Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Claude M Hilton
Referred: William E Fitzpatrick
Case #: 1:24-cv-02289
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 30, 2025 4:23 AM EST
Defendant
Antony J Blinken
Defendant
Daniel P Callahan
Defendant
Robert Jachim
Plaintiff
Mehrdad Moradi
Represented By
Matthew Tony Galati
The Galati Law Firm
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Zahra Asadi
Represented By
Matthew Tony Galati
The Galati Law Firm
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Seyedeh Nahid Naghshbandi
Represented By
Matthew Tony Galati
The Galati Law Firm
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Artin Simon Nercisian
Represented By
Matthew Tony Galati
The Galati Law Firm
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
David Nicholaeff
Represented By
Matthew Tony Galati
The Galati Law Firm
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Fatemeh Nikoopoor
Represented By
Matthew Tony Galati
The Galati Law Firm
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Marcus Jerome Papandrea
Represented By
Matthew Tony Galati
The Galati Law Firm
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Asad Saidpour
Represented By
Matthew Tony Galati
The Galati Law Firm
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Michelle Savoie
Represented By
Matthew Tony Galati
The Galati Law Firm
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Marjan Shafaei
Represented By
Matthew Tony Galati
The Galati Law Firm
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Sarah Mohammady Shodja
Represented By
Matthew Tony Galati
The Galati Law Firm
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Mahsa Sirous
Represented By
Matthew Tony Galati
The Galati Law Firm
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Abtin Tehrani
Represented By
Matthew Tony Galati
The Galati Law Firm
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Yavar Yarahmadi
Represented By
Matthew Tony Galati
The Galati Law Firm
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Azad Zadeh
Represented By
Matthew Tony Galati
The Galati Law Firm
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Zahra Momeni
Represented By
Matthew Tony Galati
The Galati Law Firm
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Mahsasadat Mirjamali
Represented By
Matthew Tony Galati
The Galati Law Firm
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Mahsa Maleki
Represented By
Matthew Tony Galati
The Galati Law Firm
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Mazda Keyvannia
Represented By
Matthew Tony Galati
The Galati Law Firm
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Anasheh Janian
Represented By
Matthew Tony Galati
The Galati Law Firm
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Tony Ivan Namian
Represented By
Matthew Tony Galati
The Galati Law Firm
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Mojtaba Hosseini
Represented By
Matthew Tony Galati
The Galati Law Firm
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Hossein Haddad
Represented By
Matthew Tony Galati
The Galati Law Firm
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Salar Golro
Represented By
Matthew Tony Galati
The Galati Law Firm
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Alireza Gerami
Represented By
Matthew Tony Galati
The Galati Law Firm
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Bahram Dinyarian
Represented By
Matthew Tony Galati
The Galati Law Firm
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Sweeny David
Represented By
Matthew Tony Galati
The Galati Law Firm
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Faeze Behzadi
Represented By
Matthew Tony Galati
The Galati Law Firm
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Toktam Asghari
Represented By
Matthew Tony Galati
The Galati Law Firm
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Saber Alibabazadeh
Represented By
Matthew Tony Galati
The Galati Law Firm
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 04/01 9:47 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Only the Named Parties by Seyedeh Nahid Naghshbandi, Marcus Jerome Papandrea (Galati, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 03/24 5:57 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Only the Named Parties by Toktam Asghari, Asad Saidpour (Galati, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
16 16 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 03/10 2:11 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ,10 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue ,9 MOTION to Sever Plaintiffs and/or Plaintiffs' Claims ,8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Antony J Blinken, Daniel P Callahan, Robert Jachim. (Cooper, Christian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
15 15 notice Notice (other) Tue 03/04 9:56 PM
