Colorado District Court
Judge:Regina M Rodriguez
Referred: Cyrus Y Chung
Case #: 1:24-cv-03468
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000(e)(2)-(o)(t) - Job Discrimination (Other)
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 30, 2025 1:28 AM MST
Defendant
City and County of Denver
Defendant
Denver County District Attorney's Office
Defendant
Elizabeth McCann
Plaintiff
Daniel J. Hines
24174 Sumac Drive
Golden, CO 80401


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 05/07 9:21 AM
MINUTE ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Plaintiff's Second Motion to Vacate the Scheduling Conference on May 13, 2025 and Request to Reset It. ECF No.16 . Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion, ECF No.16 , is GRANTED. Accordingly, it is further ORDERED that the May 13, 2025 Scheduling Conference is RESET to July 17, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom C-205 before Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file the proposed Scheduling Order on or before July 10, 2025. After filing the proposed Scheduling Order on the docket, the parties shall also email a Word version to Chung_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov . It is further ORDERED that, regardless of whether the plaintiff amends his complaint or not, the plaintiff shall serve the defendants on or before May 23, 2025. Failure to do so may result in dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Entered by Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung on 5/7/2025.(dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
17 17 order Order Referring Motion Tue 05/06 3:23 PM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Conduct Scheduling Conference filed by Daniel J. Hines. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 5/6/2025. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Extension of Time Tue 05/06 2:49 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Conduct Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Daniel J. Hines. (Neusch, Erik)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 02/11 3:42 PM
MINUTE ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Vacate the Scheduling Conference and Request to Reset It. ECF No.13 . For good cause, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion, ECF No.13 , is GRANTED. Accordingly, it is further ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set on February 18, 2025 at 10:30 a.m. is RESET on May 13, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file the proposed Scheduling Order on or before May 6, 2025. After filing the proposed Scheduling Order on the docket, the parties shall also email a Word version to Chung_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov . Entered by Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung on 2/11/2025.(dgumb, )
Related: [-]
14 14 order Memorandum Tue 02/11 8:44 AM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Conduct Scheduling Conference filed by Daniel J. Hines. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 2/11/2025. Text Only Entry (kmyha)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
13 13 motion Extension of Time Mon 02/10 5:23 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Conduct Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Daniel J. Hines. (Neusch, Erik)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Mon 02/10 5:19 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Plainitff by Erik R. Neusch on behalf of Daniel J. HinesAttorney Erik R. Neusch added to party Daniel J. Hines(pty:pla) (Neusch, Erik)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
11 11 misc Reassigning Magistrate Judge Tue 01/07 9:17 AM
REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This action is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung upon his appointment. All future pleadings should reference Magistrate Judge Chung at the end of the civil action number (such as 24-cv-3468-RMR-CYC). Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained and will now be handled by Magistrate Judge Chung in Courtroom C-205 in the Byron G. Rogers Courthouse, 1961 Stout St, Denver, CO 80294. If previously directed to contact Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty or his Chambers, Parties shall instead contact Chung Chambers at the following telephone number or email address: 303-335-2761 and Chung_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov. (Text only entry) (sadhi, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
10 10 misc Certificate of Mailing/Service Fri 01/03 1:51 PM
CERTIFICATE of Mailing re9 Minute Order. Mailed to Daniel J. Hines 24174 Sumac Drive Golden, CO 80401 (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
9 9 order Minute Order Fri 01/03 1:50 PM
MINUTE ORDER: On December 19, 2024, District Judge Regina M. Rodriguez referred the above-captioned case to Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. ECF 6 . Proposed Scheduling Order due 2/10/2025 . Scheduling Conference set for 2/18/2025 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/3/2025. (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
8 8 misc Letter Thu 12/19 2:16 PM
LETTER from Clerk of Court re: Service of Process of1 Complaint. (ccuen, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 12/19 10:37 AM
CERTIFICATE of Mailing by USPS by Clerk of Court re 6 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,, to Daniel J. Hines at 24174 Sumac Drive Golden, CO 80401. Text Only Entry. (echa, )
Related: [-]
6 6 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 12/19 9:50 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 12/19/2024. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Thu 12/19 9:14 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (ccuen, )
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 12/19 9:08 AM
ORDER DRAWING CASE. By Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley on 12/19/2024. This case shall be drawn to a presiding judge and, if applicable, to a magistrate judge. (Case randomly reassigned to Judge Regina M. Rodriguez for all further proceedings and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty.) (ccuen, ) Modified to edit docket text on 12/19/2024 (ccuen, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
3 3 misc Filing Fee Received Mon 12/16 3:47 PM
Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number 112750 (agryan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Case Assigned to Judge Mon 12/16 11:41 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 12/16 11:40 AM
COMPLAINT against City and County of Denver, Denver County District Attorney's Office, Elizabeth McCann Filing Fee: $405.00 Receipt Number:112750, filed by Daniel J. Hines.(efoga, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Right to Sue Letter,
Att: 2 Charge of Discrimination/EEOC Complaint,
Att: 3 Position Statement,
Att: 4 Response to Position Statement