New York Northern District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-00531
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 14, 2024 2:28 AM EST
Defendant
Damon Dunn (1)
Represented By
Michael P. McGeown-Walker
Office Of The Federal Public Defender - Albany Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Ashlyn Jessica Miranda
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/14/2024 3:43 AM EST
Thursday, November 14, 2024
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Damon Dunn (1). (tab)
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Damon Dunn. (tab)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER granting3 Motion to Seal Case as to Damon Dunn (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 11/14/2024.(tab)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Public Order