Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Sidney A Fitzwater
Case #: 3:24-cv-03160
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Case Filed:Dec 17, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 01, 2025 4:39 AM CST
Defendant
Kevin Ross Burgess
Defendant
Rebecca Kay Burgess
Defendant
Rodney Michael Burgess
Defendant
Tiffany Renee Evinger
Defendant
The Estate of Roger Burgess
Plaintiff
Lockheed Martin Corporation Salaried Employee Retirement Program
Represented By
Roshanak Khosravighasemabadi
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Lockheed Martin Corporation
Represented By
Roshanak Khosravighasemabadi
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Lockheed Martin Retirement Plan for Certain Hourly Employees
Represented By
Roshanak Khosravighasemabadi
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
12 12 2 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 05/14 3:56 PM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS'11 SECOND MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO SERVE PROCESS: Plaintiffs shall have until and including 7/15/2025, to effectuate service of process on to The Estate of Roger Buress. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/14/2025) (twd)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extension of Time Wed 05/14 11:27 AM
Second MOTION to Extend Time of Time to Serve Process filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation, Lockheed Martin Corporation Salaried Employee Retirement Program, Lockheed Martin Retirement Plan for Certain Hourly Employees (Khosravighasemabadi, Roshanak)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 02/25 3:09 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion to Extend Time to Serve Process: Plaintiffs shall have until and including 5/16/2025 to effect service of process on to The Estate of Roger Buress. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 2/25/2025) (ykp)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time Tue 02/25 10:47 AM
MOTION to Extend Time to Serve Process filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation, Lockheed Martin Corporation Salaried Employee Retirement Program, Lockheed Martin Retirement Plan for Certain Hourly Employees (Khosravighasemabadi, Roshanak)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, January 13, 2025
8 8 service Summons Returned Mon 01/13 3:45 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Rebecca Kay Burgess ; served on 1/8/2025. (Khosravighasemabadi, Roshanak)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Mon 01/13 3:44 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Rodney Michael Burgess ; served on 1/8/2025. (Khosravighasemabadi, Roshanak)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Mon 01/13 3:43 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Kevin Ross Burgess ; served on 1/8/2025. (Khosravighasemabadi, Roshanak)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
5 5 service Summons Returned Fri 01/10 10:35 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Tiffany Renee Evinger; served on 1/7/2025. (Khosravighasemabadi, Roshanak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 12/17 4:15 PM
Summons Issued as to Kevin Ross Burgess, Rebecca Kay Burgess, Rodney Michael Burgess, Tiffany Renee Evinger, The Estate of Roger Burgess. (agc)
Related: [-]
3 3 qcref Fitzwater Tue 12/17 4:12 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge McKay). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (agc)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Tue 12/17 11:27 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lockheed Martin Corporation Salaried Employee Retirement Program. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Khosravighasemabadi, Roshanak)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 12/17 11:23 AM
COMPLAINT against Kevin Ross Burgess, Rebecca Kay Burgess, Rodney Michael Burgess, Tiffany Renee Evinger, The Estate of Roger Burgess filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation Salaried Employee Retirement Program. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-15133105) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Khosravighasemabadi, Roshanak) (Attachment 1 replaced to flatten PDF on 12/17/2024) (agc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) A - 10-31-94 Divorce Decree,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) B - Hourly Plan,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) C - Salaried Plan,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) D - March 2019 QDRO,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) E - Death Certificate,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) F8 22-2024 letter