New York Western District Court
Case #: 6:24-cr-06159
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2024
Terminated:Nov 18, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 15, 2024 2:16 AM EST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Nicholas M. Testani
United States Attorney Office - Rochester
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Raymundo Castillo-Reyes (1)
Terminated: 11/18/2024
Represented By
Kathryn S. Austin
Federal Public Defender'S Office For The Western Distri
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/15/2024 2:52 AM EST
Monday, October 07, 2024
Interpreter Spanish appointed in case as to Raymundo Castillo-Reyes (JB) [6:24-mj-00599-MJP]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Raymundo Castillo-Reyes (1). (JB) [6:24-mj-00599-MJP]
Related: [-]
2 2 COONAN ORDER as to Raymundo Castillo-Reyes. Signed by Hon. Mark W. Pedersen on 10/7/24.(Hartsough, Harrison) [6:24-mj-00599-MJP]
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen:Initial Appearance as to Raymundo Castillo-Reyes held on 10/7/2024. Appearances: Kathryn S. Austin, AFPD; Nicholas M. Testani, AUSA; Kristen Nenni, USPO; Carlos Aguirre, Spanish Interpreter sworn. Deft advised of charges and rights. Deft requests Court appointed counsel. Kathryn S. Austin appointed provisionally subject to review of a Financial Affidavit. Govt moves for detention based on risk of flight. Deft reserves rights to a Preliminary Hearing and Detention Hearing, requests entry of a Coonan Order and a date 30 days out to reconvene for status. Order regarding continuing Brady obligation read into the record and acknowledged by the Govt, written order to follow. Status Conference/Set PH Date set for 11/4/2024 at 9:30 AM before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. TIME EXCLUDED FROM 10/7/2024 TO 11/4/2024 FOR REASONS STATED ON THE RECORD. Deft remains in custody. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(JB) [6:24-mj-00599-MJP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
4 4 ORDER Regarding Continuing Brady Obligation as to Raymundo Castillo-Reyes. Signed by Hon. Mark W. Pedersen on 10/8/2024.(JB) [6:24-mj-00599-MJP]
Related: [-]
5 5 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Raymundo Castillo-Reyes. (JB) [6:24-mj-00599-MJP]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
7 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen:Status Conference as to Raymundo Castillo-Reyes held on 11/4/2024. Appearances: Kathryn S. Austin, AFPD; Nicholas M. Testani, AUSA; Nicolas Penchaszadeh, Spanish Interpreter sworn. Parties reviewing discovery and working towards resolution. Status Conference/Set PH Date set for 12/2/2024 at 1:00 PM before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. TIME EXCLUDED FROM 11/4/2024 TO 12/2/2024 FOR REASONS STATED ON THE RECORD. Deft remains in custody. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(JB) [6:24-mj-00599-MJP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
6 6 TEXT SCHEDULING ORDER as to Raymundo Castillo-Reyes: Plea and Sentence set for 11/15/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 2nd Floor, 100 State Street, Rochester NY before Hon. Meredith A. Vacca. Signed by Hon. Meredith A. Vacca on 11/12/2024.(KSP) [6:24-mj-00599-MJP]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
8 8 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Raymundo Castillo-Reyes. (RE)
Related: [-]
9 9 INFORMATION as to Raymundo Castillo-Reyes (1) count(s) 1. (RE)
Related: [-]
10 10 PLEA AGREEMENT as to Raymundo Castillo-Reyes. (RE)
Related: [-]
11 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Meredith A. Vacca: Plea Hearing as to Raymundo Castillo-Reyes held on 11/15/2024. Appearances: Nicholas Testani, AUSA on behalf of the Government, Kathryn Austin, AFPD, with Defendant, Jacquilyn Finucane, USPO, and Maria Meck, USPO on behalf of Probation, Carlos Aguirre, Spanish Interpreter. Interpreter sworn. Defendant sworn and advised of rights. Defendant waives indictment and agrees to filing of 1-count felony Information. Plea agreement executed. Court accepts the plea. Plea entered by Raymundo Castillo-Reyes (1) Guilty Count 1. Sentencing held on 11/15/2024 for Raymundo Castillo-Reyes (1), Count(s) 1. Sentenced to time served. Cost of incarceration waived. No supervised release. SPA remitted, no fine. Defendant shall be deported. Government moved to dismiss the complaint, granted. (Court Reporter Joony Odenbach.)(KSP)
Related: [-]