Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Carlos E Mendoza
Referred: Embry J Kidd
Case #: 6:24-cv-02287
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
CauseAmericans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2024
Terminated:Jan 09, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Jan 30, 2025 4:17 AM EST
Defendant
Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.
Represented By
Daniel Elliot Kalter
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Gretchen M. Lehman
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, P.C. - Tampa
contact info
Plaintiff
Rebecca Blackwell
Represented By
Tanner M. Borges
Richard Celler Legal, P.A.
contact info
Noah E. Storch
Richard Celler Legal, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
16 16 misc Status report Wed 02/05 11:40 AM
STATUS report of Arbitration by Rebecca Blackwell. (Borges, Tanner)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 01/09 11:53 AM
It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the Joint Stipulation to Stay Litigation and Compel Arbitration (Doc. 14 ), construed as a motion, is GRANTED. On or before February 10, 2025, Plaintiff shall initiate arbitration. Also on or before February 10, 2025 and every 180 days thereafter, Plaintiff shall file a report as to the status of arbitration with the Court. This case is otherwise STAYED pending the outcome of arbitration. The Clerk is directed to administratively close this case. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 1/9/2025. (ALL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
14 14 motion Stay Tue 01/07 4:20 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Litigation and Compel Arbitration by Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc..(Lehman, Gretchen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Arbitration Agreement
Thursday, January 02, 2025
13 13 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 01/02 2:37 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 6:24-cv-2287-CEM-UAM. Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd no longer assigned to the case. (RPB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
12 12 service Summons returned executed Thu 12/19 10:44 AM
RETURN of service executed on 12/18/2024 by Rebecca Blackwell as to Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. (Storch, Noah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
11 11 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 12/17 4:10 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Rebecca Blackwell. (Borges, Tanner)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of a Related Action Tue 12/17 4:09 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Rebecca Blackwell. Related case(s): No (Borges, Tanner)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 12/17 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Tanner M. Borges on behalf of Rebecca Blackwell. Lead Counsel: Tanner M. Borges. (Borges, Tanner)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Order Tue 12/17 12:10 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/17/2024. (ALL)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs order Order Tue 12/17 12:09 PM
INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/17/2024. (ALL)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons issued Tue 12/17 11:12 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Harbor Freight Tools USA Inc. (MSN)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 12/17 10:49 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Noah E. Storch of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MSN)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 12/17 10:48 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Noah E. Storch of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MSN)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs order Order Tue 12/17 8:10 AM
ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 12/17/2024. (JOR)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 12/16 2:36 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:24-cv-02287-CEM-EJK. (AA)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 12/16 11:18 AM
COMPLAINT against Harbor Freight Tools USA Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22822775) filed by Rebecca Blackwell.(Storch, Noah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet