Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Anne C Conway
Referred: Embry J Kidd
Case #: 6:24-cv-02298
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Dec 17, 2024
Terminated:Apr 28, 2025
Case in other court:Ninth Judicial Circuit Court, 2024-CA-005113-O
Last checked: Saturday Feb 01, 2025 5:22 AM EST
Defendant
Hilton Grand Vacations, Inc.
Represented By
Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Greenspoon Marder, Pa - Corporate
contact info
Richard W. Epstein
Greenspoon Marder, Pa - Corporate
contact info
Plaintiff
Heather Holzworth
Represented By
Marilyn Joy Hochman
The Abrams Law Firm
contact info
Stephanie Parsons
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
29 29 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 04/29 8:42 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RPB)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
28 28 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 04/28 11:23 AM
ORDER dismissing case. Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of prosecution and for failure to comply with the Court's order pursuant to Local Rule 3.10 ("A plaintiff's failure to prosecute diligently can result in dismissal if the plaintiff in response to an order to show cause fails to demonstrate due diligence and just cause for delay."). The Clerk is DIRECTED to close the case. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 4/28/2025. (KLD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
27 27 2 pgs order Order to show cause Thu 04/10 4:19 PM
ORDER to show cause as to Heather Holzworth. Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause within 14 days why the case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution and failure to comply with the Court's order pursuant to Local Rule 3.10. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 4/10/2025. (KLD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
26 26 4 pgs order Order to Strike Thu 03/20 1:06 PM
ORDER to Strike re: 23 Amended Complaint filed by Heather Holzworth. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is untimely and therefore STRICKEN. Plaintiff may move for an extension of time to seek leave to amend upon showing "excusable neglect" for failing to timely file the Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file any Motion for Extension of Time seeking Leave to Amend consistent with the requirements of this Order within 14 days of the date of this Order. Prior to filing a Second Amended Complaint, Plaintiff's Counsel, Stephanie Parsons, Esq., must certify the following to the Court: (1) Plaintiff's Counsel has read the Court's previous Order 20 ; and (2) Plaintiff's Counsel has reviewed Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11 and understands her duty to conduct an adequate pre-suit inquiry under the Rule. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 3/20/2025. (KLD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
25 25 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 03/18 11:25 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting doc. 24 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Enlargement of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint. Defendant must respond to the amended complaint, doc. 23 , by March 27, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 3/18/2025. (SS)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
24 24 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Fri 03/14 6:48 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re23 Amended Complaint or otherwise respond to Amended Complaint by Hilton Grand Vacations, Inc.. (Backman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
23 23 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 03/06 4:34 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Heather Holzworth with Jury Demand. filed by Heather Holzworth.(Parsons, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
22 22 utility Case Referred to Mediation Thu 02/27 3:53 PM
CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Lead Counsel is directed to contact opposing counsel, select a mediator off the court's approved list of mediators on the website, contact selected mediator and file a notice with the court within 14 days from the date of this order advising the court of the selected mediator and mediation date. Mediation to be conducted in person or the parties shall file a motion seeking permission to conduct the mediation by Zoom. Any such motion shall include a statement that the Mediator consents to mediation by Zoom. (KLD)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Case Management Scheduling Order Thu 02/27 3:45 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Mandatory Initial Disclosures due by 3/21/2025. Amended Pleadings due by 4/19/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 4/19/2025. Discovery due by 11/3/2025. Dispositive motions due by 11/17/2025. Pretrial statement due by 3/20/2026. All other motions due by 12/12/2025. Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 9/5/2025. Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 10/1/2025. Jury Trial set for trial term commencing on 5/2/2026 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 6 A before Judge Anne C. Conway. Conduct mediation hearing by 12/17/2025. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 2/27/2025. (KLD) Modified on 2/27/2025, edit courtrooom (KLD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
20 20 7 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 02/20 9:07 AM
ORDER Granting 13 Defendant Hilton Grand Vacations, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff Heather Holzworth's claims against Defendant Hilton Grand Vacations, Inc. are DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file any amended complaint consistent with the requirements of this Order, and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11, within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 2/19/2025. (KLD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
19 19 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Wed 02/19 3:15 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Heather Holzworth. (Parsons, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Response to order to show cause Wed 02/19 12:27 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re15 Order to show cause filed by Hilton Grand Vacations, Inc.. (Backman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Case Management Report Wed 02/19 12:05 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Parsons, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Response to order to show cause Wed 02/19 12:04 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Heather Holzworth.(Parsons, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
15 15 2 pgs order Order to show cause Wed 02/12 9:13 AM
ORDER to Show Cause as to Heather Holzworth, Hilton Grand Vacations, Inc. The parties shall SHOW CAUSE by written response on or before February 22, 2025, as to why this case should not be dismissed for failure to file a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 2/11/2025. (KLD)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
14 14 respm Response to motion Fri 01/31 1:31 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Heather Holzworth. (Parsons, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
13 13 motion Dismiss Fri 01/10 3:30 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Hilton Grand Vacations, Inc..(Backman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Purchase Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit Composite Exhibit 2- Acknowledgements
Thursday, January 02, 2025
12 12 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 01/02 2:39 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 6:24-cv-2298-ACC-UAM. Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd no longer assigned to the case. (RPB)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 12/30 10:24 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Hilton Grand Vacations, Inc., may have until and through January 10, 2025, to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 12/30/2024. (Kidd, Embry)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Fri 12/27 4:56 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Hilton Grand Vacations, Inc.. (Backman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order Thu 12/19 7:52 AM
ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 12/19/2024. (JOR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
8 8 order Interested Persons Order Wed 12/18 12:20 PM
INITIAL CASE ORDER - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Parties have 14 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 12/18/2024. (KLD)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of a Related Action Wed 12/18 11:20 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Heather Holzworth. Related case(s): No (Parsons, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 12/18 11:18 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Heather Holzworth. (Parsons, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 12/18 11:17 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Stephanie Parsons on behalf of Heather Holzworth. Lead Counsel: Stephanie Parsons, Esq.. (Parsons, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 12/18 10:22 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:24-cv-2298-ACC-EJK. (RLK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Tue 12/17 4:06 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Hilton Grand Vacations, Inc.. (Backman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 12/17 4:03 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jeffrey Aaron Backman on behalf of Hilton Grand Vacations, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Jeffrey A. Backman. (Backman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 12/17 3:55 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ninth Judicial Circuit Orange County Florida, case number 2024-CA-005113-O filed in State Court on 06/07/2024. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-22830859 filed by Hilton Grand Vacations, Inc..(Backman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT State Court Complaint,
Att: 2 Affidavit Declaration of Brad Harris,
Att: 3 State Court Other Documents Other State Court Documents,
Att: 4 Affidavit Declaration of Phillip Silvestri,
Att: 5 Affidavit Declaration of Jeffrey Backman,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet