Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Robert J Jonker
Referred: Sally J Berens
Case #: 1:24-cv-01311
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2024
Terminated:Feb 13, 2025
Last checked: Monday Jan 27, 2025 3:51 AM EST
defendant
Muzafer Duric
defendant
Eagle Eye Truck Lines, LLC
plaintiff
BMO Bank N.A.
Represented By
James Kevin Haney
Wong Fleming, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
15 15 4 pgs misc Writ of Garnishment/Execution or Judgment Lien Follow-up Tue 04/29 3:03 PM
FOLLOW-UP ENTRY to effect service on all counsel of previously filed Writ of Garnishment Issued14 (eod)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Judgment - Default Thu 02/13 4:43 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff against Defendants ; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (elam)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Default Judgment Thu 02/13 8:28 AM
MOTION for default judgment as to Eagle Eye Truck Lines, LLC and Muzafer Duric by plaintiff BMO Bank N.A.; (Haney, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - BMO Certification in Support,
Att: 3 Non-Military Affidavit as to Muzafer Duric,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service,
Att: 5 Proposed Order
Monday, February 10, 2025
10 10 order Default (Entry of) Mon 02/10 10:44 AM
DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendants Eagle Eye Truck Lines, LLC, Muzafer Duric (eod)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
9 9 motion Application for Entry of Default Fri 02/07 11:02 AM
APPLICATION for entry of default as to Eagle Eye Truck Lines LLC and Muzafer Duric (Haney, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, January 24, 2025
8 8 motion Application for Entry of Default Fri 01/24 8:25 AM
(DEFAULT NOT ENTERED)(statement regarding defendants are neither minors or incompetent persons not included) APPLICATION for entry of default as to Eagle Eye Truck Lines, LLC and Muzafer Duric (Haney, James) Modified text on 1/24/2025 (pjw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, January 23, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause (Deadline) Thu 01/23 12:18 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: plaintiff shall request a default or show cause within thirty days of this order; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (elam)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 01/03 7:54 AM
SUMMONS returned executed; Muzafer Duric served on 12/26/2024, answer due 1/16/2025 (Haney, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 01/03 7:54 AM
SUMMONS returned executed; Eagle Eye Truck Lines, LLC served on 12/26/2024, answer due 1/16/2025 (Haney, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 12/16 11:37 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Muzafer Duric, Eagle Eye Truck Lines, LLC (eod)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Mon 12/16 11:33 AM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Robert J. Jonker (eod)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
2 2 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/13 12:02 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BMO Bank N.A. identifying Corporate Parent BMO Financial Corp. for BMO Bank N.A. (Haney, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 12/13 11:58 AM
COMPLAINT against Muzafer Duric, Eagle Eye Truck Lines LLC filed by BMO Bank N.A. (Haney, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Agreement 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Agreement 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Agreement 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Agreement 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Modification Agreement,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Guaranties,
Att: 7 Summons as to Eagle Eye Truck Lines LLC,
Att: 8 Summons as to Muzafer Duric
misc Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment Fri 12/13 11:59 AM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff BMO Bank N.A. in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7565786 (Haney, James)
Related: [-]