New Jersey District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00749
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 14, 2024 2:57 AM EST
Defendant
DAGOBERTO NINA GONZALEZ (1)
Represented By
PATRICK N. MCMAHON
Federal Public Defender
contact info
PATRICK A. MULLIN
The Law Offices Of Patrick A. Mullin
contact info
Notice Only
MICHELLE SIEDZIK
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
JENNY CHUNG
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/14/2024 5:22 AM EST
Friday, September 02, 2022
Arrest of DAGOBERTO NINA GONZALEZ (smf) [2:22-mj-16159-JRA]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to DAGOBERTO NINA GONZALEZ (1). (smf, [2:22-mj-16159-JRA] (Entered: 09/16/2022)
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte:Initial Appearance as to DAGOBERTO NINA GONZALEZ held on 9/2/2022. Defendant consented to the hearing by video consent and his retained counsel was in attendance as well, defendant did NOT waive preliminary hearing, therefore, a hearing will be set for 2 weeks from the date of this hearing, interpreter, Irene Caramuta sworn in. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR/Zoom.) (smf) [2:22-mj-16159-JRA]
Related: [-]
3 3 VIDEO CONSENT ORDER as to DAGOBERTO NINA GONZALEZ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 9/2/2022. (smf) [2:22-mj-16159-JRA]
Related: [-]
4 4 BRADY ORDER as to DAGOBERTO NINA GONZALEZ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 9/2/2022. (smf) [2:22-mj-16159-JRA]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: PATRICK A. MULLIN appearing for DAGOBERTO NINA GONZALEZ (smf) [2:22-mj-16159-JRA]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER OF DETENTION as to DAGOBERTO NINA GONZALEZ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 9/2/2022. (smf) [2:22-mj-16159-JRA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
WAIVER of Preliminary Examination or Hearing by DAGOBERTO NINA GONZALEZ (smf) [2:22-mj-16159-JRA]
Related: [-]
8 8 Letter from attorney Patrick Mullin on behalf of Defendant Dagoberto Nina-Gonzalez advising the Court that the defendant has formally waived his right to a preliminary hearing. Due to this letter, the preliminary will not be scheduled. (smf) [2:22-mj-16159-JRA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
9 9 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to DAGOBERTO NINA GONZALEZ Time excluded from 9/28/2022 until 11/15/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 9/28/2022. (smf) [2:22-mj-16159-JRA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 09, 2022
11 11 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to DAGOBERTO NINA GONZALEZ Time excluded from 11/9/2022 until 1/15/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 11/9/2022. (smf) [2:22-mj-16159-JRA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 08, 2022
12 12 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JENNY CHUNG for USA added. Attorney BRIAN DENNIS GILLET terminated. (CHUNG, JENNY) [2:22-mj-16159-JRA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2023
13 13 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to DAGOBERTO NINA GONZALEZ Time excluded from 1/12/2023 until 3/10/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 1/12/2023. (smf) [2:22-mj-16159-JRA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
14 14 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to DAGOBERTO NINA GONZALEZ Time excluded from 3/16/2023 until 5/8/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 3/16/2023. (smf) (Main Document 14 replaced on 3/16/2023) (smf). [2:22-mj-16159-JRA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
15 15 MOTION to Seal Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel by DAGOBERTO NINA GONZALEZ. (MULLIN, PATRICK) [2:22-mj-16159-JRA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
16 16 ORDER granting15 Motion to Seal as to DAGOBERTO NINA GONZALEZ (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 6/15/2023. (smf) [2:22-mj-16159-JRA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
17 17 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to DAGOBERTO NINA GONZALEZ Time excluded from 7/20/2023 until 9/11/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 7/20/2023. (akw) [2:22-mj-16159-JRA]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
19 19 Letter from Patrick A. Mullin, Esq. (MULLIN, PATRICK) [2:22-mj-16159-JRA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
Set Hearing as to DAGOBERTO NINA GONZALEZ: Attorney Appointment Hearing set for 8/31/2023 at 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 9 before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. (akw) [2:22-mj-16159-JRA]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
