vivid Seats Inc.
Plaintiff
Margaret Franklin-Chomas
Represented By
Michael R. Reese
Reese LLP
contact info
Ben Travis
Ben Travis Law, Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
34 34 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 04/25 7:35 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re26 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay Litigation Or, Alternatively, Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay filed by Margaret Franklin-Chomas.(Travis, Ben)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Ben Travis,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Ben Travis,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Ben Travis,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Ben Travis,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Ben Travis,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Ben Travis
33 33 respoth Sealed Lodged Proposed Document Fri 04/25 7:31 PM
SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re:32 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Travis, Ben)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Motion to File Documents Under Seal Fri 04/25 7:25 PM
MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Travis, Ben)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
31 31 misc Pro Hac Vice Approved - Clerk Fri 03/14 12:49 PM
PRO HAC APPROVED: Charles D. Moore appearing for Plaintiff Margaret Franklin-Chomas (no document attached) (exs)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/14 12:17 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-19697480.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Moore, Charles) (exs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/13 2:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Patrick Hawley on behalf of Internet Referral Services, LLC, Red Dog Media, Inc. (Hawley, Jonathan)Attorney Jonathan Patrick Hawley added to party Internet Referral Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Patrick Hawley added to party Red Dog Media, Inc.(pty:dft) (rmc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
28 28 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 03/12 11:31 AM
ORDER Granting27 Joint Motion for Special Briefing Schedule. Plaintiff shall have 45 days to respond to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay Litigation or, Alternatively, Dismiss; and Defendants shall have 21 days to reply following service of Plaintiff's response. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/12/2025. (rmc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
27 27 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 03/11 5:27 PM
Joint MOTION special briefing schedule re26 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay Litigation Or, Alternatively, Dismiss by Internet Referral Services, LLC, Red Dog Media, Inc., Ticket Fulfillment Services, L.P., Vivid Seats Inc..(Sipos, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
26 26 motion Compel Tue 03/11 5:23 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay Litigation Or, Alternatively, Dismiss by Internet Referral Services, LLC, Red Dog Media, Inc., Ticket Fulfillment Services, L.P., Vivid Seats Inc..(Sipos, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Declaration of Bryce Landier,
Att: 3 Declaration of Charles Sipos (Redacted),
Att: 4 Declaration of Timothy Hardwicke,
Att: 5 Proof of Service
25 25 respoth Sealed Lodged Proposed Document Tue 03/11 5:09 PM
SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re:24 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Sipos, Charles)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Motion to File Documents Under Seal Tue 03/11 5:06 PM
MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Sipos, Charles)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Tue 03/11 5:02 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Red Dog Media, Inc. . Identifying Other Affiliate Internet Referral Services, LLC, Other Affiliate Ticket Fulfillment Services, L.P., Other Affiliate Vivid Seats Inc., Other Affiliate Ticket Website LLC, Other Affiliate Vivid Seats LLC, Other Affiliate Hoya Midco, LLC, Other Affiliate Hoya Intermediate, LLC, Other Affiliate Hoya Topco, LLC, Other Affiliate CM6B Vivid Equity, Inc., Other Affiliate SNWLN Ventures Intermediate II LLC, Other Affiliate Margaret Franklin-Chomas, Other Affiliate Red Dog Media, LLC (f/k/a Red Dog Media, Inc.) for Red Dog Media, Inc..(Sipos, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
22 22 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/11 4:56 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Red Dog Media, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent SNWLN Ventures Intermediate II LLC for Red Dog Media, Inc...(Sipos, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
21 21 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Tue 03/11 4:55 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Internet Referral Services, LLC . Identifying Other Affiliate Internet Referral Services, LLC, Other Affiliate Ticket Fulfillment Services, L.P., Other Affiliate Vivid Seats Inc., Other Affiliate Ticket Website LLC, Other Affiliate Vivid Seats LLC, Other Affiliate Hoya Midco, LLC, Other Affiliate Hoya Intermediate, LLC, Other Affiliate Hoya Topco, LLC, Other Affiliate CM6B Vivid Equity, Inc., Other Affiliate SNWLN Ventures Intermediate II LLC, Other Affiliate Margaret Franklin-Chomas, Other Affiliate Red Dog Media, LLC (f/k/a Red Dog Media, Inc.) for Internet Referral Services, LLC.(Sipos, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
20 20 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/11 4:47 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Internet Referral Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent SNWLN Ventures Intermediate II LLC for Internet Referral Services, LLC..(Sipos, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
