Maryland District Court
Judge:Lydia Kay Griggsby
Case #: 8:24-cv-03616
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Torts
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2024
Terminated:May 05, 2025
Last checked: Monday Jan 27, 2025 3:58 AM EST
Defendant
Carla N Andrews
3403 21st Street SE
District of Columbia, DC 20020
Represented By
Shavon J Smith
The Sjs Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
April T. Ademiluyi
324 Main Street #171
Laurel, MD 20707
Represented By
Allen Ray Dyer
Allen Dyer, Attorney At Law
contact info
Ray M Shepard
The Shepard Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
37 37 6 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 05/05 12:53 PM
ORDER DISMISSING Amended Complaint pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(f) and 41(b); Closing case. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 5/5/2025. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
36 36 corresp Miscellaneous Wed 04/23 10:28 PM
Correspondence re: Show Cause #2(Dyer, Allen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Attachment 2nd Amended Complaint Red Line Version,
Att: 4 Attachment 2nd Amended Complaint REDLINE
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
35 35 4 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 04/22 2:06 PM
ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff TO SHOW CAUSE why she failed to timely respond to Judge Defendants' motion to dismiss, and to FILE her response to Judge Defendants' motion to dismiss on or before April 29, 2025. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 4/22/2025. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
34 34 corresp Miscellaneous Thu 04/10 3:41 PM
Correspondence re: Response to Show Cause OrderAssociated Cases: 8:24-cv-03616-LKG, 8:23-cv-03526-LKG(Dyer, Allen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit #1,
Att: 2 Exhibit #2
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
33 33 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 04/09 4:58 PM
ORDER STRIKING30 Second Amended Complaint filed by April T. Ademiluyi; DIRECTING Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in writing as to why she failed to timely respond to Judge Defendants' motion to dismiss, and to FILE her response to Judge Defendants' motion on or before April 16, 2025. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 4/9/2025. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
32 32 notice QC Notice - Amended Complaint Tue 04/08 1:13 PM
QC NOTICE:30 Amended Complaint filed by April T. Ademiluyi needs to be corrected. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. The following corrective actions are needed regarding missing or incomplete information: **Motion for leave to file amended complaint is required. Please file the motion for leave to file as the main document, and the clean version of the amended complaint and redline version as two separate attachments to the motion. The Summons issued at ECF No. 31 has also been marked as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
31 31 service Summons Issued Tue 04/08 12:38 PM
-FILED IN CLERK'S ERROR- Summons Issued 21 days as to Anthony Brown.(bg3s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 4/8/2025 (bg3s)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
30 30 62 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Mon 04/07 11:43 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by April T. Ademiluyi.(Dyer, Allen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Errata red-line verson of 2rd amended complaint,
Att: 2 Summons Anthony Brown
Friday, March 14, 2025
29 29 motion Dismiss Fri 03/14 7:36 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Sheila Tillerson Adams, Daneeka Varner Cotton, Michael R. Pearson(Hummel, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, March 13, 2025
28 28 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 03/13 8:48 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim First Amended Complaint filed by Carla N. Andrews.(Smith, Shavon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
27 27 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 03/06 8:49 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim First Amended Complaint filed by April T. Ademiluyi.(Shepard, Ray)
Related: [-]
26 26 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 03/06 9:18 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by April T. Ademiluyi. Michael R. Pearson served on 2/9/2025, answer due 3/3/2025.(Dyer, Allen)
Related: [-]
25 25 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 03/06 9:16 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by April T. Ademiluyi. Daneeka Varner Cotton served on 2/9/2025, answer due 3/3/2025.(Dyer, Allen)
Related: [-]
24 24 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 03/06 9:12 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by April T. Ademiluyi. Sheila Tillerson Adams served on 2/9/2025, answer due 3/3/2025.(Dyer, Allen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
23 23 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 02/20 11:46 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim First Amended Complaint by Carla N. Andrews(Smith, Shavon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Affidavit C. Andrews Affidavit,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
22 22 order Scheduling Order Thu 02/20 11:57 AM
Briefing SCHEDULING ORDER re:21 Request. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 2/20/2025. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