20 20 Transcript of Initial Appearance/Bail Hearing as to DAGOBERTO NINA GONZALEZ held on September 2, 2022, before Judge Jose R. Almonte. Transcriber: King Transcription Services (973-237-6080). Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Transcriber only. (mfr) [2:22-mj-16159-JRA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
21 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte:Attorney Appointment Hearing as to DAGOBERTO NINA GONZALEZ held on 8/31/2023 (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (akw) [2:22-mj-16159-JRA]
Related: [-]
22 22 ORDER granting 18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. PATRICK A. MULLIN withdrawn from case. as to DAGOBERTO NINA GONZALEZ (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 8/31/2023. (akw) [2:22-mj-16159-JRA]
Related: [-]
23 23 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER PATRICK N. MCMAHON for DAGOBERTO NINA GONZALEZ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 8/31/2023. (akw) [2:22-mj-16159-JRA]
Related: [-]
24 24 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to DAGOBERTO NINA GONZALEZ Time excluded from 9/12/2023 until 11/10/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 8/31/2023. (akw) [2:22-mj-16159-JRA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
25 25 Letter from Dagoberto Nina Gonzalez. (akw, ) [2:22-mj-16159-JRA]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
Status Conference set for 2/2/2024 at 03:00 PM in Newark - Courtroom 9 before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 1/22/2024. (akw) [2:22-mj-16159-JRA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
26 26 TEXT ORDER: At the request of defense counsel the status conference scheduled for Friday, February 2, 2024, is canceled. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 1/31/2024. (akw, ) [2:22-mj-16159-JRA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
27 27 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to DAGOBERTO NINA GONZALEZ Time excluded from 3/6/2024 until 5/4/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 3/6/2024. (akw) [2:22-mj-16159-JRA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
Set/Reset Hearings as to DAGOBERTO NINA GONZALEZ: Plea Agreement Hearing set for 3/26/2024 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 4C before Judge Evelyn Padin. (bt) [2:22-mj-16159-JRA]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
28 28 TEXT ORDER as to DAGOBERTO NINA GONZALEZ: The Plea Agreement Hearing is reset for 10/3/2024 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 4C before Judge Evelyn Padin. So Ordered by Judge Evelyn Padin on 9/27/2024. (bt) [2:22-mj-16159-JRA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
29 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Evelyn Padin: Miscellaneous Hearing held on 10/3/2024. (Court Reporter Francesca DiBella (973-776-3885).) (bt) [2:22-mj-16159-JRA]
Related: [-]
32 32 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to DAGOBERTO NINA GONZALEZ Time excluded from 10/3/24 until 12/2/24. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 10/3/24. (ad, ) [2:22-mj-16159-JRA]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
30 30 TEXT ORDER as to DAGOBERTO NINA GONZALEZ: By 10/17/2024 Defense counsel shall submit a status letter to the court regarding his client's position on the matters discussed on 10/3/2024. So Ordered by Judge Evelyn Padin on 10/7/2024. (bt) [2:22-mj-16159-JRA]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
31 31 TEXT ORDER as to DAGOBERTO NINA GONZALEZ: Plea Agreement Hearing reset for 11/14/2024 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 4C before Judge Evelyn Padin. So Ordered by Judge Evelyn Padin on 10/18/2024. (bt) [2:22-mj-16159-JRA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
Set/Reset Hearings as to DAGOBERTO NINA GONZALEZ: Plea Agreement Hearing reset for 11/14/2024 at 02:00 PM in Newark - Courtroom 4C before Judge Evelyn Padin. (bt) [2:22-mj-16159-JRA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
33 33 INFORMATION as to DAGOBERTO NINA GONZALEZ (1) count 1. (bt)
Related: [-]
34 34 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Evelyn Padin: Plea Agreement Hearing as to DAGOBERTO NINA GONZALEZ held on 11/14/2024. Guilty Plea entered as to Count 1 of the Information. Sentencing set for 4/17/2025 at 02:00 PM in Newark - Courtroom 4C before Judge Evelyn Padin. Defendant will remain in custody. (Court Reporter Francesca DiBella (973-776-3885).) (bt)
Related: [-]
35 35 APPLICATION for permission to enter Plea of guilty as to DAGOBERTO NINA GONZALEZ. (bt)
Related: [-]
36 36 PLEA AGREEMENT as to DAGOBERTO NINA GONZALEZ. (bt)
Related: [-]
37 37 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by DAGOBERTO NINA GONZALEZ. (bt)
Related: [-]