Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:23-bk-00998

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joseph N Callaway
Case #: 5:24-ap-00137
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Titan Retirement Advisors, LLC
5757 Fluellen Oaks Lane Suite 601
Flushear, TX 77441
Represented By
Titan Retirement Advisors, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Bircher III, Trustee
Davis Hartman Wright, PLLC 209 Pollock Street
New Bern, NC 28560
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Buckmiller & Frost, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, April 03, 2025
13 13 order Scheduling Order Thu 04/03 1:40 PM
Pretrial Scheduling Order. Final Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/30/2025 at 01:00 PM at Greenville Courtroom (New). Pretrial Order due by 10/28/2025. Trial date set for 11/6/2025 at 10:00 AM at Greenville Courtroom (New). (Angel, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
12 12 order Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference Tue 04/01 3:06 PM
Amended Order Setting Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference. Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/3/2025 at 11:30 AM at Telephone Conference/Judge Callaway. (Angel, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
11 11 order Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference Wed 03/12 9:41 AM
Order Setting Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference. Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/3/2025 at 11:30 AM at Greenville Courtroom (New). (Angel, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
10 10 admis Pre-Conference Report Tue 03/11 10:34 AM
Pre-Conference Report filed by Joseph Zachary Frost, Lydia C. Stoney on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Titan Retirement Advisors, LLC Related [+]. (Stoney, Lydia)
Related: [-] 8 Order Directing Parties to File Joint Report
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
9 9 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Thu 02/13 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 02/12/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8
Monday, February 10, 2025
8 8 order Directing Filing of Joint Report Mon 02/10 12:39 PM
Order Directing Parties to File Joint Report. Pre-Conference Report due by 3/12/2025. (Angel, Sharon)
Related: [-]
utility Calendar - Schedule Mon 02/10 12:06 PM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Schedule Hearing Date Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/07 3:11 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Lydia C. Stoney on behalf of Titan Retirement Advisors, LLC. (Stoney, Lydia)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance Fri 01/31 12:42 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Lydia C. Stoney on behalf of Titan Retirement Advisors, LLC. (Stoney, Lydia)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 19, 2025
5 5 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Mon 01/20 12:33 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 01/19/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4
Friday, January 17, 2025
4 4 order Directing Plaintiff to Proceed Fri 01/17 4:07 PM
Order Directing Plaintiff to Proceed After Failure to Answer Due by 2/10/2025. (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
3 3 misc Affidavit Fri 12/27 11:46 AM
Affidavit of Service filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Monday, December 16, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 12/16 9:31 AM
Summons Issued on Titan Retirement Advisors, LLC Answer Due 1/15/2025. (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 12/13 4:12 PM
Adversary case 24-00137 5. Complaint by John C. Bircher, III, Chapter 7 Trustee for Covenant Solar Tech, LLC against Titan Retirement Advisors, LLC (Fee Deferred) (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits A & B