California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-04685
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 17, 2024 11:32 PM PST
Defendant
Selena Ann Chavez (1)
Represented By
Meagan Nettles
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Defendant
Marque Victoria Lopez (2)
Represented By
Douglas C. Brown
Law Offices Of Douglas C. Brown
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Hunter V. Norton
Doj-Usao
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/18/2024 12:29 AM PST
Friday, December 13, 2024
Arrest of Selena Ann Chavez, Marque Victoria Lopez (no document attached) (fjp)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Selena Ann Chavez, Marque Victoria Lopez.(fjp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Selena Ann Chavez, Marque Victoria Lopez: Initial Appearance set for 12/16/2024 before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu. (no document attached) (gac)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Hunter V. Norton appearing for USA. (Norton, Hunter); Attorney Hunter V. Norton added to party USA (pty:pla)(jrd)
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu: Initial Appearance as to Selena Ann Chavez(1) held on 12/16/2024. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Selena Ann Chavez(1). Bond set as to Selena Ann Chavez (1) $10,000 PS secured by 1 FRA and 10% cash deposit. Defendant to enter treatment and remain in custody pending bed space. Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 12/30/24 at 11:00am before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu. Arraignment set for 1/9/25 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu. ) (CD# 12/16/2024 SBC 24-1:3:16-3:32). (Plaintiff Attorney Daniel Casillas AUSA). (Defendant Attorney N. Papachristou, M. Nettles, J. Dang FD-S/A). (aje)
Related: [-]
6 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu: Status Hearing re Initial Appearance as to Marque Victoria Lopez(2) held on 12/16/2024. Defendant not appearing. Rule 5 objection noted. ( Initial Appearance set for 12/17/2024 before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu.) (CD# 12/16/2024 SBC 24-1:6:04-6:05). (Plaintiff Attorney Daniel Casillas AUSA). (Defendant Attorney N. Papachristou, M. Nettles, J. Dang FD-S/A). (no document attached) (aje)
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Selena Ann Chavez (1) $10,000 PS secred by 1 FRA and 10% cash depsoit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 12/16/2024. (yem)
Related: [-]
9 9 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Selena Ann Chavez (yem)
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER as to Selena Ann Chavez: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 12/16/24. (aje)
Related: [-]