Ohio Northern District Court
Case #: 4:24-cr-00433
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 14, 2024 2:32 AM EST
Defendant
Jermaine C. Bunn (1)
Represented By
Nathan A. Ray
Burdon & Merlitti - Akron
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Yasmine T. Makridis
Office Of The U.S. Attorney - Youngstown
contact info

GPO Mar 06 2025
Order as to Jermaine C. Bunn (1) denying Defendant's pro se oral motion contending that this matter should be dismissed for a violation of speedy trial. Judge John R. Adams on 3/6/25. (K,C)

Docket last updated: 12/14/2024 4:00 AM EST
Thursday, November 14, 2024
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 57.9. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (L,MI)
Related: [-]
1 1 INDICTMENT filed by USA as to Jermaine C. Bunn (1) count(s) 1.. (L,MI) Unsealed on 12/10/2024 (K,C).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Designation Form and Signature Page
3 3 Motion to Seal Indictment filed by United States of America as to Jermaine C. Bunn (1). (L,MI)
Related: [-]
4 4 Order granting the government's3 Motion to Seal indictment until the arrest of Defendant Jermaine C. Bunn (1). Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong on 11/14/2024. (L,MI)
Related: [-]