Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Paul L Maloney
Referred: Maarten Vermaat
Case #: 1:24-cv-01318
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 30, 2025 3:33 AM EST
defendant
Michelle Greenlee
defendant
Kalamazoo, County of
defendant
Robert Weaver
plaintiff
Nevin P. Cooper-Keel
named as Nevin P. Cooper-Keel, JD 3127 127th Ave.
Allegan, MI 49010


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
18 18 service Proof of Service Mon 04/14 2:58 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Nevin P. Cooper-Keel re Amended Complaint16 , PRO SE APPLICATION for electronic filing and service by plaintiff Nevin P. Cooper-Keel17 (mlc)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Pro Se Application for Electronic Filing and Service Mon 04/14 2:56 PM
PRO SE APPLICATION for electronic filing and service by plaintiff Nevin P. Cooper-Keel (mlc)
Related: [-]
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 04/14 2:55 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with jury trial demand against Michele Greenlee, Kalamazoo, County of, Robert Weaver filed by Nevin P. Cooper-Keel (mlc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 04/08 8:58 AM
ORDER granting STIPULATION14 for Plaintiff to file a second amended complaint within 14 days from the entry of this order, for Defendants to file an answer 30 days after filing of the amended complaint, and adjourning the 4/15/2025 Rule 16 scheduling conference; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam) Modified on 4/8/2025 (cam)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Tue 04/08 9:24 AM
Copy of Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order,15 sent via U.S. Mail to Nevin P. Cooper-Keel (mlc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
14 14 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Mon 04/07 12:40 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint by defendants Robert Weaver, Michele Greenlee, Kalamazoo, County of (Volmering, Corey)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Joint Status Report (Rule 16) Mon 04/07 12:26 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT (Volmering, Corey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
12 12 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 03/11 9:57 AM
CORRECTED ANSWER to Amended Complaint9 with affirmative defenses, reliance on jury demand and Proof of Service by Robert Weaver, Michele Greenlee, Kalamazoo, County of (Volmering, Corey); this entry replaces11 ; Modified text on 3/11/2025 (pjw)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 03/11 9:41 AM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint9 with affirmative defenses and Proof of Service by Robert Weaver, Michele Greenlee, Kalamazoo, County of (Volmering, Corey) Modified text on 3/11/2025 (pjw)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
utility Copies Mailed Fri 02/28 8:46 AM
Copy of Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference10 sent via U.S. Mail to Nevin P. Cooper-Keel (mlc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
10 10 8 pgs order Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Thu 02/27 3:37 PM
ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference for 4/15/2025 at 10:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; status report due by 4/8/2025; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 02/25 12:51 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with jury trial demand against All Defendants filed by Nevin P. Cooper-Keel (mlc)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
8 8 service Proof of Service Fri 02/21 2:05 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Robert Weaver, Michelle Greenlee, Kalamazoo, County of re Attorney Appearance, Attorney Appearance, Attorney Appearance, Answer to Complaint7 (Volmering, Corey)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/21 1:13 PM
ANSWER to complaint1 with affirmative defenses by Robert Weaver, Michelle Greenlee, Kalamazoo, County of (Volmering, Corey) Modified text on 2/21/2025 (mlc)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Fri 02/21 1:07 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Corey Volmering on behalf of defendants Robert Weaver, Michelle Greenlee, Kalamazoo, County of (Volmering, Corey)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Fri 02/21 1:08 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Kristen Lee Rewa on behalf of defendants Robert Weaver, Michelle Greenlee, Kalamazoo, County of Related [+]
Related: [-] wa, Kristen
notice Attorney Appearance Fri 02/21 1:10 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Allan C. Vander Laan on behalf of defendants Robert Weaver, Michelle Greenlee, Kalamazoo, County of (Vander Laan, Allan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 02/04 1:33 PM
SUMMONS returned executed; Michelle Greenlee served on 2/3/2025, answer due 2/24/2025; Kalamazoo, County of served on 2/3/2025, answer due 2/24/2025; Robert Weaver served on 2/3/2025, answer due 2/24/2025 (mlc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
service Summons Issued and Delivered to Marshal Wed 01/29 3:15 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michelle Greenlee, Kalamazoo, County of, Robert Weaver and delivered to US Marshal for service (mlc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 12/18 10:45 AM
ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Wed 12/18 10:02 AM
Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge4 sent via U.S. Mail to Nevin P. Cooper-Keel (mlc)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Wed 12/18 12:24 PM
Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis5 sent via U.S. Mail to Nevin P. Cooper-Keel (mlc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 12/17 4:07 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Receipt of Case Notice Tue 12/17 8:50 AM
NOTICE of receipt of case (mlc)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Tue 12/17 8:51 AM
Copy of Receipt of Case Notice3 sent via U.S. Mail to Nevin P. Cooper-Keel (mlc)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 12/17 8:49 AM
MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Nevin P. Cooper-Keel; (mlc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/17 8:48 AM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Nevin P. Cooper-Keel (mlc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Attachment Proposed Summons