Arizona District Court
Judge:John J Tuchi
Case #: 2:24-cv-03557
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2024
Terminated:Apr 15, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Jan 30, 2025 2:59 AM MST
Defendant
Desert Valley Media Group LLC
Plaintiff
Watson Music Group LLC
Represented By
Jacqueline A Mandel
Sanders Law Group - Uniondale
contact info


Docket last updated: 46 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
27 27 misc Remark (Patent Trademark Copyright) Wed 04/16 8:11 AM
Copy of AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright emailed to Copyright Office on this date.(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Copy of Order at Doc. 26
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
26 26 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 04/15 9:29 AM
ORDER: Upon review of the Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal25 , and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the above-entitled matter is hereby dismissed with prejudice, the parties to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk to close this matter. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 4/15/2025. (KLG)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Entire Case/Action Tue 04/15 6:41 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Watson Music Group LLC. (Mandel, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
24 24 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 03/24 10:06 AM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter will be dismissed with prejudice 30 days after the docketing of this Order unless the parties file a stipulation to dismiss prior to that date. The settlement constitutes an accord that has extinguished the underlying claim. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all deadlines are deemed moot. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 3/24/2025. (JAMA)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
23 23 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 03/21 2:18 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Desert Valley Media Group LLC. (Armstrong, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 02/19 3:13 PM
ORDER granting the Stipulation to Set Aside Entry of Default21 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED setting aside the Clerk's Entry of Default14 filed on January 24, 2025. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Desert Valley Media Group LLC shall have thirty days following the entry of this Order to file its answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint1 . Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 2/19/2025. (KLG)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Stipulation Wed 02/19 11:20 AM
STIPULATION to Set Aside Entry of Default by Desert Valley Media Group LLC.(Armstrong, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 13, 2025
20 20 2 pgs order Order Thu 02/13 10:22 AM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 2/13/2025. (JAMA)
Related: [-]
minute_ord Minute Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges Thu 02/13 8:52 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge John J Tuchi. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV 24-3557 PHX-JJT. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
17 17 misc Objection Wed 02/12 4:52 PM
OBJECTION to Being Assigned to a Magistrate Judge by Defendant Desert Valley Media Group LLC. (Hiller, Evan)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Disclosure Statement Wed 02/12 4:46 PM
Disclosure Statement by Desert Valley Media Group LLC. (Hiller, Evan)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel Wed 02/12 4:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Evan Franklin Hiller on behalf of Desert Valley Media Group LLC. (Hiller, Evan)
Related: [-]
misc 25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge Thu 02/13 8:51 AM
Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
14 14 order Clerks Entry of Default Fri 01/24 11:14 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Desert Valley Media Group LLC. (KLG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
13 13 misc Application for Entry of Default Thu 01/23 12:35 PM
APPLICATION for Entry of Default against Desert Valley Media Group LLC by Plaintiff Watson Music Group LLC.(Mandel, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Declaration of Jacqueline Mandel in Support of Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default against Defendant,
Att: 2 Supplement Certificate of Service
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
minute_ord Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings Tue 01/07 9:56 AM
MINUTE ORDER: That the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for January 28, 2025 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
9 9 misc 25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause (LRCiv 3.7(b)) Mon 01/06 10:19 AM
ORDER that Watson Music Group LLC show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Judge John J Tuchi. Show Cause Hearing set for 1/28/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi.(MAP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Instructions,
Att: 2 Consent Form
misc 25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Tue 01/07 9:55 AM
Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
8 8 service Service Executed Fri 01/03 11:31 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Watson Music Group LLC: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint and Supporting Documents upon Desert Valley Media Group LLC by personally serving Dementria Tsosie of CT Corporation who holds the position of Agent on December 31, 2024. (Mandel, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
7 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:1 Complaint filed by Watson Music Group LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required . This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 12/17 10:49 AM
Summons Issued as to Desert Valley Media Group LLC. (REK)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Tue 12/17 10:50 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:1 Complaint filed by Watson Music Group LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required . This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
5 5 misc New Case Opened Tue 12/17 10:48 AM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-23777227. This case has been assigned to the Honorable James F Metcalf. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 24-03557 PHX-JFM. Magistrate Election form attached.(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
4 4 service Summons Submitted Tue 12/17 10:47 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by Watson Music Group LLC. (submitted by Jacqueline Mandel) (REK)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information Tue 12/17 10:46 AM
NOTICE of Filing - AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright filed by Watson Music Group LLC. (submitted by Jacqueline Mandel) (REK)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement Tue 12/17 10:45 AM
Disclosure Statement by Watson Music Group LLC. (submitted by Jacqueline Mandel) (REK)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 12/17 10:44 AM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-23777227 filed by Watson Music Group LLC. (submitted by Jacqueline Mandel)(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet