Consolidated
Lead case: 4:24-md-03132

Iowa Southern District Court
Judge:Stephen H Locher
Referred: William P Kelly
Case #: 4:24-cv-00446
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:145 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Dec 17, 2024
Case in other court:Missouri Eastern, 4:24-cv-00980
Last checked: Saturday Feb 01, 2025 2:47 AM CST
Defendant
Ameren Corp.
Represented By
Kathleen Markowski Petrillo
Lewis Rice LLC
contact info
Richard Bennett Walsh, Jr.
Lewis Rice LLC
contact info
Richard B. Walsh, Jr.
Lewis Rice Llc - St. Louis
contact info
Michael J. Hartley
Lewis Rice LLC
contact info
Robert M Evans, Jr.
Lewis Rice LLC
contact info
Robert M. Evans, Jr.
Lewis Rice Llc - St. Louis
contact info
Defendant
Union Electric Co.
Represented By
Richard Bennett Walsh, Jr.
Lewis Rice LLC
contact info
Richard B. Walsh, Jr.
Lewis Rice Llc - St. Louis
contact info
Robert M Evans, Jr.
Lewis Rice LLC
contact info
Robert M. Evans, Jr.
Lewis Rice Llc - St. Louis
contact info
Plaintiff
Midwest Energy Emissions Corp.
Represented By
Bradley Wayne Caldwell
Caldwell Cassady Curry, PC
contact info
Richard A. Cochrane
Caldwell Cassady Curry, PC
contact info
Austin Curry
Caldwell Cassady Curry, PC
contact info
Jeremiah W. Nixon
The Simon Law Firm PC
contact info
Justin Thomas Nemunaitis
Caldwell Cassady Curry, PC
contact info
Anthony G. Simon
The Simon Law Firm PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
44 44 notice Notice - Other Tue 12/17 4:00 PM
NOTICE That 4-24-cv-446-SHL-WPK (formerly Eastern District of Missouri 4:24-cv-980) is now consolidated with and part of MDL No. 3132. Therefore, future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 4-24-md-3132-SHL-WPK. (kjw)
Related: [-]
43 43 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Tue 12/17 3:04 PM
Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:24-cv-00980. Original file
Related: [-]
42 42 4 pgs order Order Tue 12/17 2:11 PM
ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Southern District of Iowa. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell, Chair of the Panel on 12/12/24 [Certified copy received 12/17/2024].(JWD)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 12/17 3:50 PM
Judge Stephen H. Locher and Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly added. (kjw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
41 41 TRANSFER ORDER regarding MDL 3132 by Chair of the Panel. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 12/12/24. (JWD)
Related: [-]
40 40 NOTICE by Plaintiff Midwest Energy Emissions Corp. Notice of MDL Transfer Order(Nemunaitis, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
39 39 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Anthony G. Simon. (Simon, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
38 38 Docket Text ORDER: Re:36 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Decision on Motion to Transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Defendants Ameren Corp., Union Electric Co. (Walsh, Richard) filed by Union Electric Co., Ameren Corp. ORDERED GRANTED all discovery is STAYED pending decision on transfer to the JPML. Signed by Sr. District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 11/6/2024. (KEK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
37 37 6 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re36 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Decision on Motion to Transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Defendants Ameren Corp., Union Electric Co..(Walsh, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
36 36 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Decision on Motion to Transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Defendants Ameren Corp., Union Electric Co.. (Walsh, Richard)
Related: [-]
35 35 NOTICE OF CORPORATE NAME CHANGE: by Plaintiff Midwest Energy Emissions Corp.(Nemunaitis, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
34 34 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference pursuant toFed.R.Civ.P. 16, set for Thursday, October 24, 2024 is vacated because of thepending motion before the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation and will be reset if necessary. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff must notify this Court within seven (7) days of any ruling by the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation. Signed by Sr. District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 10/22/2024. (KEK)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
33 33 ENTRY of Appearance by Austin Curry for Plaintiff Midwest Energy Emissions Corp.. (Curry, Austin)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
32 32 NOTICE by Plaintiff Midwest Energy Emissions Corp. REGARDING MDL(Nemunaitis, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, October 17, 2024
31 31 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Midwest Energy Emissions Corp.. . (Nemunaitis, Justin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
30 30 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 3. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 10/17/2024. Rule 16 Conference set for 10/24/2024 02:30 PM in Zoom Audio Conference before Sr. District Judge Catherine D. Perry. Signed by Sr. District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 9/25/2024. (KXS)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
29 29 29 pgs ANSWER to1 Complaint,, by Ameren Corp., Union Electric Co..(Walsh, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
28 28 Docket Text ORDER: Re:27 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Ameren Corp., Union Electric Co.. (Walsh, Richard); ORDERED GRANTED. (Ameren Corp. and Union Electric Co. answer due 9/23/2024.) Signed by Sr. District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 09/05/2024. (KRZ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
27 27 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Ameren Corp., Union Electric Co.. (Walsh, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
