Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:23-bk-00998

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joseph N Callaway
Case #: 5:24-ap-00138
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
RB Engineering, Inc.
168 Quade Drive
Cary, NC 27513
Represented By
RB Engineering, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Bircher III, Trustee
Davis Hartman Wright, PLLC 209 Pollock Street
New Bern, NC 28560
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Buckmiller & Frost, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, March 21, 2025
13 13 misc Rule 26(a) Disclosures Fri 03/21 8:50 AM
Rule 26(a) Disclosures filed by Kelly C. Newcomb on behalf of RB Engineering, Inc.. (Newcomb, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
12 12 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Thu 03/13 12:39 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 03/12/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11
Monday, March 10, 2025
11 11 order Scheduling Order Mon 03/10 2:19 PM
Scheduling Order. Final Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/4/2025 at 01:30 PM at Telephone Conference/Judge Callaway. Pretrial Order due by 10/30/2025. Trial date set for 11/6/2025 at 10:00 AM at Greenville Courtroom (New). (Angel, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 09, 2025
10 10 admis Pre-Conference Report Sun 03/09 6:00 PM
Pre-Conference Report filed by Joseph Zachary Frost, Kelly C. Newcomb on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, RB Engineering, Inc. Related [+]. (Newcomb, Kelly)
Related: [-] 8 Order Directing Parties to File Joint Report
Sunday, February 09, 2025
9 9 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Mon 02/10 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 02/09/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8
Friday, February 07, 2025
8 8 order Directing Filing of Joint Report Fri 02/07 2:22 PM
Order Directing Parties to File Joint Report. Pre-Conference Report due by 3/10/2025. (Angel, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
utility Calendar - Schedule Wed 02/05 3:57 PM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Schedule Hearing Date Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/04 12:00 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Kelly C. Newcomb on behalf of RB Engineering, Inc.. (Newcomb, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance Thu 01/30 2:54 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Kelly C. Newcomb on behalf of RB Engineering, Inc.. (Newcomb, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 20, 2025
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 01/20 10:17 PM
First Amended Complaint against RB Engineering, Inc.. filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - List of Transfers & Payments to RB Engineering, Inc.
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Copies of Checks to RB Engineering, Inc.
4 4 admis Return of Service Mon 01/20 10:12 PM
Return of Service filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,3 Summons Reissued
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
3 3 court Summons Reissued Wed 01/08 8:04 AM
Summons Reissued on RB Engineering, Inc. Date Issued 1/8/2025, Answer Due 2/7/2025 (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 12/17 10:59 AM
Summons Issued on RB Engineering, Inc. Answer Due 1/16/2025. (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 12/16 10:48 AM
Adversary case 24-00138 5. Complaint by John C. Bircher, III, Chapter 7 Trustee for Covenant Solar Tech, LLC against RB Engineering, Inc. (Fee Deferred) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - List of Transfers