Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-12534

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:J Kate Stickles
Case #: 1:24-ap-50296
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Vijayant Singh
Hudson Regional Hospital 55 Meadowlands Parkway
Secaucus, NJ 07094
Represented By
Vijayant Singh
contact info
Defendant
Nashima Highsmith
14 Packard Street
Bayonne, NJ 07002
Represented By
Nashima Highsmith
contact info
Defendant
CD&R Realty, LLC
8100 Kennedy Boulevard
North Bergen, NJ 07074
Represented By
CD&R Realty, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Dr. Marc Goldstein
8100 Kennedy Boulevard
North Bergen, NJ 07074
Represented By
Dr. Marc Goldstein
contact info
Defendant
Dr. Alejandro Presilla
15 Fulton Street
Weehawken, NJ 07086
Represented By
Dr. Alejandro Presilla
contact info
Plaintiff
CarePoint Health Systems Inc.
Represented By
Peter C. Hughes
Dilworth Paxson LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, March 10, 2025
17 17 misc Exhibit Mon 03/10 3:43 PM
Exhibit(s) --- [Revised Proposed] Order Granting Debtors' Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction and a Temporary Restraining Order Related [+] Filed by CarePoint Health Systems Inc.. (Hughes, Peter)
Related: [-] 4 ,5 ,6 ,9 ,16
Monday, February 24, 2025
16 16 2 pgs order Order Mon 02/24 10:07 AM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION RESOLVING OBJECTION OF DEFENDANTS DR. MARC GOLDSTEIN AND CD&R REALTY, LLC TO DEBTORS AMENDED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, AND EXTENDING DEFENDANTS DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT Related [+] Order Signed on 2/24/2025. (AJL)
Related: [-] 4 ,5 ,6 ,9 ,15
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Friday, February 21, 2025
15 15 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Fri 02/21 5:01 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation by and Between the Debtors and Dr. Marc Goldstein and CD&R Realty, LLC Resolving Objection to Debtors Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction and a Temporary Restraining Order and Extending Deadline to Respond to the Amended Complaint Related [+] Filed by CarePoint Health Systems Inc.. (Hughes, Peter)
Related: [-] 4 ,5 ,6 ,9
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Thursday, February 20, 2025
14 14 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 02/20 5:50 PM
Answer to Amended Complaint Related [+] Filed by Vijayant Singh Mediation due date: 06/20/2025.(Waxman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 4
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
13 13 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 02/05 10:01 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendants BMC Hospital LLC, CD&R Realty, LLC, Dr. Marc Goldstein, Nashima Highsmith, Dr. Alejandro Presilla, Vijayant Singh. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 3/12/2025 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Hughes, Peter)
Related: [-] ument4 ,5
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
12 12 notice Pretrial Conference - Notice Tue 02/04 6:11 PM
Notice of Pretrial Conference --- Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference in an Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Filed by CarePoint Health Systems Inc. Pretrial Conference set for 3/12/2025 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Hughes, Peter)
Related: [-] 4 ,5
Friday, January 24, 2025
11 11 3 pgs motion Request for Oral Argument Fri 01/24 4:07 PM
Request for Oral Argument Filed by CD&R Realty, LLC, Dr. Marc Goldstein Related [+]. (Weiss, John)
Related: [-] 6 ,9 ,3 ,4 ,1 ,5
10 10 claims Certificate of Mailing Fri 01/24 12:08 AM
Certificate of Mailing /Service by Andrea Speelman . Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. Related [+] (Garabato, Sid)
Related: [-] 9
Friday, January 17, 2025
9 9 answer Reply Fri 01/17 3:22 PM
Reply in Support of Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 105(a) and/or for an Extension of the Automatic Stay Pursuant to Section 362(a) of the Bankruptcy Code Related [+] Filed by CarePoint Health Systems Inc. (Hughes, Peter)
Related: [-] 5 ,6 ,7
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
8 8 notice Appearance - Notice Wed 01/15 5:24 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by CarePoint Health Systems Inc. (Aaronson, Anne)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
7 7 4 pgs motion Stipulation Fri 01/03 4:43 PM
Stipulation Extending Time to Submit Reply Brief Between CarePoint Health Systems Inc. and Defendants CD&R Realty, LLC and Marc Goldstein . Filed by CarePoint Health Systems Inc.. (Hughes, Peter)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
6 6 misc Brief Fri 12/27 12:08 PM
Brief /Defendants' Brief in Response and Opposition to Debtors' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 105(A) and/or for an Extension of the Automatic Stay Pursuant to Section 362(A) of the Bankruptcy Code Related [+] Filed by CD&R Realty, LLC, Dr. Marc Goldstein. (Weiss, John)
Related: [-] 3
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
5 5 4 pgs motion Preliminary Injunction - Motion Tue 12/24 12:36 PM
Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 105(a) and/or For An Extension of the Automatic Stay Pursuant to Section 362(a) of the Bankruptcy Code Related [+] Filed by CarePoint Health Systems Inc.. (Hughes, Peter)
Related: [-] 3 3
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 12/24 12:23 PM
Amended Complaint to Add Party Filed by CarePoint Health Systems Inc. Related [+] AP Summons Served due date: 3/25/2025. (Hughes, Peter)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, December 13, 2024
3 3 4 pgs motion Preliminary Injunction - Motion Fri 12/13 6:57 PM
Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 105(a) and/or For An Extension of the Automatic Stay Pursuant to Section 362(a) of the Bankruptcy Code Related [+] Filed by CarePoint Health Systems Inc. d/b/a Just Health Foundation. (Hughes, Peter)
Related: [-] 1 1
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 12/13 6:48 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 24-50296 JKS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A11939150, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Fri 12/13 6:45 PM
Adversary case 24-50296 Complaint Seeking Extension of the Automatic Stay Under 11 U.S.C. § 362(a) and for Injunctive Relief Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 105(a) by CarePoint Health Systems Inc. d/b/a Just Health Foundation against Vijayant Singh, Nashima Highsmith, CD&R Realty, LLC, Dr. Marc Goldstein, Dr. Alejandro Presilla. Fee Amount $350 (72 (Injunctive relief - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 3/13/2025. (Hughes, Peter)
Related: [-]