26 26 Docket Text ORDER: Re:22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Ameren Corp., Union Electric Co. (Walsh, Richard) filed by Union Electric Co., Ameren Corp.; ORDERED GRANTED Ameren Corp. answer due 9/5/2024. Signed by Sr. District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 8/16/2024. (KEK)
Related: [-]
25 25 AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ameren Corp., Fuelco LLC, STARS Alliance, LLC, The Vanguard Group, BlackRock, Inc., T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc., T. Rowe Price Investment Management, Inc., State Street Corporation.(Walsh, Richard) Modified on 8/19/2024 (CBL).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
24 24 AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Union Electric Co., Ameren Corporation, Ameren Missouri, STARS Alliance, LLC.. (Walsh, Richard)
Related: [-]
23 23 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re21 Disclosure Statement,20 Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Ameren Corp., Union Electric Co.. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Party filed the Disclosure Statement but failed to enter the individuals/entities into CM/ECF as required. An amended Disclosure Statement must be filed and these individuals/entities must be added into CM/ECF where prompted. (CBL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
22 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Ameren Corp., Union Electric Co.. (Walsh, Richard)
Related: [-]
21 21 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Union Electric Co., Ameren Corporation.. (Walsh, Richard)
Related: [-]
20 20 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ameren Corp.. No corporate parents or affiliates identified.(Walsh, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
19 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Kathleen Markowski Petrillo for Defendants Ameren Corp., Union Electric Co.. (Petrillo, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
18 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael J. Hartley for Defendants Ameren Corp., Union Electric Co.. (Hartley, Michael)
Related: [-]
17 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert M. Evans, Jr for Defendants Ameren Corp., Union Electric Co.. (Evans, Robert)
Related: [-]
16 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Richard B. Walsh, Jr for Defendants Ameren Corp., Union Electric Co.. (Walsh, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
15 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Midwest Energy Emissions Corp.. Union Electric Co. served on 7/25/2024, answer due 8/15/2024. (Caldwell, Bradley) Modified on 8/6/2024 (NEP).
Related: [-]
14 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Midwest Energy Emissions Corp.. Ameren Corp. served on 7/25/2024, answer due 8/15/2024. (Caldwell, Bradley) Modified on 8/6/2024 (NEP).
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
13 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeremiah W. Nixon for Plaintiff Midwest Energy Emissions Corp.. (Nixon, Jeremiah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
12 12 Docket Text ORDER: Re:11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Richard A. Cochrane AND10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Justin T. Nemunaitis; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Sr. District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 7/23/2024. (KEK)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
11 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Richard A. Cochrane. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-10725194) by Plaintiff Midwest Energy Emissions Corp..(Cochrane, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
10 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Justin T. Nemunaitis. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-10725189) by Plaintiff Midwest Energy Emissions Corp..(Nemunaitis, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
Friday, July 19, 2024
9 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Bradley W. Caldwell for Plaintiff Midwest Energy Emissions Corp.. (Caldwell, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
8 8 AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Midwest Energy Emissions Corp.. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Simon, Anthony)
Related: [-]
7 7 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding patent. (JWD)
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re3 Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Midwest Energy Emissions Corp.. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Party filed the Disclosure Statement in this action, but did not submit on the Court adopted form, MOED-0001, which is available on our website at www.moed.uscourts.gov. Local Rule 2.09 was updated in March 2023. The adopted form reflects the changes made and correct information required. An amended Disclosure Statement must be filed within 7 days of this notice.(CBL)
Related: [-]
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Catherine D. Perry. 2 Summons(es) issued and emailed to attorney Anthony Simon. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible.[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (JWD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
5 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Anthony G. Simon for Plaintiff Midwest Energy Emissions Corp.. (Simon, Anthony)
Related: [-]
4 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiff Midwest Energy Emissions Corp.. (Simon, Anthony)
Related: [-]
3 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Midwest Energy Emissions Corp.. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Simon, Anthony)
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Midwest Energy Emissions Corp. Process Server: Special Delivery Services, Inc. (Simon, Anthony)
Related: [-]
1 1 23 pgs COMPLAINT against defendant Ameren Corp., Union Electric Co. with receipt number AMOEDC-10717168, in the amount of $405 Jury Demand,, filed by Midwest Energy Emissions Corp..(Simon, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 7 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form,
Att: 8 Summons Summons - Ameren Corp,
Att: 9 Summons Summons - Union Electric