Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 0:24-cr-60244
Case Filed:Dec 12, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 14, 2024 2:31 AM EST
Defendant
Alejandro Rafael Figueroa Ferrer (1)
Represented By
Alfredo Robert Zamora
Losey PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Justin W. McCormack
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, November 14, 2024
1 1 10 pgs CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Alejandro Rafael Figueroa Ferrer (1). (ar2) [0:24-mj-06537-PMH]
Related: [-]
2 2 PAPERLESS NOTICE OF HEARING as to Alejandro Rafael Figueroa Ferrer. Initial Appearance set for 11/14/2024 at 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. (ar2) [0:24-mj-06537-PMH]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF TEMPORARY ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Alfredo Robert Zamora appearing for Alejandro Rafael Figueroa Ferrer (Zamora, Alfredo) [0:24-mj-06537-PMH]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt: Initial Appearance as to Alejandro Rafael Figueroa Ferrer held on 11/14/2024. Stipulated bond set: Alejandro Rafael Figueroa Ferrer (1) $250,000 CSB with Nebbia. Date of Location Custody (Arrest or Surrender): 11/14/2024.. Arraignment set for 12/5/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination set for 12/5/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Report Re: Counsel Hearing set for 12/5/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. (Digital 11:53:02/12:20:22) Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 11/14/2024. (smy) (Main Document 4 replaced on 11/14/2024) (rbe). [0:24-mj-06537-PMH]
Related: [-]
5 5 (Stricken Per DE 7 ) ORAL MOTION to Appoint Private Counsel by Alejandro Rafael Figueroa Ferrer. (smy) Modified on 11/14/2024 (rbe). [0:24-mj-06537-PMH]
Related: [-]
6 6 (Stricken Per DE 7 ) PAPERLESS ORDER granting 5 Motion to Appoint Private Counsel as to Alejandro Rafael Figueroa Ferrer (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 11/14/2024. (smy) Modified on 11/14/2024 (rbe). [0:24-mj-06537-PMH]
Related: [-]
7 7 PAPERLESS ORDER Striking as to Alejandro Rafael Figueroa Ferrer re 6 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Alejandro Rafael Figueroa Ferrer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 11/14/2024. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06537-PMH]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Alfredo Robert Zamora appearing for Alejandro Rafael Figueroa Ferrer (Zamora, Alfredo) [0:24-mj-06537-PMH]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
9 9 Joint MOTION to Continue Arraignment, Preliminary Examination Hearing, and Report Re: Counsel Hearing by USA as to Alejandro Rafael Figueroa Ferrer. Responses due by 12/16/2024.(McCormack, Justin) [0:24-mj-06537-PMH]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
10 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting9 Motion to Continue as to Alejandro Rafael Figueroa Ferrer (1). Arraignment set for 12/19/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination set for 12/19/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. The time period between December 5, 2024 and December 19, 2024, is hereby excluded under the Speedy Trial Act, 18 U.S.C. 3161(h)(7)(A). The Court finds that the ends of justice served by granting the continuance outweighs the interests of the Defendant and the public in a speedy trial. Id. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 12/2/2024. (JMS) [0:24-mj-06537-PMH]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
Reset Hearing as to Alejandro Rafael Figueroa Ferrer: Report Re: Counsel Hearing RESET for 12/19/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. (at) [0:24-mj-06537-PMH]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
11 11 5 pgs INDICTMENT as to Alejandro Rafael Figueroa Ferrer (1) count(s) 1, 2 and Forfeiture Allegations. (rbe) (rbe).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (12/12/2024) Restricted Unredacted Indictment