Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:24-cv-07285
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1446pl Petition for Removal - Product Liability
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2024
Case in other court:Texas Western, 1:24-cv-01360
Last checked: Thursday Jan 30, 2025 4:18 AM EST
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By
Sara Ann Brown
Thompson Coburn LLP
contact info
Peter L. Loh
Foley Gardere
contact info
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
Defendant
The Chemours Company
Defendant
The 3M Company
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
Defendant
E.I. DuPont DeNemours & Company
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Represented By
Sara Ann Brown
Thompson Coburn LLP
contact info
Peter L. Loh
Foley Gardere
contact info
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Defendant
AGC Inc
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
Plaintiff
Daniel Frias
Represented By
Brett Land
Baron And Budd PC
contact info
Scott Summy
Baron & Budd PC
contact info
Carla Burke Pickrel
Baron & Budd, P.C.
contact info
Louise R Caro
Cossich Sumich Parsiola And Taylor LLC
contact info
Philip F Cossich
Cossich Sumich Parsiola And Taylor LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
15 15 service Summons Issued Wed 12/18 2:24 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
14 14 misc MDL Member Case Opened Tue 12/17 1:46 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Texas Western (associated as of 12/16/2024), 1:24-cv-01360, Frias v. The 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-07285-RMG (sshe, )
Related: [-]
12 12 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Tue 12/17 12:52 PM
Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 1:24-cv-01360. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
11 11 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER to the District of South Carolina. Signed by Judge Unassigned. (cc3) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/17/2024.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
10 10 ORDER STRIKING Attorney Carla Burke Pickrel as counsel of record for Plaintiff in this case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/17/2024.]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER STRIKING Attorney Brett Land as counsel of record for Plaintiff in this case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/17/2024.]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER STRIKING Attorney Philip F. Cossich, Jr. as counsel of record for Plaintiff in this case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/17/2024.]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER STRIKING Attorney Louise R. Caro as counsel of record for Plaintiff in this case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/17/2024.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
6 6 ORDER that the removing party, if it has not already done so, shall within ten (10) days from the date of this order supplement the record with state court pleading. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (kp) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/17/2024.]
Related: [-]
5 5 Order Directing Carla Burke Pickrel to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (kp) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/17/2024.]
Related: [-]
4 4 Order Directing Brett Land to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (kp) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/17/2024.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Order Directing Philip F. Cossich, Jr. to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (kp) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/17/2024.]
Related: [-]
2 2 Order Directing Louise R. Caro to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (kp) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/17/2024.]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP, individually and as successor in interest to The Ansul Company (Filing fee $405 receipt number ATXWDC-19444973), filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP, individually and as successor in interest to The Ansul Company.(Loh, Peter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/17/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Supplement
Case assigned to Judge Docket II - Austin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/17/2024.]
Related: [-]
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin Howell. (kp) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/17/2024.]
Related: [-]
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Daniel Frias. (kp) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/17/2024.]
Related: [-]