NOTICE by Saber Alibabazadeh, Zahra Asadi, Toktam Asghari, Faeze Behzadi, Sweeny David, Bahram Dinyarian, Alireza Gerami, Salar Golro, Hossein Haddad, Mojtaba Hosseini, Tony Ivan Namian, Anasheh Janian, Mazda Keyvannia, Mahsa Maleki, Mahsasadat Mirjamali, Zahra Momeni, Mehrdad Moradi, Seyedeh Nahid Naghshbandi, Artin Simon Nercisian, David Nicholaeff, Fatemeh Nikoopoor, Marcus Jerome Papandrea, Asad Saidpour, Michelle Savoie, Marjan Shafaei, Sarah Mohammady Shodja, Mahsa Sirous, Abtin Tehrani, Yavar Yarahmadi, Azad Zadeh re14 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,,, Notice of Errata(Galati, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Corrected Pages
14 14 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 03/04 4:42 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ,9 MOTION to Sever Plaintiffs and/or Plaintiffs' Claims ,10 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue ,8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Saber Alibabazadeh, Zahra Asadi, Toktam Asghari, Faeze Behzadi, Sweeny David, Bahram Dinyarian, Alireza Gerami, Salar Golro, Hossein Haddad, Mojtaba Hosseini, Tony Ivan Namian, Anasheh Janian, Mazda Keyvannia, Mahsa Maleki, Mahsasadat Mirjamali, Zahra Momeni, Mehrdad Moradi, Seyedeh Nahid Naghshbandi, Artin Simon Nercisian, David Nicholaeff, Fatemeh Nikoopoor, Marcus Jerome Papandrea, Asad Saidpour, Michelle Savoie, Marjan Shafaei, Sarah Mohammady Shodja, Mahsa Sirous, Abtin Tehrani, Yavar Yarahmadi, Azad Zadeh.(Galati, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - 9 FAM 504.7-2(b), Timeliness of Interview,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - U.S. Dept of State Bureau of Consular Affairs, Immigrant Visa Prioritization, last updated: September 13, 2021,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Excerpt of Transcript, EsmaeilZadeh v Blinken, Case No. 8:23-cv-02118-FWSJDE, oral argument on April 4, 2023,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - DOJ Letter explaining Administrative Processing,
Att: 5 Exhibit E1 - U.S. Dept of State Bureau of Consular Affairs, Administrative Processing Information (December 3, 2017),
Att: 6 Exhibit E2 - U.S. Dept of State Bureau of Consular Affairs, Administrative Processing Information (May 13, 2024),
Att: 7 Exhibit F - 9 FAM 502.7-3(B)(d)(1)(b),
Att: 8 Exhibit G - Ahmed v. Blinken, Civil Action No. 24-153 (LLA), 2024 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 215789 (D.D.C. Nov. 27, 2024),
Att: 9 Exhibit H - Declaration of Rachel Anne Peterson
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
13 13 misc Waiver of Tue 02/18 3:49 PM
Waiver of Hearing as to all Motions by Antony J Blinken, Daniel P Callahan, Robert Jachim (Cooper, Christian)
Related: [-]
12 12 respm Memorandum in Support Tue 02/18 3:48 PM
Memorandum in Support re11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ,10 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue ,9 MOTION to Sever Plaintiffs and/or Plaintiffs' Claims ,8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Antony J Blinken, Daniel P Callahan, Robert Jachim.(Cooper, Christian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Melody A. Brukiewa
11 11 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 02/18 3:45 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Antony J Blinken, Daniel P Callahan, Robert Jachim. (Cooper, Christian)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Dismiss Tue 02/18 3:44 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Antony J Blinken, Daniel P Callahan, Robert Jachim. (Cooper, Christian)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Sever Tue 02/18 3:42 PM
MOTION to Sever Plaintiffs and/or Plaintiffs' Claims by Antony J Blinken, Daniel P Callahan, Robert Jachim. (Cooper, Christian)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 02/18 3:41 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Antony J Blinken, Daniel P Callahan, Robert Jachim. (Cooper, Christian)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/18 1:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christian James Cooper on behalf of Antony J Blinken, Daniel P Callahan, Robert Jachim (Cooper, Christian)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 05, 2025
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Sun 01/05 2:51 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle Savoie, Marjan Shafaei, Yavar Yarahmadi, Bahram Dinyarian, Zahra Asadi, Hossein Haddad, Mahsa Sirous, Tony Ivan Namian, Fatemeh Nikoopoor, Azad Zadeh, Salar Golro, Zahra Momeni, Alireza Gerami, Mazda Keyvannia, Seyedeh Nahid Naghshbandi, Mahsasadat Mirjamali, Abtin Tehrani, Mehrdad Moradi, Marcus Jerome Papandrea, Sarah Mohammady Shodja, Sweeny David, Toktam Asghari, Mojtaba Hosseini, David Nicholaeff, Mahsa Maleki, Artin Simon Nercisian, Saber Alibabazadeh, Faeze Behzadi, Anasheh Janian, Asad Saidpour. Antony J Blinken served on 12/20/2024, answer due 2/18/2025; Daniel P Callahan served on 12/20/2024, answer due 2/18/2025; Robert Jachim served on 12/20/2024, answer due 2/18/2025.(Galati, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-D, service to US Attorney, Blinken, Jachim, Callahan, Garland
