Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:24-bk-31601

Tennessee Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Suzanne H Bauknight
Case #: 3:24-ap-03031
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2024
Terminated:Mar 17, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Josie Shay Harkins
1408 Old Newport Hwy., #3101
Sevierville, TN 37862
Represented By
Josie Shay Harkins
contact info
Plaintiff
Tennessee State Bank
2210 Parkway
Pigeon Forge, TN 37868
Represented By
Maurice K. Guinn
Gentry, Tipton & Mclemore P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:10 PM EDT
Monday, March 17, 2025
9 9 court Close Adversary Case Mon 03/17 2:50 PM
Adversary Case 3:24-ap-3031 Closed (tlf)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 03/17 2:48 PM
Disposition of Adversary 3:24-ap-3031 Judgment For Plaintiff (tlf)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 18, 2025
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket Sun 01/19 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/18/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Agreed Judgment that Tennessee State Bank is awarded judgment against Josie Shay Harkins in the amount of $28,430.77 plus interest after the entry date of Agreed Judgment and is excepted from discharge (RE: related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Tennessee State Bank). (tlf)
Thursday, January 16, 2025
7 7 order Judgment Thu 01/16 3:08 PM
Agreed Judgment that Tennessee State Bank is awarded judgment against Josie Shay Harkins in the amount of $28,430.77 plus interest after the entry date of Agreed Judgment and is excepted from discharge Related [+]. (tlf)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Tennessee State Bank
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
6 6 motion Agreed Judgment Tue 01/14 2:43 PM
Motion for Agreed Judgment Filed by Maurice K. Guinn on behalf of Plaintiff Tennessee State Bank (Guinn, Maurice)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 12/17 4:36 PM
Summons Service Executed on Josie Shay Harkins 12/16/2024 (Guinn, Maurice)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
4 4 court Summons Issued Mon 12/16 10:40 AM
Summons Issued on Josie Shay Harkins Date Issued 12/16/2024, Answer Due 1/15/2025 (tlf)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Request Mon 12/16 9:05 AM
Request Summons Be Issued On Defendant Josie Shay Harkins (Guinn, Maurice)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint
Friday, December 13, 2024
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Fri 12/13 2:27 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK:3:24-ap-03031-SHB] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A24634724. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 12/13 2:23 PM
Adversary case 3:24-ap-03031. Complaint by Tennessee State Bank, Tennessee State Bank against Josie Shay Harkins. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury))(Guinn, Maurice)
Related: [-]