Nevada District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-00940
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2024
Terminated:Nov 22, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 14, 2024 11:19 PM PST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Edward D Penetar
Doj-Usao
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Rolando Sedano-Castillo (1)
Terminated: 11/22/2024
Represented By
Joy Chen
Federal Public Defenders, District Of Nv
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/14/2024 11:57 PM PST
Friday, November 15, 2024
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (KL)
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to Rolando Sedano-Castillo at initial appearance. (ADR)
Related: [-]
2 2 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceeding as to Rolando Sedano-Castillo held on 11/15/2024 before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. Crtrm Administrator: A. Reyes ; AUSA: Edward Penetar ; Def Counsel: Joy Chen, AFPD ; Court Reporter/Recorder: Liberty Recorder ; Time of Hearing: 2:49 p.m. - 2:57 p.m. ; Interpreter: Cris Sanchez ; Language: Spanish ; Courtroom: 3A . Defendant is present in custody with counsel. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall have no restraints during court proceedings. Financial Affidavit filed. The Federal Public Defenders Office is appointed as defense counsel. Defendant is advised of his rights/charges. Defendant waives reading of the Indictment. Waiver of Identity Hearing filed. ORDERED defendant identified as named defendant in the Indictment and is held to answer in the Southern District of California. Government moves for detention. Defense counsel requests that the detention hearing take place in the Southern District of California. Defendant is temporarily detained pending the detention hearing in the Southern District of California and is remanded to custody. The Court advises the parties of the United States Brady obligations in open court. Status Conference set for Tuesday, December 5, 2024 at 4:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. The status hearing is automatically vacated if the defendant is transported to the Southern District of California. Status Hearing set for 12/5/2024 at 04:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL as to Rolando Sedano-Castillo. FPD appointed as counsel for Defendant. Subpoenas issued upon request, with exception to out-of-state subpoenas which will require court approval. Appearance by: Joy Chen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 11/15/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
5 5 WAIVER of Rule 32.1 Hearing by Rolando Sedano-Castillo. (DLS)
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE of Assertion of Right to be Present in Court Unshackled and Preservation of Appellate Rights as to Rolando Sedano-Castillo. (DLS)
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE of Assertion of Right to Counsel, the Right to Remain Silent, and Request to Have Counsel Present During Questioning as to Rolando Sedano-Castillo. (DLS)
Related: [-]