Texas Western District Court
Case #: 5:24-mj-01676
Case Filed:Dec 12, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 14, 2024 1:25 AM CST
Defendant
Ryan Daniel Nagle (1)
Represented By
Alfredo R. Villarreal
Federal Public Defender, Txw
contact info
Duty Pub. Defender-San Antonio
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Christopher Kirk Mangels
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/14/2024 2:49 AM CST
Thursday, December 12, 2024
Arrest of Ryan Daniel Nagle (bt)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney as to Ryan Daniel Nagle. (bt)
Related: [-]
2 2 4 pgs MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Ryan Daniel Nagle. (bt)
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney:Initial Appearance as to Ryan Daniel Nagle held on 12/12/2024. Defendant requests appointment of counsel (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (bt)
Related: [-]
4 4 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Ryan Daniel Nagle (SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002). (bt)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Duty Pub. Defender-San Antonio for Ryan Daniel Nagle. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (bt)
Related: [-]
6 6 3 pgs ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: as to Ryan Daniel Nagle Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 12/17/2024 10:00 AM before Judge U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (bt)
Related: [-]