New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Eric R Komitee
Case #: 1:24-cv-08593
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Dec 17, 2024
Terminated:Feb 13, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Feb 01, 2025 4:03 AM EST
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By
Daniel G. Saavedra
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Connie Nolan
Represented By
Daniel G. Saavedra
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Mary Elizabeth Brennan Seng
Represented By
Daniel G. Saavedra
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Texas Service Center, USCIS
Represented By
Daniel G. Saavedra
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
United States Citzenship & Immigration Services (USCIS)
Represented By
Daniel G. Saavedra
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Vermont Service Center, USCIS
Represented By
Daniel G. Saavedra
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Laura B. Zuchowski
Represented By
Daniel G. Saavedra
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Y. H.
Represented By
Aaron Mark Frankel
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, February 13, 2025
order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 02/13 10:49 AM
Pursuant to the parties' Stipulation of Dismissal7 filed on February 11, 2025, the action is dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses, and fees. The civil case is terminated. (APJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
7 7 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 02/11 5:55 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by United States Citzenship & Immigration Services (USCIS), Alejandro Mayorkas, Vermont Service Center, USCIS, Texas Service Center, USCIS, Connie Nolan, Laura B. Zuchowski, Mary Elizabeth Brennan Seng (Saavedra, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
order Order to Show Cause Electronic Service upon the US Attorneys Office Mon 01/13 4:53 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Upon the complaint for writ of mandamus filed December 17, 2024, it is ORDERED that: The United States Attorney, as attorney for Defendants/Respondents, is directed to show cause on or before March 6, 2025 in writing, why a writ of mandamus should not issue, and shall serve a copy of the response on Plaintiff, with proof of service to the Clerk of Court; On or before June 6, 2025, Plaintiff shall file the reply, if any, with proof of service to the Clerk of Court. Service of a copy of this Order, together with a copy of the complaint, shall be made by the Clerk of Court via electronic case filing, to the United States Attorney and by mailing a copy of this Order to the plaintiff. Electronic Service upon the US Attorneys Office. Ordered by Judge Eric R. Komitee on 1/13/2025. (APJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 01/07 5:54 PM
ORDER: The plaintiff moves4 to proceed anonymously, asserting that if she proceeds under her real name, then her family members will face threats to their physical safety. But she points to no specific facts suggesting that such threats are likely. Accordingly, the motion is denied without prejudice. See S.D. v. Decker, No. 22-CV-3063, 2022 WL 1239589, at *2 (S.D.N.Y. Apr. 27, 2022). Ordered by Judge Eric R. Komitee on 1/7/2025. (CAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Thu 12/26 5:22 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Y. H.. Alejandro Mayorkas served on 12/18/2024, answer due 2/17/2025; Connie Nolan served on 12/18/2024, answer due 2/17/2025; Mary Elizabeth Brennan Seng served on 12/18/2024, answer due 2/17/2025; Texas Service Center, USCIS served on 12/18/2024, answer due 2/17/2025; United States Citzenship & Immigration Services (USCIS) served on 12/18/2024, answer due 2/17/2025; Vermont Service Center, USCIS served on 12/18/2024, answer due 2/17/2025; Laura B. Zuchowski served on 12/18/2024, answer due 2/17/2025. (Frankel, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/23 2:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel G. Saavedra on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Saavedra, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
4 4 motion Leave to File Document Tue 12/17 1:57 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Document / Motion to Proceed Anonymously by Y. H.. (Frankel, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
3 3 service Summons Issued as to USA Tue 12/17 11:17 AM
Summons Issued as to Alejandro Mayorkas, Connie Nolan, Mary Elizabeth Brennan Seng, Texas Service Center, USCIS, United States Citzenship & Immigration Services (USCIS), Vermont Service Center, USCIS, Laura B. Zuchowski, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (KD)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Tue 12/17 11:14 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/17 10:59 AM
COMPLAINT against Alejandro Mayorkas, Connie Nolan, Mary Elizabeth Brennan Seng, Texas Service Center, USCIS, United States Citzenship & Immigration Services (USCIS), Vermont Service Center, USCIS, Laura B. Zuchowski filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18588609 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Y. H.. (Frankel, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 12/17 11:13 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
Related: [-]