Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-03382
Case Filed:Dec 11, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 14, 2024 1:41 AM CST
Defendant
Rubiel Perez-Nunez (1)
Represented By
Jesse R. Coronado
Law Offices Of Jesse R. Coronado
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joshua Jerome Garland
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Jan 29 2025
FINDINGS OF FACT AND RECOMMENDATION on felony guilty plea before the United States Magistrate Judge as to Rubiel Perez-Nunez. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (ic)
GPO Feb 21 2025
ORDER accepting re 19 Findings of Fact on Plea as to Rubiel Perez-Nunez. Guilty plea accepted. Signed by District Judge Ernest Gonzalez. (vg)

Docket last updated: 12/14/2024 3:18 AM CST
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
Arrest of Rubiel Perez-Nunez (drda) [2:24-mj-03454-MHW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
Warrant Returned Executed as to Rubiel Perez-Nunez. (drda) [2:24-mj-03454-MHW]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters as to Rubiel Perez-Nunez. (drda) [2:24-mj-03454-MHW]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Matthew H. Watters as to Rubiel Perez-Nunez. (drda) [2:24-mj-03454-MHW]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to USA as to Rubiel Perez-Nunez. (drda) [2:24-mj-03454-MHW]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Rubiel Perez-Nunez (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Rubiel Perez-Nunez (1).By Judge Matthew H. Watters. (drda) [2:24-mj-03454-MHW]
Related: [-]
3 3 Proceedings held before Judge Matthew H. Watters:Initial Appearance as to Rubiel Perez-Nunez held on 11/21/2024 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 11/26/2024 9:00AM before Judge Matthew H. Watters, SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Rubiel Perez-Nunez (Court Reporter FTR GOLD - C. LEVRIE.) (drda) [2:24-mj-03454-MHW]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Jesse R. Coronado for Rubiel Perez-Nunez appointed. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (vjp) [2:24-mj-03454-MHW]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
5 5 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Rubiel Perez-Nunez (Coronado, Jesse) [2:24-mj-03454-MHW]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
6 6 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to NO BOND as to Rubiel Perez-Nunez. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (mgc) [2:24-mj-03454-MHW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
7 7 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Rubiel Perez-Nunez (1) count(s) 1. (bot1)
Related: [-] dacted Version
9 9 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Rubiel Perez-Nunez (bot1)
Related: [-]