New York Southern District Court
Case #: 7:24-cr-00693
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 18, 2024 2:15 AM EST
Defendant
Tarry Tae Sup Shin (1)
Represented By
Stephen R. Lewis
Law Office Of Stephen R. Lewis, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kathryn Wheelock
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:50 AM EDT
Thursday, October 03, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Manuel Esteban Mijango (1), Tarry Tae Sup Shin (2). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy) (lnl) [7:24-mj-03506-UA]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy: Initial Appearance/Detention Hearing as to Tarry Tae Sup Shin held on 10/3/2024. AUSA Kathryn Wheelock present of behalf for USA. Defense Counsel. Defense Counsel Stephen R. Lewis present with Tarry Tae Sup Shin. The defendant was advised of his rights and the charges against him. Public reading of the complaint waived. Financial affidavit approved. Stephen Lewis was appointed to represent the defendant. Bail arguments heard. Bail denied based on risk of flight. Preliminary Hearing: 10/30/2024. (Court Reporter Courtflow) (lnl) [7:24-mj-03506-UA]
Related: [-]
5 5 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Tarry Tae Sup Shin. APPROVED for Stephen Lewis. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy) (lnl) [7:24-mj-03506-UA]
Related: [-]
6 6 MEDIAL ORDER as to Tarry Tae Sup Shin. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 10/3/2024) (ORDER on file with the Clerk's Office) (lnl) [7:24-mj-03506-UA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
7 7 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (ap) [7:24-mj-03506-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
10 10 ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Tarry Tae Sup Shin. Time excluded from 10/30/2024 until 11/27/2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 10/30/2024) (ap) [7:24-mj-03506-UA]
Related: [-]
11 11 AFFIRMATION of Kathryn Wheelock in Support by USA as to Tarry Tae Sup Shin re:10 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (ap) [7:24-mj-03506-UA]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
12 12 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (ap) [7:24-mj-03506-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
13 13 1 pgs 2ND ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Tarry Tae Sup Shin. Time excluded from 11/27/2024 until 12/25/2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 11/27/2024) (ap) [7:24-mj-03506-UA]
Related: [-]
14 14 AFFIRMATION of Kathryn Wheelock in Support by USA as to Tarry Tae Sup Shin re:13 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (ap) [7:24-mj-03506-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
Case as to Tarry Tae Sup Shin REASSIGNED to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Unassigned no longer assigned to the case. (ap)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE an Information by U.S.A. as to Tarry Tae Sup Shin. (ap)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik: Arraignment as to Tarry Tae Sup Shin (1) Count 1 held on 12/13/2024. Defendant present with defense counsel Steven Lewis, CJA. AUSA Kate Wheelock present for the Government. The defendant waives indictment and was arraigned on the one count Felony Information, waives public reading, and enters a not guilty plea. The matter has been wheeled out previously and assigned to Judge Karas. (Court Reporter Courtflow) (ap)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik: Plea entered by Tarry Tae Sup Shin (1) Count 1 Not Guilty. (ap)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik: Change of Plea Hearing as to Tarry Tae Sup Shin held on 12/13/2024. Defendant present with defense counsel Steven Lewis, CJA. AUSA Kate Wheelock present for the Government. After executing the Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge on a Felony Plea Allocution,(court exhibit #1) the defendant withdraws his previously entered plea of not guilty and now enters a plea of guilty to count one of the felony information. Plea agreement dated December 13, 2024 submitted as court exhibit # 2. The Court directs a Pre Sentence Investigation and schedules sentence on April 21, 2025 at 2pm. Rule 5(f) obligations reviewed with the Government. Written order to be entered on the docket. Report and Recommendation will be provided to Judge Karas via transcript See transcript. (Sentencing set for 4/21/2025 at 02:00 PM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas) (Court Reporter Courtflow) (ap)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik: Plea entered by Tarry Tae Sup Shin (1) Guilty as to Count 1. (ap)
Related: [-]
Oral Order of Referral to Probation for Presentence Investigation and Report as to Tarry Tae Sup Shin. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik on 12/13/2024) (ap)
Related: [-]
16 16 2 pgs INFORMATION (Felony) filed as to Tarry Tae Sup Shin (1) count(s) 1. (ap)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Tarry Tae Sup Shin. (ap)
Related: [-]
18 18 1 pgs CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE ON A FELONY PLEA ALLOCUTION by Tarry Tae Sup Shin. (ap)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
Case Designated ECF as to Tarry Tae Sup Shin. (ap)
Related: [-]