21 21 misc Request for Pre-Motion Conference Wed 02/19 6:32 PM
Request for Pre-Motion Conference and/or Approval to File a Motion to Dismiss (Hummel, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/19 6:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Elizabeth Hummel on behalf of Sheila Tillerson Adams, Daneeka Varner Cotton, Michael R. Pearson (Hummel, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
19 19 order Scheduling Order Tue 02/18 2:47 PM
Briefing SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 2/18/2025. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/13 12:50 PM
NOTICE by Carla N. Andrews of Intent to File Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Smith, Shavon)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Tue 02/04 9:49 AM
ORDER granting16 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration; the Court Vacates the Order issued on January 31, 2025, striking the Amended Complaint (ECF No. 15) and Deems the Amended Complaint file as of January 30, 2025. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 2/3/2025. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Reconsideration Mon 02/03 3:19 PM
MOTION for Leave to File MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT by April T. Ademiluyi(Dyer, Allen) Modified on 2/3/2025 (hmls)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order Fri 01/31 3:48 PM
ORDER STRIKING12 Amended Complaint filed by April T. Ademiluyi. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 1/31/2025. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Issued Fri 01/31 11:07 AM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Sheila Tillerson Adams, Daneeka Varner Cotton, Michael R. Pearson. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons
13 13 notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Fri 01/31 11:00 AM
QC NOTICE: [12-2], [12-3], and [12-4] Summons filed by April T. Ademiluyi were filed in error. ** Not all pdf documents were flattened prior to filing. All pdfs uploaded to CM/ECF MUST BE FLATTENED for all future filings. Failure to comply may result in rejected filings and delays in case processing. **This filing has been corrected by court staff and no further corrective action is required. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
12 12 36 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Thu 01/30 11:45 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against April T. Ademiluyi, filed by April T. Ademiluyi.(Dyer, Allen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Errata Redline,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Receipt
Friday, January 24, 2025
11 11 misc Status Report Fri 01/24 5:40 PM
STATUS REPORT ON CONSOLIDATION by April T. Ademiluyi(Dyer, Allen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
10 10 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 01/16 9:50 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support by Carla N Andrews(Smith, Shavon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, January 10, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order Fri 01/10 12:10 PM
ORDER regarding schedule for the briefing of Defendant's motion to dismiss; directing parties to file a joint status report stating their views on consolidation with Civil Action No. 23-cv-3526 on or before 1/24/2025. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 1/10/2025. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/06 4:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shavon J Smith on behalf of Carla N Andrews (Smith, Shavon)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Mon 01/06 3:45 PM
NOTICE by Carla N Andrews of Intent to File a Motion to Dismiss (Smith, Shavon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 12/19 5:46 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by April T. Ademiluyi. Carla N Andrews served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025.(Dyer, Allen)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Case Management Order Thu 12/19 10:31 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 12/19/2024. (mu1s, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 12/16 4:07 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Carla N Andrews.(ar6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Mon 12/16 3:51 PM
QC NOTICE:1 Complaint, filed by April T. Ademiluyi was filed incorrectly. **Not all pdf documents were flattened prior to filing. All pdfs uploaded to CM/ECF MUST BE FLATTENED for all future filings. Failure to comply may result in rejected filings and delays in case processing. **This filing has been corrected by court staff and no further corrective action is required. (ar6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 12/16 11:41 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
2 2 -SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by April T. Ademiluyi re1 Complaint, (Dyer, Allen)
Related: [-]
1 1 26 pgs COMPLAINT against Carla N Andrews ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number BMDDC-11662403.), filed by April T. Ademiluyi.(Dyer, Allen) Modified on 12/16/2024 (kns). (ar6s).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Sealed Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Sealed Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Sealed Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Sealed Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Sealed Exhibit E,
Att: 8 Sealed Exhibit F
Att: 9 (12/16/2024) Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 10 (12/16/2024) Summons