***CASE OPENED IN ERROR - CASE INTENDED FOR DISTRICT OF KS *** v. Kaw Valley Companies, Inc.
Missouri Western District Court | |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00806 |
Nature of Suit | 340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Water Rights |
Case Filed: | Dec 17, 2024 |
Terminated: | Dec 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 01, 2025 4:42 AM CST |
Defendant
Kaw Valley Companies, Inc.
|
Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, December 18, 2024 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Admin Use Only)
Wed 12/18 9:15 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. Case was opened by mistake in the incorrect district. Case was intended for (and has been opened correctly in) the District of Kansas. Counsel provided contact information for the WDMO Finance Department to pursue refund of the filing fee. (Burch, Steve) |