Thursday, December 19, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Thu 12/19 12:08 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Curtis Lee Morrison for Saber Alibabazadeh,Curtis Lee Morrison for Zahra Asadi,Curtis Lee Morrison for Toktam Asghari,Curtis Lee Morrison for Faeze Behzadi,Curtis Lee Morrison for Sweeny David,Curtis Lee Morrison for Bahram Dinyarian,Curtis Lee Morrison for Alireza Gerami,Curtis Lee Morrison for Salar Golro,Curtis Lee Morrison for Hossein Haddad,Curtis Lee Morrison for Mojtaba Hosseini,Curtis Lee Morrison for Tony Ivan Namian,Curtis Lee Morrison for Anasheh Janian,Curtis Lee Morrison for Mazda Keyvannia,Curtis Lee Morrison for Mahsa Maleki,Curtis Lee Morrison for Mahsasadat Mirjamali,Curtis Lee Morrison for Zahra Momeni,Curtis Lee Morrison for Mehrdad Moradi,Curtis Lee Morrison for Seyedeh Nahid Naghshbandi,Curtis Lee Morrison for Artin Simon Nercisian,Curtis Lee Morrison for David Nicholaeff,Curtis Lee Morrison for Fatemeh Nikoopoor,Curtis Lee Morrison for Marcus Jerome Papandrea,Curtis Lee Morrison for Asad Saidpour,Curtis Lee Morrison for Michelle Savoie,Curtis Lee Morrison for Marjan Shafaei,Curtis Lee Morrison for Sarah Mohammady Shodja,Curtis Lee Morrison for Mahsa Sirous,Curtis Lee Morrison for Abtin Tehrani,Curtis Lee Morrison for Yavar Yarahmadi,Curtis Lee Morrison for Azad Zadeh. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 12/19/2024. (swil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued as to USA Tue 12/17 12:25 PM
Summons Issued as to Antony J Blinken, Daniel P Callahan, Robert Jachim, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA.(swil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Notice
Monday, December 16, 2024
3 3 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/16 5:33 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Curtis Lee Morrison and Certification of Local Counsel Matthew T. Galati Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9905317. by Saber Alibabazadeh, Zahra Asadi, Toktam Asghari, Faeze Behzadi, Sweeny David, Bahram Dinyarian, Alireza Gerami, Salar Golro, Hossein Haddad, Mojtaba Hosseini, Tony Ivan Namian, Anasheh Janian, Mazda Keyvannia, Mahsa Maleki, Mahsasadat Mirjamali, Zahra Momeni, Mehrdad Moradi, Seyedeh Nahid Naghshbandi, Artin Simon Nercisian, David Nicholaeff, Fatemeh Nikoopoor, Marcus Jerome Papandrea, Asad Saidpour, Michelle Savoie, Marjan Shafaei, Sarah Mohammady Shodja, Mahsa Sirous, Abtin Tehrani, Yavar Yarahmadi, Azad Zadeh. (Galati, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Mon 12/16 5:29 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint,,,, by Saber Alibabazadeh, Zahra Asadi, Toktam Asghari, Faeze Behzadi, Sweeny David, Bahram Dinyarian, Alireza Gerami, Salar Golro, Hossein Haddad, Mojtaba Hosseini, Tony Ivan Namian, Anasheh Janian, Mazda Keyvannia, Mahsa Maleki, Mahsasadat Mirjamali, Zahra Momeni, Mehrdad Moradi, Seyedeh Nahid Naghshbandi, Artin Simon Nercisian, David Nicholaeff, Fatemeh Nikoopoor, Marcus Jerome Papandrea, Asad Saidpour, Michelle Savoie, Marjan Shafaei, Sarah Mohammady Shodja, Mahsa Sirous, Abtin Tehrani, Yavar Yarahmadi, Azad Zadeh (Galati, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 12/16 5:27 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9905282.), filed by Michelle Savoie, Marjan Shafaei, Yavar Yarahmadi, Bahram Dinyarian, Zahra Asadi, Hossein Haddad, Mahsa Sirous, Tony Ivan Namian, Fatemeh Nikoopoor, Azad Zadeh, Salar Golro, Zahra Momeni, Alireza Gerami, Mazda Keyvannia, Seyedeh Nahid Naghshbandi, Mahsasadat Mirjamali, Abtin Tehrani, Mehrdad Moradi, Marcus Jerome Papandrea, Sarah Mohammady Shodja, Sweeny David, Toktam Asghari, Mojtaba Hosseini, David Nicholaeff, Mahsa Maleki, Artin Simon Nercisian, Saber Alibabazadeh, Faeze Behzadi, Anasheh Janian, Asad Saidpour.(Galati, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - April 7, 2024, Declaration of Carson Wu,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - 9 FAM § 504.11-3(B)(2)(a) before and after February 26, 2024,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - 9 FAM 504.11-3(A)(6), If an Advisory Opinion (AO) is Required,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - News Articles on President-Elect Trumps Promises to Reinstate Travel Bans,
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Excerpt of Project 2025 Regarding Travel Bans,
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Doctors Note for Plaintiff Sweeny Davids Father,
Att: 8 Exhibit G - CEAC Online Case Statuses
utility Initial Case Assignment Tue 12/17 12:33 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (swil)
Related: [-]