1
|
|
1
CRIMINAL COMPLAINT; AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Brian Micah Easterling (1) - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 11/26/2024.
(jni) [1:24-mj-01192-RT]
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
EO: as to Brian Micah Easterling - An Initial Appearance is set for 11/29/2024 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. (Attorney Melinda Yamaga and the Office of the Federal Public Defender are provisionally appointed pending submission of Defendant's financial affidavit.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)
(ab)
Docket Text Modified on 11/29/2024 (ab)
[1:24-mj-01192-RT]
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
MOTION to Detain by USA as to Brian Micah Easterling. (Myers, Wayne) [1:24-mj-01192-RT]
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
EP: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to DEFENDANT BRIAN MICAH EASTERLING had on 11/29/2024. Defendant Brian Micah Easterling ("Defendant") present and in custody. Appointment of Counsel : Defendant sworn to Financial Affidavit. Court appoints Mr. Mizono and the Office of the Federal Defender as counsel for Defendant. Initial Appearance : Mr. Mizono represents charges reviewed with Defendant. Defendant has general understanding of the charges. Government has filed [ECF 3 ] Motion to Detain Defendant Without Bail. Detention Hearing is set for 12/4/2024 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield. Preliminary Hearing is set for 12/13/2024 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield. Due Process Protection Act Advisory : The Court orders the United States to comply with its disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Failing to timely do so may result in consequences such as sanctions, adverse jury instructions, exclusion of evidence, and dismissal of charges. This order incorporates the provisions of the Court's February 1, 2021 General Order Regarding Rule 5(F). Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshals Service. Initial Appearance as to Brian Micah Easterling held on 11/29/2024.
Detention Hearing is set for 12/4/2024 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD.
Preliminary Hearing is set for 12/13/2024 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD.
***Procedural Interval start as to Brian Micah Easterling.
(FTR-CT 5 / 10:29 am 10:32 am)
(MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)
(jni) [1:24-mj-01192-RT]
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Brian Micah Easterling.
(jni) [1:24-mj-01192-RT]
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jacquelyn Tryon Esser appearing for Brian Micah Easterling ; Certificate of Service (Esser, Jacquelyn) [1:24-mj-01192-RT]
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
EP: DETENTION HEARING as to Defendant Brian Micah Easterling held. Defendant present and in custody. Discussion held. At the request of defense counsel, Detention Hearing is set for 12/10/2024 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal Service. EO : The Detention Hearing set for 12/10/2024 at 10:30 a.m. will be held in Courtroom 5 before Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield. Status Conference as to Brian Micah Easterling held on 12/4/2024.
Detention Hearing is set for 12/10/2024 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. (FTR-CT 6 / 10:42 am - 10:44 am)
(MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)
(jni) [1:24-mj-01192-RT]
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
EP: DETENTION HEARING as to Defendant Brian Micah Easterling held. Defendant present and in custody. Discussion held. The Court took judicial notice of the U.S. Pretrial Services' Report, other documents on file and found Defendant be detained as there is no condition or combination of conditions that will reasonably assure the appearance of the Defendant as required and the safety of the community. Government's Motion to Detain Defendant Without Bail, ECF No. 3 - GRANTED.
Government to prepare the Order. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal Service. Detention Hearing as to Brian Micah Easterling held on 12/10/2024.
Motions terminated as to Brian Micah Easterling re 3 MOTION to Detain filed by USA.
Granting 3 Motion to Detain as to Brian Micah Easterling (1). (FTR-CT 5 / 10:46 am - 10:57 am)
(MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)
(jni) [1:24-mj-01192-RT]
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Brian Micah Easterling - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 12/10/2024.
(jni) [1:24-mj-01192-RT]
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Rebecca Ann Perlmutter appearing for USA. (Perlmutter, Rebecca) [1:24-mj-01192-RT]
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
INDICTMENT as to Brian Micah Easterling (1) count(s) 1, 2.
(jni)
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
EO: as to Brian Micah Easterling - An Arraignment to the Indictment is set for 12/13/2024 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)
(jsd)
Related: [-]
|