Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:William M Ray, II
Case #: 1:24-cv-05766
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 30, 2025 3:55 AM EST
Defendant
BMB Matrix LLC.
Plaintiff
Erica Chriswell
3834 Walnut Path
Lithonia, GA 30038


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/15 2:58 PM
NOTICE re Complaints Against Judges by Erica Chriswell (tmf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
3 3 2 pgs order Order ruling on IFP Wed 12/18 1:31 PM
ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to submit this matter to the District Court for a frivolity determination under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 12/18/2024. (tmf)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Wed 12/18 1:30 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Erica Chriswell.(tmf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 12/18 1:33 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Erica Chriswell re3 Order ruling on IFP. (tmf)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Wed 12/18 1:33 PM
Submission of2 Complaint, for frivolity review, to District Judge William M. Ray II. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
1 1 motion Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 12/17 1:45 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Erica Chriswell.(djs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Tue 12/17 1:46 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (djs)
Related: [-]