California Central District Court
Judge:Anne Hwang
Referred: Alka Sagar
Case #: 2:24-cv-10820
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2024
Terminated:Mar 27, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Jan 30, 2025 12:44 AM PST
Defendant
20th Century Studios, Inc.
Represented By
David Aronoff
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Isaac Yeram Kim
Represented By
Thomas E Dietrich
Mcarthur Law Firm PC
contact info
Stephen Charles McArthur
Mcarthur Law Firm PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, March 28, 2025
19 19 misc Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121) Fri 03/28 11:10 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing). (jp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Minutes Order Dismissing case
Thursday, March 27, 2025
18 18 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 03/28 11:09 AM
MINUTE In Chambers - Counsel Notified by Judge Anne Hwang: The case is ordered closed pursuant to the Joint Stipulation to dismiss filed on 3/26/202517 . All pending hearings and motions are now taken off calendar and vacated. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
17 17 stip Dismiss Case Wed 03/26 1:35 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by plaintiff Isaac Yeram Kim.(Dietrich, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
16 16 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Fri 02/07 1:40 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Anne Hwang. PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This matter is set for a Scheduling Conference in Courtroom 7D of the First Street Courthouse, 350 West First Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 on 6/11/2025 at 01:30 PM. [See Order for further details.] (san)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held Fri 02/07 1:10 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Anne Hwang. Scheduling Conference set for 6/11/2025 at 01:30 PM before Judge Anne Hwang. (ys)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
14 14 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 02/05 3:50 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant 20th Century Studios, Inc., identifying Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation dba 20th Century Studios; The Walt Disney Company. (Aronoff, David)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 02/05 3:46 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant 20th Century Studios, Inc..(Aronoff, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
12 12 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 01/10 3:35 PM
STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Anne Hwang. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
11 11 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Mon 01/06 1:10 PM
Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to 20th Century Studios, Inc. answer now due 2/7/2025, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant 20th Century Studios, Inc..(Attorney David Aronoff added to party 20th Century Studios, Inc.(pty:dft))(Aronoff, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
10 10 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 12/19 4:21 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Isaac Yeram Kim, upon Defendant 20th Century Studios, Inc. served on 12/18/2024, answer due 1/8/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC c/o Koy Saechao, Registered Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Dietrich, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 12/17 12:38 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant 20th Century Studios, Inc. (lh)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 12/17 12:36 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 12/17 12:36 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 12/17 12:35 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Anne Hwang and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (lh)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
5 5 misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121) Mon 12/16 3:30 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Isaac Yeram Kim. (McArthur, Stephen)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 12/16 3:23 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Isaac Yeram Kim, identifying Isaac Yeram Kim; 20th Century Studios, Inc.; The Walt Disney Company. (McArthur, Stephen)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs notice Summons Request Mon 12/16 3:14 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Isaac Yeram Kim. (McArthur, Stephen)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 12/16 3:07 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Isaac Yeram Kim. (McArthur, Stephen)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 12/16 3:05 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-38763106 - Fee: $405, filed by plaintiff Isaac Yeram Kim. (Attorney Stephen Charles McArthur added to party Isaac Yeram Kim(pty:pla))(McArthur, Stephen)
Related: [-]