19 19 misc Pro Hac Vice Approved - Clerk Tue 02/18 8:11 AM
PRO HAC APPROVED: Kathryn L. Couey appearing for Defendant Ticket Fulfillment Services, L.P. (no document attached) (exs)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
18 18 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/17 1:01 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Couey, Kathryn) ***QC Mailer sent re: incomplete application*** (exs)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Fri 02/14 4:48 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Vivid Seats Inc. re16 Corporate Disclosure Statement . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Noonan, David)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 02/14 4:46 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vivid Seats Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Noonan, David)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Fri 02/14 4:45 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Ticket Fulfillment Services, L.P. re14 Corporate Disclosure Statement, . Identifying Other Affiliate Vivid Seats Inc., Other Affiliate Ticket Fulfillment Services L.P., Other Affiliate Ticket Website LLC, Other Affiliate Vivid Seats LLC, Other Affiliate Hoya Midco, LLC, Other Affiliate Hoya Intermediate, LLC, Other Affiliate CM6B Vivid Equity, Inc., Other Affiliate Hoya Topco. LLC for Ticket Fulfillment Services, L.P.. (Noonan, David)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 02/14 4:34 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ticket Fulfillment Services, L.P. identifying Other Affiliate Vivid Seats Inc., Other Affiliate Ticket Fulfillment Services L.P., Other Affiliate Ticket Website LLC, Other Affiliate Vivid Seats LLC, Other Affiliate Hoya Midco, LLC, Other Affiliate Hoya Intermediate, LLC, Other Affiliate Hoya Topco, LLC, Other Affiliate CM6B Vivid Equity, Inc. for Ticket Fulfillment Services, L.P... (Noonan, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
13 13 misc Pro Hac Vice Approved - Clerk Thu 02/13 8:41 PM
PRO HAC APPROVED: Miranda E. Wargo appearing for Defendants Ticket Fulfillment Services, L.P., Vivid Seats Inc. (no document attached) (exs)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Pro Hac Vice Approved - Clerk Thu 02/13 8:33 PM
PRO HAC APPROVED: Timothy B. Hardwicke appearing for Defendants Ticket Fulfillment Services, L.P., Vivid Seats Inc. (no document attached) (exs)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/13 12:47 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-19603167.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Hardwicke, Timothy) (exs)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/13 12:42 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-19603130.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Hardwicke, Timothy) ***QC Mailer sent re: incomplete application*** (exs)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/13 12:34 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-19603114.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Hardwicke, Timothy) (exs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 02/12 10:40 AM
ORDER Granting7 Joint Motion to Extend Time. Good cause appearing, the Court grants the parties' joint motion and directs Internet Referral Services, LLC, to file a responsive pleading no later than 3/11/2025. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 2/12/2025. (rmc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Tue 02/11 6:23 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Respond to Class Action Complaint by Internet Referral Services, LLC, Red Dog Media, Inc.. (Sipos, Charles)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 02/11 10:56 AM
ORDER Denying5 Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Class Action Complaint. As a courtesy, Internet Referral Services LLC's due date to respond to the Complaint is extended until 2/18/2025. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 2/11/2025. (rmc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Mon 02/10 4:15 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Respond to Class Action Complaint by Internet Referral Services, LLC, Red Dog Media, Inc.. (Sipos, Charles)Attorney Charles C. Sipos added to party Internet Referral Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Charles C. Sipos added to party Red Dog Media, Inc.(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 01/13 8:56 AM
ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Class Action Complaint3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Internet Referral Services, LLC answer due 2/11/2025; Red Dog Media, Inc. answer due 2/11/2025; Ticket Fulfillment Services, L.P. answer due 2/11/2025; Vivid Seats Inc. answer due 2/11/2025. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 1/10/2025. (bdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
3 3 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 01/08 4:27 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Ticket Fulfillment Services, L.P.. (Noonan, David)Attorney David J Noonan added to party Ticket Fulfillment Services, L.P.(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 12/13 10:01 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (axc1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
1 1 24 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 12/13 9:51 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Internet Referral Services, LLC, Red Dog Media, Inc., Ticket Fulfillment Services, L.P., Vivid Seats Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-19429053.), filed by Margaret Franklin-Chomas. The new case number is 3:24-cv-2320-L-DDL. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner are assigned to the case. (Travis, Ben)(axc1)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet