California Central District Court
Judge:Dale S Fischer
Referred: Charles F Eick
Case #: 2:24-cv-10754
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2024
Case in other court:Superior Court of CA for the County of Los Angeles, 24STCV28929
Last checked: Monday Jan 27, 2025 1:15 AM PST
Defendant
Shake Shack Enterprises, LLC
Represented By
Kristel Bou-Lahoud Haddad
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Kensley Amir Davis
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Plaintiff
James Nyerges
Represented By
Samvel Setyan
Setyan Law Apc
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Does
Terminated: 01/14/2025


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
17 17 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) Wed 01/15 2:08 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 6/12/2026. (eo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
16 16 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Tue 01/14 4:39 PM
Order re Jury Trial by Judge Dale S. Fischer. These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine, unless the Court orders otherwise. See Trial Order for specifics. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/27/2026 03:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 8/25/2026 08:30 AM. Trial will not proceed unless the parties engage in an additional effort to resolve this matter through ADR. (eo)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
15 15 misc Declaration Mon 01/13 2:47 PM
DECLARATION of Samvel Setyan filed by Plaintiff James Nyerges. (Setyan, Samvel)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Report Mon 01/13 1:59 PM
REPORT filed by Defendant Shake Shack Enterprises, LLC.(Haddad, Kristel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
13 13 misc Declaration Mon 01/13 1:53 PM
DECLARATION of Kristel B. Haddad filed by Defendant Shake Shack Enterprises, LLC. (Haddad, Kristel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
12 12 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 01/07 1:31 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS. This overburdened court and its staff do not have time to communicate repeatedly with counsel in an effort to have them follow the rules and orders of this Court. Counsel have failed to comply with the Order Setting Scheduling Conference and the attached Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates in one or more respects. For example, counsel may have (1) failed to file a Joint 26(f) Report at all, (2) failed to provide all of the information required by the Order, (3) failed to attach a Schedule, or (4) failed to complete the Schedule properly. Counsel are ordered to show cause why each side should not be sanctioned in the amount of $500 for their failure to comply with the Order. Counsel whose signature appears on the Joint 26(f) Report must file a declaration stating who was (1) responsible for meeting with opposing counsel, (2) responsible for preparing and reviewing the Report and ensuring its accuracy and compliance with the Order, and (3) responsible for filing the Report. The declaration should state the name of that person (only if the person is an attorney) and the position of that person (partner, associate, paralegal, assistant, secretary, etc.). The declaration shall also state why the Report failed to comply with the Order. If no Report was filed, the declaration must state who was (1) responsible for calendaring the date for meeting with counsel and filing the Report, (2) responsible for responsible for meeting with opposing counsel, and (3) responsible for filing the Report. The same information as to name and position must be provided as well as an explanation as to why no Report was filed. In addition, the parties are ordered to review the Order Setting Scheduling Conference and the attached Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates carefully, and to provide a Report and a Schedule that provides specific dates for all of the relevant items in the Schedule. The dates must comply with the time frames in the Weeks before trial column and the required days of the week: a Monday (not a holiday) for the pretrial conference and last day for hearing motions and a Tuesday (not a holiday) for trial. The declarations, Report, and Schedule are due within five Court days. The filing of compliant declarations, Report, and Schedule will be a sufficient response to this Order to Show Cause. The scheduling conference date is vacated. The parties are urged to conduct themselves in a professional manner and to make every effort to agree on dates. Further failures to comply with the rules and orders of this Court, and the rules and orders of the Central District, will result in sanctions against one or both parties. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (eo)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
11 11 misc Report Mon 01/06 5:42 PM
Joint Rule 26(f) REPORT filed by Defendant Shake Shack Enterprises, LLC. (Haddad, Kristel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
10 10 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Wed 12/18 10:02 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 1/13/2025 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (eo)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 12/18 9:40 AM
STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (eo)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 12/13 6:08 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 12/13 6:08 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 12/13 6:07 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 12/13 1:01 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 24STCV28929 with filing fee previously paid ($405 paid on 12/13/2024, receipt number 38751601), filed by Defendant Shake Shack Enterprises, LLC.(Haddad, Kristel)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 12/13 12:48 PM
Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Shake Shack Enterprises, LLC, (Haddad, Kristel)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/13 12:45 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Shake Shack Enterprises, LLC (Haddad, Kristel)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 12/13 12:42 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Shake Shack Enterprises, LLC. (Haddad, Kristel)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 12/13 12:39 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 24STCV28929 Receipt No: ACACDC-38751601 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Shake Shack Enterprises, LLC. (Attorney Kristel Bou-Lahoud Haddad added to party Shake Shack Enterprises, LLC(pty:dft))(Haddad, Kristel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Kensley A. Davis,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Kensley A. Davis Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Kensley A. Davis Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit C to Kensley A. Davis Declaration,
Att: 5 Exhibit D to Kensley A. Davis Declaration,
Att: 6 Exhibit E to Kenlsey A. Davis Declaration
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Shake Shack Enterprises, LLC., Does 1 through 20, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff James Nyerges. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/4/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 . (et) (Entered: 12/13/2024)
Related: [-]
NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Shake Shack Enterprises, LLC. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT E TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 . (et) (Entered: 12/13/2024)
Related: [-]
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Fri 12/13 6:13 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Shake Shack Enterprises, LLC., Does 1 through 20, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff James Nyerges. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/4/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 . (et)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Fri 12/13 6:15 PM
NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Shake Shack Enterprises, LLC. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT E TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 . (et)
Related: [-]