Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Algenon L Marbley
Referred: Kimberly A Jolson
Case #: 2:24-cv-04266
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause41:1463 Public Contracts: Unlawful Employment Prac
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2024
Terminated:Jan 10, 2025
Last checked: Monday Jan 27, 2025 4:18 AM EST
Defendant
STAR DYNAMICS CORPORATION
Plaintiff
Kerry Shields
Represented By
Trisha M. Breedlove
The Spitz Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, January 10, 2025
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 01/10 3:12 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (cw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 01/09 11:23 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Kerry Shields (Breedlove, Trisha)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 12/16 11:27 AM
Summons Issued as to STAR DYNAMICS CORPORATION. (sem)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 12/13 1:55 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against STAR DYNAMICS CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10290863), filed by Kerry Shields. (Breedlove, Trisha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Form