California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-04691
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2024
Terminated:Jan 09, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 17, 2024 11:34 PM PST
Defendant
James David Johnson (1)
Represented By
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Brittany L. Sherron
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kyle Patrick Reynolds
Child Exploitation And Obscenity Section
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Amanda Griffith
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/13/2025 8:40 AM PST
Thursday, December 12, 2024
Arrest of James David Johnson (no document attached) (fjp)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
1 1 7 pgs COMPLAINT as to James David Johnson.(fjp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to James David Johnson: Initial Appearance set for 12/16/2024 before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu. (no document attached) (gac)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Amanda Griffith appearing for USA. (Griffith, Amanda); Attorney Amanda Griffith added to party USA (pty:pla)(jrd)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kyle Patrick Reynolds appearing for USA. Related [+]; Attorney Kyle Patrick Reynolds added to party USA (pty:pla)(jrd)
Related: [-] ynolds, Kyle
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu: Initial Appearance as to James David Johnson held on 12/16/2024. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for James David Johnson. Government oral motion to detain(Flight/Danger). ( Detention Hearing - RF/DC set for 12/19/2024 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu.) Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 12/30/24 at 11:00am before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu. Arraignment set for 1/9/25 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu.)(CD# 12/16/2024 SBC 24-1:2:24-2:32). (Plaintiff Attorney Amanda Griffith AUSA). (Defendant Attorney N. Papachristou, M. Nettles, J. Dang FD-S/A). (aje)
Related: [-]
6 6 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to James David Johnson (no document attached) (aje)
Related: [-]
7 7 Oral MOTION to Detain (Flight/Danger)by USA as to James David Johnson. (no document attached) (aje)
Related: [-]
8 8 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by James David Johnson (yem)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs ORDER as to James David Johnson: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 12/16/24. (aje)
Related: [-]