Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Michael H Watson
Referred: Kimberly A Jolson
Case #: 2:24-cv-04276
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Cause09:1 U.S. Arbitration Act
Case Filed:Dec 17, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 01, 2025 5:55 AM EST
Defendant
The New York Blower Company
Represented By
Phillip Thomas Kelly
Gallagher Sharp LLP
contact info
Joseph Monroe, II
Gallagher Sharp LLP
contact info
Richard C O Rezie
Bulkley Building
contact info
Plaintiff
AMG Vanadium LLC
Represented By
Maxwell Hewitt King
Vorys, Sater, Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info
Christopher A. LaRocco
contact info
Rick W Grady
Vorys Sater Seymour & Pease LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
20 20 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 05/08 2:36 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re18 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff AMG Vanadium LLC. (King, Maxwell)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
19 19 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 04/25 2:55 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re18 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant The New York Blower Company. (Monroe, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
18 18 motion Partial Summary Judgment Fri 04/04 2:22 PM
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff AMG Vanadium LLC. (King, Maxwell)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
17 17 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 02/14 4:13 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re15 MOTION to Alter Judgment Modify or Correct Arbitration Award filed by Defendant The New York Blower Company. (Monroe, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 01/31 3:38 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION to Alter Judgment Modify or Correct Arbitration Award AND REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD filed by Plaintiff AMG Vanadium LLC. (King, Maxwell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Friday, January 17, 2025
15 15 motion Alter Judgment Fri 01/17 5:15 PM
MOTION to Alter Judgment Modify or Correct Arbitration Award by Defendant The New York Blower Company. (Monroe, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Contract,
Att: 2 12 pgs Exhibit B - Arbitration Award,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Fitzgerald Report
14 14 misc Response (non motion) Fri 01/17 5:05 PM
Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award and Request to Stay by Defendant The New York Blower Company. (Monroe, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 12/20 1:31 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award. Response due by 1/17/25. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/20/24. (jr)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 12/20 9:33 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant The New York Blower Company. The New York Blower Company served on 12/19/2024, answer due 1/9/2025. (King, Maxwell)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 12/19 4:52 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File New date requested 1/17/2025. to Respond to Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award and/or to Set Briefing Schedule by Defendant The New York Blower Company. Related [+]
Related: [-] zie, Richard
10 10 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement - 7.1(a)(2) Thu 12/19 4:44 PM
Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement by Defendant The New York Blower Company. (Monroe, Joseph)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 12/19 4:43 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant The New York Blower Company. (Monroe, Joseph)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/19 4:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard C O Rezie for Defendant The New York Blower Company Related [+]
Related: [-] zie, Richard
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Wed 12/18 9:33 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff AMG Vanadium LLC re1 Complaint CIVIL COVER SHEET (King, Maxwell)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Deficiency (Clerk's Notice) Wed 12/18 9:01 AM
Notice of Deficiency re: Civil Cover Sheet missing. Related Document:1 Complaint filed by AMG Vanadium LLC. Deficiency Deadline by 1/17/2025. (mas)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 12/18 8:59 AM
Summons Issued as to The New York Blower Company. (mas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
4 4 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement - 7.1(a)(2) Tue 12/17 4:09 PM
Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff AMG VANADIUM. (King, Maxwell)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 12/17 4:06 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs AMG VANADIUM, METTALURG INC, AMG CRITICIAL MATERIALS NV identifying Corporate Parent METTALURG INC, Corporate Parent AMG CRITICIAL MATERIALS NV for AMG VANADIUM.. (King, Maxwell)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 12/17 4:03 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (King, Maxwell)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 12/17 4:01 PM
COMPLAINT FOR CONFIRMATION OF ARBITRATION AWARD against THE NEW YORK BLOWER COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10296250), filed by AMG VANADIUM. (King, Maxwell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 12 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2