Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Wendy B Vitter
Referred: Janis Van Meerveld
Case #: 2:24-cv-02898
Nature of Suit340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine
Cause46:30504 Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 01, 2025 4:34 AM CST
Petitioner
Inland Dredging Company, L.L.C.
Represented By
Jefferson Randolph Tillery
Jones Walker (new Orleans)
contact info
Sara Barry Kuebel
Jones Walker (new Orleans)
contact info
Abigail Jean Weiland
Jones Walker LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/18 2:54 PM
ANSWER and CLAIM to1 Complaint, by Hard's Marine Service, LTD.Attorney Corey Patrick Parenton added to party Hard's Marine Service, LTD(pty:dft).(Parenton, Corey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
6 6 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 01/22 4:59 PM
ORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE AND RESTRAINING PROSECUTION OF CLAIMS: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the5 Ex Parte Motion for Approval of Security, Restraining Order, Notice to Claimants and Other Relief is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 1/22/2025. (mmv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice to Claimants of Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
5 5 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 01/15 2:45 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Ex Parte MOTION Limitation Action - Approval of Security, Restraining Order, Notice to Claimants, and Other Relief by Inland Dredging Company, L.L.C..(Tillery, Jefferson)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Proposed Pleading
Friday, December 27, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 12/27 11:09 AM
ORDER DIRECTING POSTING OF SECURITY AND NOTICE TO THE COURT: NOW, THEREFORE, on the2 Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Dispensation of Requirement to Post Security, filed by counsel for Inland Dredging; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the2 Motion is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 12/27/2024. (mmv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
3 3 misc Initial Case Assignment Wed 12/18 11:17 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 12/18 10:25 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Temporary Dispensation of Requirement to Post Security by Inland Dredging Company, L.L.C.(Tillery, Jefferson) Modified text on 12/18/2024 (mmv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 12/18 10:18 AM
COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION OR LIMITATION (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10812797) filed by Inland Dredging Company, L.L.C. Attorney Jefferson Randolph Tillery added to party Inland Dredging Company, L.L.C.(pty:pet).(Tillery, Jefferson) Modified text on 12/18/2024 (mmv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Declaration of Value Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1746,
Att: 3 Declaration of Pending Freight,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet