Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-25026

Wisconsin Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Katherine M Perhach
Case #: 2:24-ap-02170
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2024
Terminated:Mar 07, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ta-Tanisha M McAllister
3416 N. 79th St.
Milwaukee, WI 53222
Represented By
Shane S Cigel
Shane Scott Cigel Law LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Wisconsin, Department of Workforce Development
201 E. Washington Ave. P.O. Box 8942
Madison, WI 53708
Represented By
Christine L. Galinat
Wisconsin Department Of Workforce Development
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Friday, March 07, 2025
13 13 court Close Adversary Case Fri 03/07 11:25 AM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-2170 Closed (amg, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
12 12 utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 03/07 11:23 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-2170 Judgment For Plaintiff (amg, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 22, 2025
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 02/22 11:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 02/22/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 02/22 11:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 02/22/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Judgment
Thursday, February 20, 2025
9 9 court Judgment Thu 02/20 3:13 PM
Entry of Judgment. (amg, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Default Judgment Thu 02/20 3:07 PM
Order for Judgment Related [+] (amg, Deputy Clerk) (Signed: 02/20/2025)
Related: [-] 5
7 7 misc Proposed Order Thu 02/20 11:41 AM
Proposed Order RE:5 - Motion for Default Judgment filed by Attorney Christine L. Galinat of Wisconsin Department of Workforce Development on behalf of State of Wisconsin, Department of Workforce Development. Any required notice period has run without objection. (Galinat, Christine)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Affidavit Thu 02/20 11:39 AM
Certification of No Objection/Response/Answer and Certificate of Service Filed by State of Wisconsin, Department of Workforce Development Related [+] (Galinat, Christine)
Related: [-] 5 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff State of Wisconsin, Department of Workforce Development
Thursday, January 23, 2025
5 5 motion Default Judgment Thu 01/23 9:14 AM
Motion for Default Judgment and Affidavit in Support of Motion with Notice of Motion and Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff State of Wisconsin, Department of Workforce Development Objections due by 2/18/2025. (Galinat, Christine)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 12/20 2:47 PM
Summons Service Executed on Atty. Shane S. Cigel and Ta-Tanisha M McAllister 12/20/2024 (Galinat, Christine)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Electronic Summons Issued Fri 12/20 9:26 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7004 and file a certificate of service with the Court. Answer due by 1/21/2025. United States and its officers and agencies answer due by 1/24/2025. (ecb, Law Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 12/16 5:56 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 24-02170 kmp] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A23227231. Fee amount 350.00 Related [+] . (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 12/16 5:46 PM
Adversary case 24-02170 Complaint by State of Wisconsin, Department of Workforce Development (attorney Christine L. Galinat) against Ta-Tanisha M McAllister. Fee Amount $350 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud))(Galinat, Christine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-B