Ohio Northern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00424
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 14, 2024 2:33 AM EST
Defendant
Christion Yarnell Sims (1)
Represented By
Fernando O. Mack
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Henry F. DeBaggis, II
Office Of The U.S. Attorney - Cleveland
contact info
Kristen Rolph
Office Of The U.S. Attorney - Cleveland
contact info
Michelle M. Baeppler
Office Of The U.S. Attorney - Cleveland
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/14/2024 4:01 AM EST
Friday, October 18, 2024
1 1 Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 10/28/24 filed by USA as to Christion Yarnell Sims (1). (D,Ky) [1:24-mj-04167-JDG]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Thursday, October 31, 2024
Case unsealed as to Christion Yarnell Sims (1) (K,L) [1:24-mj-04167-JDG]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Christion Yarnell Sims (1) on 10/31/2024. (K,L) [1:24-mj-04167-JDG]
Related: [-]
IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] as to Christion Yarnell Sims (1). Initial Appearance set for 10/31/2024 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 9B before Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong.(K,L) [1:24-mj-04167-JDG]
Related: [-]
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong. Initial Appearance as to Christion Yarnell Sims (1) held on 10/31/2024. AUSA Scott Zarzycki present on behalf of the government. Attorney Fernando Mack present and appointed on behalf of the defendant. Government's counsel was advised of and ordered to comply with the government's disclosure requirements under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny; and admonished that failure to comply with those disclosure obligations could result in sanctions up to and including vacating or reversal of any conviction or judgment. Government moved for detention. Defendant waived preliminary and detention hearings. Matter bound over to the Grand Jury. Defendant remanded to the custody of U.S. Marshal Service. (ECRO: D. Savage; Pretrial Officer: P. Sidbeck; Time: 10 minutes.) (K,L) [1:24-mj-04167-JDG]
Related: [-]
CJA 20 Appointment of Attorney Fernando O. Mack. Counsel must report to the Court any significant changes in defendant's employment or financial circumstances sufficient to enable defendant to pay, in whole or in part, for legal representation. Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong on 10/31/2024. (K,L) [1:24-mj-04167-JDG]
Related: [-]
6 6 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Christion Yarnell Sims (1). Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong on 10/31/2024. (K,L) [1:24-mj-04167-JDG]
Related: [-]
7 7 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing by Christion Yarnell Sims (1) (K,L) [1:24-mj-04167-JDG]
Related: [-]
8 8 Waiver of Detention Hearing and Order as to Christion Yarnell Sims (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong on 10/31/2024. (K,L) [1:24-mj-04167-JDG]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
4 4 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 10/30/2024 in case as to Christion Yarnell Sims (1). (H,Ch) [1:24-mj-04167-JDG]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 57.9. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd. (L,Br)
Related: [-]
9 9 Indictment filed by USA as to Christion Yarnell Sims (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3. (L,Br)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Designation Form and Signature Page