Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:23-bk-00998

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joseph N Callaway
Case #: 5:24-ap-00140
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2024
Terminated:Apr 11, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Deep River Renewables, Inc.
362 Hanner Town Road
Bear Creek, NC 27207
Represented By
Deep River Renewables, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Bircher III, Trustee
Davis Hartman Wright, PLLC 209 Pollock Street
New Bern, NC 28560
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Buckmiller & Frost, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, April 11, 2025
court Close Adversary Case Fri 04/11 3:56 PM
Adversary Case 5:24-ap-140 Closed (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
court Returned Mail (Text) Fri 03/28 4:26 PM
Notification of Returned Mail by BNC addressed to Defendant Deep River Renewables, Inc. Related [+] (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] ument no.10 Entry of Default
Thursday, March 27, 2025
16 16 order Default Judgment Thu 03/27 2:24 PM
Order Granting Motion. Default Judgment as to Deep River Renewables, Inc. Related [+] (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] 12
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
15 15 16 pgs misc Memorandum of Law Wed 03/26 8:04 AM
Amended/Amendment to Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Default Judgment filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 13 Memorandum of Law
utility Terminate Deadline (Public) Wed 03/26 8:48 AM
Deadline(s) Terminated. Revised Order Received. Related [+] (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] ument no. 14 Deficiency Notice - Attorney (BK)
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
14 14 court Deficiency Notice - Attorney (BK) Tue 03/25 11:02 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Joseph Frost. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: The order uploaded is incorrect, illegible or improperly formatted (The order contains errors - Sentence # 9 references different dates then what was stated in the memorandum, Sentence # 10 references incorrect docket entry numbers, and sentence # 14 references incorrect total amount) and (Sentence # 1 in decretal paragraph references incorrect dates). Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief, or in the matter being forwarded to the judge for appropriate action. Related [+] Due by 4/4/2025. (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] ument no.12 Motion for Default Judgment as to Deep River Renewables, Inc. filed by John C. Bircher III, Trustee
Monday, March 24, 2025
13 13 16 pgs misc Memorandum of Law Mon 03/24 2:29 PM
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Default Judgment filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 12 Motion for Default Judgment as to Deep River Renewables, Inc.
12 12 motion Default Judgment Mon 03/24 2:27 PM
Motion for Default Judgment as to Deep River Renewables, Inc. filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Entry of Default (Deep River Renewables, Inc.)
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of John C. Bircher, III
Att: 3 Proposed Default Judgment
Saturday, March 22, 2025
11 11 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Sun 03/23 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 03/22/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10
Thursday, March 20, 2025
10 10 court Entry of Default Thu 03/20 12:04 PM
Entry of Default Related [+] (Wright, Dawn)
Related: [-] 9 Amended/Amendment to Motion/Application filed by Plaintiff John C. Bircher III, Trustee
Thursday, March 13, 2025
9 9 motion Amended/Amendment to Motion/Application Thu 03/13 5:35 PM
Amended/Amendment to Motion/Application filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] ument no.8 Motion for Entry of Default
Monday, February 24, 2025
utility Terminate Deadline (Public) Mon 02/24 9:35 AM
Deadline(s) Terminated. Summons Service Executed Was Filed. Related [+] (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] ument no. 5 Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP)
Friday, February 21, 2025
8 8 motion Entry of Default Fri 02/21 11:15 AM
Motion for Entry of Default as to Deep River Renewables, Inc. filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Affidavit Fri 02/21 11:03 AM
Affidavit of Service (Complaint and Summons in an Adversary Proceeding) filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,3 Summons Reissued
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
6 6 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Thu 02/13 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 02/12/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4
Monday, February 10, 2025
5 5 court Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP) Mon 02/10 3:58 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Joseph Frost. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: A certificate of service indicating service of the summons and complaint has not been filed. If service was not obtained on the defendant(s) within seven (7) days of issuance of the summons, a new summons will need to be issued. In that event, a new summons should be submitted to the court for reissuance. If service was obtained on the defendant(s), a certificate of service should immediately be filed with the court. Failure to either submit a new summons for reissuance or file a certificate of service of the summons previously issued may result in the matter being scheduled for dismissal pursuant to Local Rule 7055-1. Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief. Related [+] Due by 2/20/2025. (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] ument no.3 Summons Reissued on Deep River Renewables, Inc. Date Issued 1/8/2025, Answer Due 2/7/2025
4 4 order Directing Plaintiff to Proceed Mon 02/10 3:55 PM
Order Directing Plaintiff to Proceed After Failure to Answer Due by 3/4/2025. (Gibson, Aileen) **Corrective Entry: Entered in error. Please disregard.** Modified on 2/11/2025 (Shum-Drake, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
3 3 court Summons Reissued Wed 01/08 8:43 AM
Summons Reissued on Deep River Renewables, Inc. Date Issued 1/8/2025, Answer Due 2/7/2025 (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 12/17 11:10 AM
Summons Issued on Deep River Renewables, Inc. Answer Due 1/16/2025. (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 12/16 1:55 PM
Adversary case 24-00140 5. Complaint by John C. Bircher, III, Chapter 7 Trustee for Covenant Solar Tech, LLC against Deep River Renewables, Inc. (Fee Deferred) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - List of Transfers