New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Lashann Dearcy Hall
Referred: Lara K Eshkenazi
Case #: 1:24-cv-08560
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause15:5(a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 30, 2025 3:35 AM EST
Defendant
Zhong Minxuan
Represented By
Aaron Schweitzer
Troy Law, PLLC
contact info
Tiffany Troy
Troy Legal, PLLC
contact info
John Troy
Troy Law, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Bilan Xu
Represented By
Aaron Schweitzer
Troy Law, PLLC
contact info
Tiffany Troy
Troy Legal, PLLC
contact info
John Troy
Troy Law, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
ZB Relax Spa Inc
191 Broadway
Amityville, NY 11701
Represented By
Aaron Schweitzer
Troy Law, PLLC
contact info
Tiffany Troy
Troy Legal, PLLC
contact info
John Troy
Troy Law, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Wei Min
Represented By
Do Kyung Kim
Law Firm Of Dk & Associates, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, April 07, 2025
order Order(Other) Mon 04/07 5:50 PM
ORDER: On March 13, 2025, Defendants filed a motion for a pre-motion conference14 in anticipation of a motion to dismiss. In direct contravention of the Court's Individual Practices, Plaintiff failed to respond by March 20, 2025. See J. DeArcy Hall Individual Practices, Section III. A.5. Plaintiff is directed to respond to Defendants' motion14 for a pre-motion conference no later than April 8, 2025. Failure to respond may result in the issuance of sanctions, including dismissal for failure to prosecute.Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 4/7/2025. (KWL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
14 14 motion Pre Motion Conference Thu 03/13 8:14 PM
MOTION for pre motion conference Defendants Contemplated Motion to Dismiss by Zhong Minxuan, Bilan Xu, ZB Relax Spa Inc. (Schweitzer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Copy of Summons Delivered by Plaintiff's Counsel
13 13 misc Stipulation Thu 03/13 4:53 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint through March 20, 2025 by Zhong Minxuan, Bilan Xu, ZB Relax Spa Inc (Troy, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
order Order(Other) Wed 02/26 3:36 PM
ORDER: The deadline to answer the Complaint has passed. Defendants are directed to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 03/11/2025 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi on 2/26/2025. (MED)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/07 6:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Schweitzer on behalf of ZB Relax Spa Inc, Bilan Xu, Zhong Minxuan (aty to be noticed) (Schweitzer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/07 6:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany Troy on behalf of ZB Relax Spa Inc, Bilan Xu, Zhong Minxuan (aty to be noticed) (Troy, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/07 6:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Troy on behalf of ZB Relax Spa Inc, Bilan Xu, Zhong Minxuan (aty to be noticed) (Troy, John)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/07 10:30 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wei Min. Zhong Minxuan served on 12/27/2024, answer due 1/17/2025; Bilan Xu served on 12/27/2024, answer due 1/17/2025; ZB Relax Spa Inc served on 12/27/2024, answer due 1/17/2025. (Kim, Do Kyung)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
8 8 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically Thu 12/26 8:04 AM
APPROVAL re6 Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. Signed by Brenna B. Mahoney, Clerk of Court by Tiffeny Lee-Harris, Case Administration Manager on 12/26/2024. (TLH)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued Mon 12/23 3:14 PM
Summons Issued as to ZB Relax Spa Inc. (MLR)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Refund of Fees Paid Electronically Mon 12/23 10:54 AM
First MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically Wei Min by Min Wei. (Kim, Do Kyung)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Mon 12/23 12:46 PM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: The name on the summons does not match the name as it appears on the complaint (Correct Spelling? Zhong Minxuan or Minxuan Zhong). Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (MLR)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 21, 2024
5 5 cmp Complaint Sat 12/21 1:09 PM
COMPLAINT Wei Min against All Defendants filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18607437 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Min Wei. (Kim, Do Kyung)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
Friday, December 20, 2024
4 4 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 12/20 4:40 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. Corrections have been made. Please refer to ALL Corrections made on this case, SPECIFICALLY THE OTHER SECTION ON THIS FORM! (KD)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Fri 12/20 4:30 PM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (KD)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 12/20 4:28 PM
Case Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Fri 12/20 4:42 PM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: The Date and the Deputy Clerk Signature section should be left blank! Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (KD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
2 2 cmp Complaint Wed 12/18 10:01 AM
COMPLAINT Wei Min against All Parties filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18593231 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Min Wei. (Kim, Do Kyung)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/17 11:17 AM
COMPLAINT Wei Min against ZB Relax Spa Inc, Bilan Xu, Minxuan Zhong filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18588511 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Min Wei. (Kim, Do Kyung)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
utility Incorrect Case-Document Information Mon 12/16 2:44 PM
Please file the Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Proposed Summons and pay the Civil Filing Fee for the following case so that it may be processed. Initial Case Opening Documents Should be Filed at The Time a Case Number is generated (SDM)
Related: [-]