Mississippi Northern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00145
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 15, 2024 1:18 AM CST
Defendant
Austin Thompson (1)
Represented By
FPD
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Gregory S. Park
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Parker S. King
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Oxford
contact info
USA
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/15/2024 1:56 AM CST
Thursday, November 07, 2024
1 1 1 pgs CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Austin Thompson (1). (rtc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 9 pgs Affidavit
3 3 TEXT ORDER APPOINTING FPD as to Austin Thompson : Appointment of Attorney FPD for Austin Thompson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/7/24. (rtc)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORAL MOTION for Detention by USA as to Austin Thompson. (rtc)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORAL ORDER temporarily granting 4 Motion for Detention as to Austin Thompson (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/7/24. (rtc)
Related: [-]
6 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Initial Appearance as to Austin Thompson held on 11/7/2024. No Interpreter Needed *Audio Recorded during Proceeding. Detention Hearing set for 11/8/2024 02:00 PM in Oxford Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Preliminary Examination set for 11/8/2024 02:00 PM in Oxford Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (Court Reporter digital.) (rtc)
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gregory S. Park appearing for Austin Thompson (Park, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
9 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Preliminary Hearing as to Austin Thompson held on 11/8/2024. Detention Hearing as to Austin Thompson held on 11/8/2024 *Audio Recorded during Proceeding. (Court Reporter digital.) (rtc)
Related: [-]
11 11 Unsecured Bond Entered as to Austin Thompson: Amount of Bond $10,000.00. (rtc)
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/8/24. (rtc)
Related: [-]
13 13 WITNESS LIST as to Austin Thompson (rtc)
Related: [-]
20 20 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 11/7/2024 in case as to Austin Thompson. (edc) [3:24-mj-00034-RP]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
14 14 MOTION to RESTRICT document from public access. Filed by USA as to Austin Thompson. (King, Parker)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
15 15 ORDER granting14 Motion to Restrict Document from public access as to Austin Thompson (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/12/24. (rtc)
Related: [-]
16 16 *RESTRICTED* MOTION to Reconsider Release Order re12 Order Setting Conditions of Release filed by USA as to Austin Thompson. (edc)
Related: [-]
17 17 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Austin Thompson: Hearing on Motion to Reconsider Release Order set for 11/13/2024 11:00 AM in Oxford Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
21 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Hearing on Motion to Reconsider Release Order as to Austin Thompson held on 11/13/2024 *Audio Recorded during Proceeding. (Court Reporter digital.) (rtc)
Related: [-]
22 22 1 pgs ORDER on Motion to Reconsider Release Order as to Austin Thompson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/13/24. (rtc)
Related: [-]
23 23 WITNESS LIST re21 as to Austin Thompson (rtc)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
25 25 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision re12 Order Setting Conditions of Release by USA as to Austin Thompson. (edc)
Related: [-]