Keogh-Jackson et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-07062 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Dec 06, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 2:24-cv-01554 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 20, 2025 5:03 AM EST |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Amercas Inc
|
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
CB Garment Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256 |
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Innotex Corp
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
L.N. Curtis & Sons
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Milliken & Company
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services, Inc.
1200 South Pine Island Road
Plantation, FL 33324 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
|
|
Defendant
Ricochet Manufacturing Co Inc
|
|
Defendant
Safety Components Fabric Technologies Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc
|
|
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Veridian Limited
|
|
Defendant
WI Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Defendant
Witmer Public Safety Group
|
|
Plaintiff
Moses Alford
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ernest Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frank Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tommy Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Johnston
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Jones
259166 Evans Correctional Institution 610 Highway 9 West
Bennettsville, SC 29512 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tyrone Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven P Jorgensen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tracy Joy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeremy Keogh-Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Kottke
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aaron Kreps
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Lambert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jimmy Lane
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James D Larson, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen Lastimosa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Benjamin Lathrop
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Lavers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Krista Ledbetter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Irvin Lemons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Edward Lesnick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Levan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Levers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Edward Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clifford Littleton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kirk Looney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Lopez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Eugene Lord
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Lovell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Lucas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Miles Lyles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick E Lynch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jon Lynn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandon Mack
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Marcucci
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aaron Marks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gilbert Russell Marling
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Henry Marshall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matt Martin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victor Martin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Mazur
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Santana McAlister-Speight
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William McClain
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael McCormick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John A McDaniel, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William McKnight
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randall McNally
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Mccaffrey, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rhonda Mccurine
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joshua Mendez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vaughn Mercer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mike Rand Merlino
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Mickle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joshua Miller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph J Moncado
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michel Mongiello
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ricky L Moody
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Moore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Moreno
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keats D Morrison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bobbie G Mosley, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Mouton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terry Mullins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Verdun Winston Munroe, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Murchison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Eugene Murphy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Patrick Murray, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Thomas Murray, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
April Michelle Musser
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nathan Myers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffery David Napier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Nelson
247724 Allendale Correctional Institution PO Box 1151
Fairfax, SC 29827 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jonathan E Neuman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristin Miller Nicholas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Nix
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles O'Leary
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James O'Neal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clinton J Odum
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eugene Oglesby
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David A Orr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alfonzo Herman Ortega
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Eugene Oskowski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Paalan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cornelio F Pacis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Palistrant
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Lamont Palyok
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Paredes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hector Paredes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trevor Partridge
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Patrick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth John Paulson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Pedersen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rafael Pena
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ramon Perez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Detra Lashawn Perkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donnie Perry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Theodore Lee Pickering
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jimmy Ray Pilkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Pirotte
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jimmy Plemons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victoria MacDonald Plutchik
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randy Allen Pocowatchit
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mershon Pope
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barbara Porrata
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas A Porter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ricardo Jose Leal Sanchez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Thursday, April 03, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Elwood Worster, William Henry, Darrell Jackson, Kevin Jenkins, Josephine Ryals, Winton Forde, Rhesa Ross Davis, Jr, Lawrence Blackstone, Ronnie Daniels, Jake Jacob Strohman Jr, Jesse R Spillers, KENNETH DUNN, Eric Edwards, Miguel Espinoza, Harry Evans, TIMOTHY FILBECK, DENNIS FLETCHER, CARLOS GOYBURU, DELJUAN GRAHAM, DOUGLAS GRAHAM, JAMES GRIGGS, Ronald Garner, Jr, Hector Gonzalez, DWAYNE HELFER, MARK HETT, James M Kendall, Arthur Jackson, Bradley Jarveis, Frederick Dee, Toney L Threatt, Paul Moreno, Lilton Eugene Duncan Jeffrey A. Martin as to Budden, et al; Larry Wayne New as to Spontak, et al; Douglas E. Stover as to Zdenek, et al; Milton Tyrone Wade as to Zdenek, et al; John Travis McCallum as to Hatfield, et al; Elijah Williams as to Hatfield, et al; Julian Johnson as to Denhardt, et al; Charles H. Nichols as to Denhardt, et al; Miles Ted Lyles as to Collins, et al; RIchard C. Siekiera as to Collins, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, December 16, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 12/16 3:30 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern (associated as of 12/6/2024), 2:24-cv-01554, Keogh-Jackson et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-07062-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:24-cv-01554. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Wednesday, December 04, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Monday, November 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5 TEXT ORDER:Defendant 3M Company has filed a motion seeking an extension of time for all defendants to respond to the complaint.4 . 3M requests that to the extent this action is not transferred to the In re Aqueous Film-Forming Products Liability multi-district litigation (the "AFFF MDL"), the defendants be afforded 28 days after the AFFF MDL court's decision denying a request to transfer within which to file a responsive pleading in this action. The plaintiffs do not oppose the motion. The motion is GRANTED to the extent the court STAYS the deadline for the defendants to respond to the complaint pending a decision by the AFFF MDL court whether to transfer this case to the AFFF MDL. 3M SHALL notify this court promptly if the AFFF MDL court denies its request to transfer this case to the AFFF MDL, at which time this court will set a new deadline for responsive pleadings in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 11/25/2024. (AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 12/16/2024.] | |
Wednesday, November 20, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Thursday, November 14, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 405, receipt_number AALNDC-4722742 (ALND receipt# B-14812). related document1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, AL, case number 01-CV-2024-903944.00., filed by 3M Company.(AKD). (Radney, W) Modified on 11/14/2024 (AKD). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 12/16/2024.] | ||
Wednesday, November 13, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |