California Central District Court
Judge:Kenly Kiya Kato
Referred: David T Bristow
Case #: 5:24-cv-02646
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Dec 12, 2024
Terminated:Mar 13, 2025
Case in other court:Riverside County Superior Court, CVRI2406269
Last checked: Sunday Jan 26, 2025 1:27 AM PST
Defendant
Does
Defendant
The Sherwin-Williams Company
Represented By
Nicholas D Poper
Baker And Hostetler LLP
contact info
Shareef Swamy Farag
Baker And Hostetler LLP
contact info
Matthew Eaton
Baker And Hostetler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Elvia Lopez
Represented By
Baruch Yosef Kreiman
Abramson Labor Group
contact info
William Zev Abramson
Abramson Labor Group
contact info
Arax Aslanyan
Abramson Labor Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, March 13, 2025
16 16 2 pgs order Dismissing Case Thu 03/13 10:32 AM
ORDER TO DISMISS ACTION AND SUBMIT TO BINDING ARBITRATION [NOTE CHANGES BY COURT] by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Having read the foregoing stipulation, and good cause appearing therefore, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. This Action is dismissed; and 2. Plaintiff shall submit any and all claims she has or will have related to her employment with Defendant to binding and final arbitration. RE: STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Binding Arbitration15 . (Case Terminated. Made JS-6.) (aco)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
15 15 4 pgs stip Stay Case Wed 03/12 1:55 PM
STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Binding Arbitration filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Williams Company.(Farag, Shareef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Proposed Order
Thursday, January 30, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) Thu 01/30 4:30 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 10/30/2025. (npo)
Related: [-]
13 13 15 pgs order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Thu 01/30 4:29 PM
CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Amended Pleadings due by 3/20/2025. Discovery cut-off 8/7/2025. Motions due by 10/30/2025. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 10/30/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2025 10:30 AM before Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Jury Trial set for 12/8/2025 08:30 AM before Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (npo)
Related: [-]
12 12 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 01/30 4:08 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: The Scheduling Conference set for 2/6/2025, is hereby VACATED. The Court will issue a separate trial scheduling order setting forth a trial schedule. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
11 11 18 pgs misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Thu 01/23 5:26 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 6 days, filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Williams Company.. (Poper, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
10 10 9 pgs order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Wed 12/18 4:19 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Scheduling Conference set for 2/6/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (npo)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
9 9 16 pgs order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 12/16 4:20 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (npo)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
8 8 1 pgs notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 12/13 6:43 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 12/13 6:42 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 12/13 6:42 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Kenly Kiya Kato and Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 transfer Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73) - optional html form Fri 12/13 6:36 PM
NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to David T. Bristow. New Case Number 5:24-cv-02646-KK (DTBx). (car)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Fri 12/13 5:41 PM
Notice filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Williams Company. Notice of Pleadings from State Court(Poper, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Fri 12/13 6:47 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-100, The Sherwin-Williams Company. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Elvia Lopez. Filed in State Court on 11/7/2024 Submitted with Exhibit A to Notice,4 (car)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Fri 12/13 6:50 PM
NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Williams Company. Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit B to Notice,4 (car)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
3 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Williams Company, identifying The Sherwin-Williams Company. (Poper, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Williams Company. (Poper, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside County Superior Court, case number CVRI2406269 Receipt No: ACACDC-38747597 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Williams Company. (Attorney Nicholas D Poper added to party The Sherwin-Williams Company(pty:dft))(Poper, Nicholas)
Related: [-]